Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 79 Today
» 1021 Yesterday
» 4425 Week
» 4425 Month
» 71287 Year
» 1736663 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Dean "36xx" Class 2-4-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
10/1930 Condemned 3612       COND  
10/1930 Condemned 3630       COND  
12/1930 Condemned 3605       COND  
02/1931 Condemned 3602       COND  
02/1931 Condemned 3611       COND  
03/1931 Condemned 3601       COND  
03/1931 Condemned 3606       COND  
04/1931 Condemned 3607       COND  
04/1931 Condemned 3608       COND  
04/1931 Condemned 3614       COND  
04/1931 Condemned 3615       COND  
04/1931 Condemned 3619       COND  
04/1931 Condemned 3623       COND  
05/1931 Condemned 3603       COND  
05/1931 Condemned 3620       COND  
07/1931 Condemned 3625       COND  
10/1931 Condemned 3624       COND  
11/1931 Condemned 3629       COND  
03/1932 Condemned 3609       COND  
05/1932 Condemned 3613       COND  
05/1932 Condemned 3622       COND  
08/1932 Condemned 3626       COND  
05/01/1933 Condemned 3621       COND  
29/03/1933 Condemned 3617       COND  
12/06/1933 Condemned 3600       COND  
20/09/1933 Condemned 3616       COND  
20/01/1934 Condemned 3627       COND  
30/11/1934 Condemned 3604       COND  
30/11/1934 Condemned 3610       COND  
30/11/1934 Condemned 3618       COND  
30/11/1934 Condemned 3628       COND