Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 232 Today
» 1021 Yesterday
» 4578 Week
» 4578 Month
» 71440 Year
» 1736816 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

110


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To
17/11/1961 To Service 51828   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
17/11/1961 To Service 51848   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
25/11/1961 To Service 52066   NEW 26A Newton Heath
25/11/1961 To Service 52076   NEW 26A Newton Heath
02/12/1961 To Service 52067   NEW 26A Newton Heath
02/12/1961 To Service 52077   NEW 26A Newton Heath
09/12/1961 To Service 52068   NEW 26A Newton Heath
09/12/1961 To Service 52078   NEW 26A Newton Heath
30/12/1961 To Service 52069   NEW 26A Newton Heath
30/12/1961 To Service 52070   NEW 26A Newton Heath
30/12/1961 To Service 52079   NEW 26A Newton Heath
30/12/1961 To Service 52080   NEW 26A Newton Heath
06/01/1962 To Service 52071   NEW 26A Newton Heath
06/01/1962 To Service 52081   NEW 26A Newton Heath
13/01/1962 To Service 52072   NEW 26A Newton Heath
13/01/1962 To Service 52082   NEW 26A Newton Heath
20/01/1962 To Service 52073   NEW 26A Newton Heath
20/01/1962 To Service 52083   NEW 26A Newton Heath
21/01/1962 To Service 52074   NEW 26A Newton Heath
21/01/1962 To Service 52084   NEW 26A Newton Heath
03/02/1962 To Service 52075   NEW 26A Newton Heath
03/02/1962 To Service 52085   NEW 26A Newton Heath
03/11/1963 Condemned 51821       COND
03/11/1963 Condemned 51837       COND
28/09/1986 Condemned 51836       COND
28/09/1986 Condemned 52070 26A Newton Heath   COND
25/01/1987 Condemned 51810       COND
25/01/1987 Condemned 52078 26A Newton Heath   COND
15/02/1987 Condemned 51844       COND
15/02/1987 Condemned 52068 26A Newton Heath   COND
16/08/1987 Condemned 51816       COND
16/11/1987 Condemned 51811       COND
16/11/1987 Condemned 51839       COND