Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 121 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2286 Week
» 2286 Month
» 69148 Year
» 1734524 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

110


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
51829 17/06/1961 59.75
51830
51831
51832
51833
51834
51835
51836 28/09/1986 Neville Hill
51837 03/11/1963
51838
51839 16/11/1987 Neville Hill
51840
51841
51842
51843
51844 15/02/1987 Neville Hill
51845
51846
51847
51848 17/11/1961 Bradford Hammerton Street 59.33
52076 25/11/1961 Newton Heath 59.31
52077 02/12/1961 Newton Heath 59.29
52078 09/12/1961 Newton Heath 25/01/1987 Neville Hill 25.08 59.27
52079 30/12/1961 Newton Heath 59.21
52080 30/12/1961 Newton Heath 59.21
52081 06/01/1962 Newton Heath 59.19
52082 13/01/1962 Newton Heath 59.18
52083 20/01/1962 Newton Heath 59.16
52084 21/01/1962 Newton Heath 59.15
52085 03/02/1962 Newton Heath 59.12