Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 57 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 5588 Week
» 30422 Month
» 64754 Year
» 1730130 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

110


BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
51809 17/06/1961   (New) 17/06/1961
51810 W Withdrawn 25/01/1987 25/01/1987
51811 W Withdrawn 16/11/1987 16/11/1987
51812
51813
51814
51815
51816 16/08/1987
51817
51818
51819
51820
51821 W Withdrawn 03/11/1963 03/11/1963
51822
51823
51824
51825
51826
51827
51828 17/11/1961 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 17/11/1961
51829 17/06/1961   (New) 17/06/1961
51830
51831
51832
51833
51834
51835
51836 W Withdrawn 28/09/1986 28/09/1986
51837 W Withdrawn 03/11/1963 03/11/1963
51838
51839 W Withdrawn 16/11/1987 16/11/1987
51840
51841
51842
51843
51844 W Withdrawn 15/02/1987 15/02/1987
51845
51846
51847
51848 17/11/1961 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 17/11/1961
52066 25/11/1961 26A Newton Heath (New) 25/11/1961
52067 02/12/1961 26A Newton Heath (New) 02/12/1961
52068 09/12/1961 26A
W
Newton Heath (New)
Withdrawn
09/12/1961
15/02/1987
15/02/1987
52069 30/12/1961 26A Newton Heath (New) 30/12/1961
52070 30/12/1961 26A
W
Newton Heath (New)
Withdrawn
30/12/1961
28/09/1986
28/09/1986
52071 06/01/1962 26A Newton Heath (New) 06/01/1962
52072 13/01/1962 26A Newton Heath (New) 13/01/1962
52073 20/01/1962 26A Newton Heath (New) 20/01/1962
52074 21/01/1962 26A Newton Heath (New) 21/01/1962
52075 03/02/1962 26A Newton Heath (New) 03/02/1962
52076 25/11/1961 26A Newton Heath (New) 25/11/1961
52077 02/12/1961 26A Newton Heath (New) 02/12/1961
52078 09/12/1961 26A
W
Newton Heath (New)
Withdrawn
09/12/1961
25/01/1987
25/01/1987
52079 30/12/1961 26A Newton Heath (New) 30/12/1961
52080 30/12/1961 26A Newton Heath (New) 30/12/1961
52081 06/01/1962 26A Newton Heath (New) 06/01/1962
52082 13/01/1962 26A Newton Heath (New) 13/01/1962
52083 20/01/1962 26A Newton Heath (New) 20/01/1962
52084 21/01/1962 26A Newton Heath (New) 21/01/1962
52085 03/02/1962 26A Newton Heath (New) 03/02/1962