Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 100 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 3518 Week
» 28352 Month
» 62684 Year
» 1728060 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

110


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
51809 17/06/1961 59.73
51810 25/01/1987 Neville Hill
51811 16/11/1987 Neville Hill
51812
51813
51814
51815
51816 16/08/1987 Neville Hill
51817
51818
51819
51820
51821 03/11/1963
51822
51823
51824
51825
51826
51827
51828 17/11/1961 Bradford Hammerton Street 59.32
52066 25/11/1961 Newton Heath 59.29
52067 02/12/1961 Newton Heath 59.27
52068 09/12/1961 Newton Heath 15/02/1987 Neville Hill 25.17 59.25
52069 30/12/1961 Newton Heath 59.20
52070 30/12/1961 Newton Heath 28/09/1986 Neville Hill 24.75 59.20
52071 06/01/1962 Newton Heath 59.18
52072 13/01/1962 Newton Heath 59.16
52073 20/01/1962 Newton Heath 59.14
52074 21/01/1962 Newton Heath 59.14
52075 03/02/1962 Newton Heath 59.10