Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 64 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4979 Week
» 16216 Month
» 249136 Year
» 1914512 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

RR/GWR Hurry Riches "RRAP" Class 0-6-2T


GWR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Mileage Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
78 08/1921 02/08/1955 34 703,047 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 08/10/1955 34.17
79 08/1921 21/07/1955 33.92 731,059 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 13/08/1955 34.02
80 11/1921 01/02/1954 32.25 760,629 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 27/02/1954 32.31
81 11/1921 17/05/1954 32.5 751,374 32.61