Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 71 Today
» 1021 Yesterday
» 4417 Week
» 4417 Month
» 71279 Year
» 1736655 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Dean "36xx" Class 2-4-2T


Class GWR GWR (1912 Renum) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
36xx 11 3600 12/1900       12/06/1933
36xx 3601   02/1902       03/1931
36xx 3602   02/1902       02/1931
36xx 3603   03/1902       05/1931
36xx 3604   03/1902       30/11/1934
36xx 3605   04/1902       12/1930
36xx 3606   04/1902       03/1931
36xx 3607   05/1902       04/1931
36xx 3608   05/1902       04/1931
36xx 3609   05/1902       03/1932
36xx 3610   05/1902       30/11/1934
36xx 3611   06/1902       02/1931
36xx 3612   06/1902       10/1930
36xx 3613   06/1902       05/1932
36xx 3614   06/1902       04/1931
36xx 3615   07/1902       04/1931
36xx 3616   07/1902       20/09/1933
36xx 3617   07/1902       29/03/1933
36xx 3618   07/1902       30/11/1934
36xx 3619   08/1902       04/1931
36xx 3620   08/1902       05/1931
36xx 3621   10/1903       05/01/1933
36xx 3622   10/1903       05/1932
36xx 3623   11/1903       04/1931
36xx 3624   11/1903       10/1931
36xx 3625   11/1903       07/1931
36xx 3626   12/1903       08/1932
36xx 3627   12/1903       20/01/1934
36xx 3628   12/1903       30/11/1934
36xx 3629   12/1903       11/1931
36xx 3630   12/1903       10/1930