Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 616 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 1632 Week
» 19684 Month
» 252604 Year
» 1917980 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

RR/GWR Hurry Riches "RRA" Class 0-6-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
31/03/1948 Reallocation 58     AYN Abercynon  
31/03/1948 Reallocation 73     RHY Rhymney  
24/04/1948 Condemned 54 98W     COND  
30/06/1948 Reallocation 58 AYN Abercynon THT Treherbert  
30/06/1948 Reallocation 61     RHY Rhymney  
30/06/1948 Reallocation 73 RHY Rhymney CED Cardiff East Dock  
10/07/1948 Reallocation 58 THT Treherbert BRY Barry  
07/08/1948 Reallocation 61 RHY Rhymney CED Cardiff East Dock  
06/12/1948 Condemned 62 98W     COND  
06/12/1948 Condemned 71 98W     COND  
13/06/1949 Condemned 53 98W     COND  
29/11/1949 Condemned 52 98W     COND  
20/02/1950 Condemned 61 98W     COND  
20/01/1951 Condemned 74 98W     COND  
31/01/1951 Reallocation 73 CED Cardiff East Dock 88A Cardiff Cathays  
28/02/1951 Reallocation 73 88A Cardiff Cathays 88A Cardiff Cathays  
13/03/1951 Condemned 60 98W     COND  
08/09/1951 Reallocation 58 BRY Barry 88A Cardiff Cathays  
08/09/1951 Reallocation 59     88A Cardiff Cathays  
30/09/1951 Reallocation 58 88A Cardiff Cathays 88A Cardiff Cathays  
30/09/1951 Reallocation 59 88A Cardiff Cathays 88A Cardiff Cathays  
31/10/1951 Reallocation 57     88A Cardiff Cathays  
26/02/1952 Condemned 72 98W     COND  
29/04/1952 Condemned 57 98W     COND  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 59 88A Cardiff Cathays 88B Cardiff East Dock  
11/07/1952 Condemned 73 98W     COND  
01/11/1952 Reallocation 56     88B Cardiff East Dock  
01/11/1952 Reallocation 58 88A Cardiff Cathays 88B Cardiff East Dock  
04/02/1953 Condemned 55 98W     COND  
28/09/1953 Condemned 56 98W     COND  
26/10/1953 Condemned 75 98W     COND  
08/09/1954 Condemned 58 98W     COND  
29/07/1955 Condemned 59 98W     COND