Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 98 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 3516 Week
» 28350 Month
» 62682 Year
» 1728058 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

111


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
50134
50135
50136 27/04/1957 Longsight 63.88
50137 27/04/1957 Longsight 63.88
50280 30/10/1957 Bradford Hammerton Street 63.37
50281 19/11/1957 Bradford Hammerton Street 63.31
50282 29/11/1957 Bradford Hammerton Street 63.28
50283 13/12/1957 Bradford Hammerton Street 63.25
50284 19/12/1957 Bradford Hammerton Street 63.23
50285 21/12/1957 Bradford Hammerton Street 21/11/1966 8.92 63.22
50286 31/12/1957 Bradford Hammerton Street 63.20
50287 08/01/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 63.18
50288 23/01/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 63.13
50289 30/01/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 63.12
51541 18/12/1959 Bradford Hammerton Street 61.23
51542 18/12/1959 Bradford Hammerton Street 61.23
51543 29/12/1959 Bradford Hammerton Street 61.20
51544 06/01/1960 Bradford Hammerton Street 61.18
51545 18/12/1959 Bradford Hammerton Street 61.23
51546 29/01/1960 Bradford Hammerton Street 61.12
51547 29/01/1960 Bradford Hammerton Street 23/07/1970 Neville Hill 10.5 61.12
51548 12/02/1960 Bradford Hammerton Street 61.08
51549 19/02/1960 Bradford Hammerton Street 61.06
51550 08/03/1960 Bradford Hammerton Street 61.01