Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 28 Online
» 723 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 1739 Week
» 19791 Month
» 252711 Year
» 1918087 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

RR/GWR Hurry Riches "RRA" Class 0-6-2T


Class GWR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
RRA 52 05/1910 W Withdrawn 11/1949 29/11/1949
RRA 53 05/1910 W Withdrawn 06/1949 13/06/1949
RRA 54 05/1910 W Withdrawn 04/1948 24/04/1948
RRA 55 05/1910 W Withdrawn 02/1953 04/02/1953
RRA 56 05/1910 88B
W
Cardiff East Dock
Withdrawn
01/11/1952
09/1953
28/09/1953
RRA 57 04/1911 88A
W
Cardiff Cathays
Withdrawn
31/10/1951
04/1952
29/04/1952
RRA 58 05/1911 AYN
THT
BRY
88A
88A
88B
W
Abercynon
Treherbert
Barry
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff East Dock
Withdrawn
31/03/1948
30/06/1948
10/07/1948
08/09/1951
30/09/1951
01/11/1952
09/1954
08/09/1954
RRA 59 06/1911 88A
88A
88B
W
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff East Dock
Withdrawn
08/09/1951
30/09/1951
17/05/1952
07/1955
29/07/1955
RRA 60 07/1911 W Withdrawn 03/1951 13/03/1951
RRA 61 08/1911 RHY
CED
W
Rhymney
Cardiff East Dock
Withdrawn
30/06/1948
07/08/1948
02/1950
20/02/1950
RRA 62 09/1911 W Withdrawn 12/1948 06/12/1948
RRA 71 06/1910 W Withdrawn 12/1948 06/12/1948
RRA 72 07/1910 W Withdrawn 02/1952 26/02/1952
RRA 73 07/1910 RHY
CED
88A
88A
W
Rhymney
Cardiff East Dock
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Cathays
Withdrawn
31/03/1948
30/06/1948
31/01/1951
28/02/1951
07/1952
11/07/1952
RRA 74 07/1910 W Withdrawn 01/1951 20/01/1951
RRA 75 07/1910 W Withdrawn 10/1953 26/10/1953