Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 272 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4249 Week
» 15486 Month
» 248406 Year
» 1913782 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

TVR/GWR Hurry Riches "O4" Class 0-6-2T


Class TVR GWR (1922) GWR (1946) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
TV O4 105 236   06/1908 88F
88C
W
Treherbert
Barry
Withdrawn
31/10/1951
06/09/1952
01/1953
12/01/1953
TV O4 1 278   07/1910 W Withdrawn 23/03/1946
05/1951
28/05/1951
TV O4 2 279   07/1910 THT
88F
88F
88F
88E
88B
W
Treherbert
Treherbert
Treherbert
Treherbert
Abercynon
Cardiff East Dock
Withdrawn
24/01/1948
08/09/1951
30/09/1951
24/01/1953
21/03/1953
03/10/1953
05/1954
31/05/1954
TV O4 6 280   07/1908 W Withdrawn 18/05/1946
05/1949
09/05/1949
TV O4 8 281   08/1910 W Withdrawn 08/1950 25/08/1950
TV O4 9 282   07/1908 86C
86J
W
Cardiff Canton
Aberdare
Withdrawn
03/11/1951
21/02/1953
06/1954
14/06/1954
TV O4 17 283   08/1910 THT
BRY
W
Treherbert
Barry
Withdrawn
30/04/1948
04/09/1948
03/1949
14/03/1949
TV O4 35 284   08/1910 W Withdrawn 11/1952 03/11/1952
TV O4 38 285   04/1907 THT
88F
88F
88C
W
Treherbert
Treherbert
Treherbert
Barry
Withdrawn
29/01/1949
25/02/1950
22/04/1950
21/03/1953
08/1953
24/08/1953
TV O4 39 286   06/1908 88A
88A
W
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Cathays
Withdrawn
12/08/1950
31/08/1950
10/1950
02/10/1950
TV O4 43 287   04/1907 W Withdrawn 12/1949 07/12/1949
TV O4 46 288   09/1910 W Withdrawn 03/1950 10/03/1950
TV O4 48 289   07/1908 W Withdrawn 08/1949 15/08/1949
TV O4 49 290   10/1910 FDL
88F
88E
88B
W
Ferndale
Treherbert
Abercynon
Cardiff East Dock
Withdrawn
30/06/1948
24/01/1953
21/03/1953
03/10/1953
07/1955
26/07/1955
TV O4 56 291   07/1908 W Withdrawn 01/1950 16/01/1950
TV O4 58 292   07/1908 W Withdrawn 23/03/1946
04/1952
10/04/1952
TV O4 59 293   06/1907 RHY
RYR
W
Rhymney
Radyr
Withdrawn
23/03/1946
31/03/1948
10/07/1948
07/1951
27/07/1951
TV O4 67 294   07/1907 W Withdrawn 07/1950 17/07/1950
TV O4 68 295   07/1907 W Withdrawn 06/1951 23/06/1951
TV O4 94 296   09/1907 W Withdrawn 09/1949 19/09/1949
TV O4 95 297   07/1908 THT
W
Treherbert
Withdrawn
26/02/1949
12/1949
12/12/1949
TV O4 97 298   07/1908 W Withdrawn 07/1948 10/07/1948
TV O4 98 299   07/1908 88F
W
Treherbert
Withdrawn
15/07/1950
06/1951
18/06/1951
TV O4 101 300 200 07/1908 W Withdrawn 03/11/1945
07/1948
10/07/1948
TV O4 102 301   06/1908 FDL
CHYS
W
Ferndale
Cardiff Cathays
Withdrawn
21/02/1948
31/03/1948
12/1948
06/12/1948
TV O4 104 302   07/1908 W Withdrawn 04/1948 10/04/1948
TV O4 108 310 203 09/1910 W Withdrawn 01/1952 07/01/1952
TV O4 109 311 204 09/1910 88B
W
Cardiff East Dock
Withdrawn
25/11/1953
07/1955
26/07/1955
TV O4 110 313 205 09/1910 W Withdrawn 07/1954 12/07/1954
TV O4 111 314   08/1908 W Withdrawn 12/1949 08/12/1949
TV O4 112 315 207 10/1910 THT
FDL
88F
W
Treherbert
Ferndale
Treherbert
Withdrawn
15/12/1945
30/06/1948
07/08/1948
20/05/1950
11/1952
18/11/1952
TV O4 113 317 208 10/1910 86J
88B
W
Aberdare
Cardiff East Dock
Withdrawn
29/11/1952
22/05/1954
07/1955
22/07/1955
TV O4 114 318 209 10/1910 W Withdrawn 08/1952 27/08/1952
TV O4 115 319 210 10/1910 THT
88B
88F
88C
88B
W
Treherbert
Cardiff East Dock
Treherbert
Barry
Cardiff East Dock
Withdrawn
29/01/1949
17/05/1952
04/10/1952
21/03/1953
26/12/1953
03/1955
04/03/1955
TV O4 116 320 211 10/1910 88B
88F
W
Cardiff East Dock
Treherbert
Withdrawn
23/03/1946
23/02/1952
04/10/1952
05/1955
03/05/1955
TV O4 118 321 215 10/1910 W Withdrawn 07/1955 23/07/1955
TV O4 119 324 216 10/1910 88F
88F
W
Treherbert
Treherbert
Withdrawn
23/03/1946
17/06/1950
08/09/1951
01/1955
24/01/1955
TV O4 121 333 217 10/1910 88F
W
Treherbert
Withdrawn
17/05/1952
09/1952
08/09/1952
TV O4 13 409 218 10/1910 FDL
88E
88E
88F
W
Ferndale
Abercynon
Abercynon
Treherbert
Withdrawn
30/06/1949
04/11/1950
30/11/1950
31/10/1951
12/1952
04/12/1952
TV O4 36 414 219 08/1910 W Withdrawn 06/1951 04/06/1951
TV O4 69 420 220 08/1907 W Withdrawn 04/1951 08/04/1951