Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1651 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15057 Week
» 68073 Month
» 187600 Year
» 3214453 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
TVR/GWR Hurry Riches "O4" Class 0-6-2T
Company |
Old Number |
|
Company |
New Number |
Subtype |
|
Date |
Information |
TVR |
1 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
278 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
101 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
300 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
102 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
301 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
104 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
302 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
105 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
236 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
108 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
310 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
109 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
311 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
110 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
313 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
111 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
314 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
112 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
315 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
113 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
317 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
114 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
318 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
115 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
319 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
116 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
320 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
118 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
321 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
119 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
324 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
121 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
333 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
13 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
409 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
17 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
283 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
2 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
279 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
35 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
284 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
36 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
414 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
38 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
285 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
39 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
286 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
43 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
287 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
46 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
288 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
48 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
289 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
49 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
290 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
56 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
291 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
58 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
292 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
59 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
293 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
6 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
280 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
67 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
294 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
68 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
295 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
69 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
420 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
8 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
281 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
9 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
282 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
94 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
296 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
95 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
297 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
97 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
298 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
TVR |
98 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
299 |
1922 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
GWR |
318 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
209 |
1946 |
on |
09/08/1946 |
At Caerphilly Factory |
GWR |
300 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
200 |
1946 |
on |
17/12/1946 |
At Barry Factory |
GWR |
313 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
205 |
1946 |
on |
05/07/1947 |
At Caerphilly Factory |
GWR |
311 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
204 |
1946 |
on |
27/08/1947 |
At Caerphilly Factory |
GWR |
315 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
207 |
1946 |
on |
27/10/1947 |
At Caerphilly Factory |
GWR |
319 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
210 |
1946 |
on |
03/12/1947 |
At Caerphilly Factory |
GWR |
324 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
216 |
1946 |
on |
31/03/1948 |
At Caerphilly Factory |
GWR |
321 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
215 |
1946 |
on |
14/04/1948 |
At Caerphilly Factory |
GWR |
320 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
211 |
1946 |
on |
04/05/1948 |
At Caerphilly Factory |
GWR |
414 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
219 |
1946 |
on |
28/05/1948 |
At Barry Factory |
GWR |
317 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
208 |
1946 |
on |
04/08/1948 |
At Caerphilly Factory |
GWR |
420 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
220 |
1946 |
on |
12/11/1948 |
At Caerphilly Factory |
GWR |
310 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
203 |
1946 |
on |
10/12/1948 |
At Caerphilly Factory |
GWR |
333 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
217 |
1946 |
on |
13/04/1949 |
At Caerphilly Factory |
GWR |
409 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
218 |
1946 |
on |
10/01/1950 |
At Caerphilly Factory |