Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 3921 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 22832 Week
» 87786 Month
» 290450 Year
» 3317303 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
84 Bo-Bo
Old Number |
Company |
Old Num Type |
New Number |
Company |
Subtype |
New Num Type |
|
Date |
3038 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
84003 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
10/05/1972 |
3042 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
84007 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
27/05/1972 |
3039 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
84004 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
10/06/1972 |
3040 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
84005 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
03/07/1972 |
3043 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
84008 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
02/08/1972 |
3037 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
84002 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
02/09/1972 |
3045 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
84010 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
10/10/1972 |
3041 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
84006 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
28/10/1972 |
3044 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
84009 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
25/11/1972 |
3036 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
84001 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
22/12/1972 |