Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 134 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4626 Week
» 29460 Month
» 63792 Year
» 1729168 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

111


BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
50134      
50135
50136 27/04/1957 9A Longsight (New) 27/04/1957
50137 27/04/1957 9A Longsight (New) 27/04/1957
50270 30/10/1957 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 30/10/1957
50271 19/11/1957 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 19/11/1957
50272 29/11/1957 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 29/11/1957
50273 13/12/1957 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 13/12/1957
50274 19/12/1957 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 19/12/1957
50275 21/12/1957 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 21/12/1957
50276 31/12/1957 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 31/12/1957
50277 08/01/1958 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 08/01/1958
50278 23/01/1958 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 23/01/1958
50279 30/01/1958 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 30/01/1958
50280 30/10/1957 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 30/10/1957
50281 19/11/1957 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 19/11/1957
50282 29/11/1957 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 29/11/1957
50283 13/12/1957 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 13/12/1957
50284 19/12/1957 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 19/12/1957
50285 21/12/1957 56G
W
Bradford Hammerton Street (New)
Withdrawn
21/12/1957
21/11/1966
21/11/1966
50286 31/12/1957 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 31/12/1957
50287 08/01/1958 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 08/01/1958
50288 23/01/1958 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 23/01/1958
50289 30/01/1958 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 30/01/1958
51541 18/12/1959 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 18/12/1959
51542 18/12/1959 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 18/12/1959
51543 29/12/1959 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 29/12/1959
51544 06/01/1960 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 06/01/1960
51545 18/12/1959 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 18/12/1959
51546 29/01/1960 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 29/01/1960
51547 29/01/1960 56G
W
Bradford Hammerton Street (New)
Withdrawn
29/01/1960
23/07/1970
23/07/1970
51548 12/02/1960 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 12/02/1960
51549 19/02/1960 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 19/02/1960
51550 08/03/1960 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 08/03/1960
51551
51552 18/12/1959 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 18/12/1959
51553 29/12/1959 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 29/12/1959
51554 06/01/1960 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 06/01/1960
51555 06/01/1960 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 06/01/1960
51556 29/01/1960 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 29/01/1960
51557 29/01/1960 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 29/01/1960
51558 12/02/1960 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 12/02/1960
51559 19/02/1960 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 19/02/1960
51560 08/03/1960 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 08/03/1960