GWR Dean "3021" Class 2-2-2
Class | GWR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
3021 | 3001 | 01/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1908 | 06/1908 |
3021 | 3002 | 01/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1908 | 09/1908 |
3021 | 3003 | 02/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1909 | 02/1909 |
3021 | 3004 | 02/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1911 | 10/1911 |
3021 | 3005 | 02/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1908 | 02/1908 |
3021 | 3006 | 03/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1914 | 02/1914 |
3021 | 3007 | 03/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1912 | 03/1912 |
3021 | 3008 | 03/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1912 | 08/1912 |
3021 | 3009 | 03/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1914 | 02/1914 |
3021 | 3010 | 03/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1908 | 09/1908 |
3021 | 3011 | 03/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1911 | 09/1911 |
3021 | 3012 | 03/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1909 | 05/1909 |
3021 | 3013 | 03/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1914 | 02/1914 |
3021 | 3014 | 04/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1908 | 06/1908 |
3021 | 3015 | 04/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1908 | 06/1908 |
3021 | 3016 | 04/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1911 | 03/1911 |
3021 | 3017 | 04/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1908 | 09/1908 |
3021 | 3018 | 04/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1913 | 06/1913 |
3021 | 3019 | 04/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1908 | 09/1908 |
3021 | 3020 | 04/1892 | W BAN |
Withdrawn Banbury |
02/1908 31/12/1949 |
02/1908 |
3021 | 3021 | 04/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1909 | 05/1909 |
3021 | 3022 | 05/1891 | W WEY WOS |
Withdrawn Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Worcester |
02/1909 30/06/1948 08/10/1949 |
02/1909 |
3021 | 3023 | 07/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1912 | 09/1912 |
3021 | 3024 | 07/1891 | W DID 84C |
Withdrawn Didcot Banbury |
02/1909 08/10/1949 29/11/1952 |
02/1909 |
3021 | 3025 | 08/1891 | W 86B 86G 87G |
Withdrawn Newport Pill Pontypool Road Carmarthen |
09/1908 30/04/1951 03/11/1951 01/11/1952 |
09/1908 |
3021 | 3026 | 08/1891 | W 84C |
Withdrawn Banbury |
02/1909 16/06/1951 |
02/1909 |
3021 | 3027 | 08/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1914 | 07/1914 |
3021 | 3028 | 08/1891 | W 84B 84F |
Withdrawn Oxley Stourbridge Junction |
02/1909 16/06/1951 31/10/1951 |
02/1909 |
3021 | 3029 | 11/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1909 | 05/1909 |
3021 | 3030 | 12/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1909 | 05/1909 |