GWR Dean "3500" Class 2-4-0T
GWR | GWR (1870 Renum) | GWR (1912 Renum) | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Rebuilt To | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
3581 | 01/1899 | 03/11/1945 | 46.83 | |||||||||
3582 | 02/1899 | 08/11/1949 | 50.75 | |||||||||
3583 | 02/1899 | 27/12/1947 | 48.83 | |||||||||
3584 | 04/1899 | 03/11/1945 | 46.58 | |||||||||
3585 | 05/1899 | 31/01/1948 | 48.67 | |||||||||
3586 | 06/1899 | 08/11/1949 | 50.42 | |||||||||
3587 | 08/1899 | 09/12/1944 | 45.33 | |||||||||
3588 | 08/1899 | 19/12/1949 | 50.33 | |||||||||
3589 | 09/1899 | 16/08/1948 | 48.92 | |||||||||
3590 | 10/1899 | 07/04/1944 | 44.5 | |||||||||
3591 | 09/1899 | 05/1936 | 36.67 | |||||||||
3592 | 09/1899 | 04/04/1949 | 49.58 | |||||||||
3593 | 09/1899 | 11/1927 | 05/1905 to Metro Rbld |
28.17 | ||||||||
3594 | 10/1899 | 03/05/1947 | 47.58 | |||||||||
3595 | 10/1899 | 20/01/1945 | 45.25 | |||||||||
3596 | 10/1899 | 22/03/1945 | 45.42 | |||||||||
3597 | 10/1899 | 30/08/1948 | 48.83 | |||||||||
3598 | 10/1899 | 10/1936 | 37 | |||||||||
3599 | 11/1899 | 17/10/1949 | 49.92 | |||||||||
3600 | 3500 | 11/1899 | 04/1942 | 42.42 |