Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 110 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4602 Week
» 29436 Month
» 63768 Year
» 1729144 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

111


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
50270 30/10/1957 Bradford Hammerton Street 63.37
50271 19/11/1957 Bradford Hammerton Street 63.32
50272 29/11/1957 Bradford Hammerton Street 63.29
50273 13/12/1957 Bradford Hammerton Street 63.25
50274 19/12/1957 Bradford Hammerton Street 63.23
50275 21/12/1957 Bradford Hammerton Street 63.23
50276 31/12/1957 Bradford Hammerton Street 63.20
50277 08/01/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 63.18
50278 23/01/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 63.14
50279 30/01/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 63.12
51551
51552 18/12/1959 Bradford Hammerton Street 61.24
51553 29/12/1959 Bradford Hammerton Street 61.21
51554 06/01/1960 Bradford Hammerton Street 61.18
51555 06/01/1960 Bradford Hammerton Street 61.18
51556 29/01/1960 Bradford Hammerton Street 61.12
51557 29/01/1960 Bradford Hammerton Street 61.12
51558 12/02/1960 Bradford Hammerton Street 61.08
51559 19/02/1960 Bradford Hammerton Street 61.06
51560 08/03/1960 Bradford Hammerton Street 61.01