Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 945 Today
» 1177 Yesterday
» 3251 Week
» 28085 Month
» 62417 Year
» 1727793 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

111


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To
27/04/1957 To Service 50136   NEW 9A Longsight
27/04/1957 To Service 50137   NEW 9A Longsight
30/10/1957 To Service 50270   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
30/10/1957 To Service 50280   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
19/11/1957 To Service 50271   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
19/11/1957 To Service 50281   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
29/11/1957 To Service 50272   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
29/11/1957 To Service 50282   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
13/12/1957 To Service 50273   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
13/12/1957 To Service 50283   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
19/12/1957 To Service 50274   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
19/12/1957 To Service 50284   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
21/12/1957 To Service 50275   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
21/12/1957 To Service 50285   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
31/12/1957 To Service 50276   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
31/12/1957 To Service 50286   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
08/01/1958 To Service 50277   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
08/01/1958 To Service 50287   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
23/01/1958 To Service 50278   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
23/01/1958 To Service 50288   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
30/01/1958 To Service 50279   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
30/01/1958 To Service 50289   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
18/12/1959 To Service 51541   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
18/12/1959 To Service 51542   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
18/12/1959 To Service 51545   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
18/12/1959 To Service 51552   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
29/12/1959 To Service 51543   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
29/12/1959 To Service 51553   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
06/01/1960 To Service 51544   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
06/01/1960 To Service 51554   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
06/01/1960 To Service 51555   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
29/01/1960 To Service 51546   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
29/01/1960 To Service 51547   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
29/01/1960 To Service 51556   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
29/01/1960 To Service 51557   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
12/02/1960 To Service 51548   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
12/02/1960 To Service 51558   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
19/02/1960 To Service 51549   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
19/02/1960 To Service 51559   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
08/03/1960 To Service 51550   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
08/03/1960 To Service 51560   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
21/11/1966 Condemned 50285 56G Bradford Hammerton Street   COND
23/07/1970 Condemned 51547 56G Bradford Hammerton Street   COND