Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 129 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17932 Week
» 70948 Month
» 190475 Year
» 3217328 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
GWR Churchward "4300" Class 2-6-0
GWR (Orig) |
GWR (1st Renum) |
GWR (2nd Renum) |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Mileage |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
5300
|
8300
|
5300
|
11/1916 |
|
15/01/1953 |
|
36.17 |
|
|
|
|
|
5301
|
8301
|
|
12/1916 |
|
10/1937 |
|
20.83 |
|
|
|
|
|
5302
|
8302
|
5302
|
12/1916 |
|
26/05/1948 |
|
31.42 |
|
|
|
|
|
5304
|
8304
|
|
12/1916 |
|
05/1937 |
|
20.42 |
|
|
|
|
|
5305
|
8305
|
5305
|
01/1917 |
|
01/07/1952 |
|
35.5 |
|
|
|
|
|
5307
|
8307
|
5307
|
01/1917 |
|
26/11/1956 |
|
39.83 |
1,306,679 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
26/01/1957 |
40.06 |
5308
|
8308
|
|
02/1917 |
|
01/1939 |
|
21.92 |
|
|
|
|
|
5309
|
8309
|
5309
|
02/1917 |
|
27/01/1953 |
|
35.92 |
|
|
|
|
|
5313
|
8313
|
5313
|
06/1917 |
|
13/05/1958 |
|
40.92 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
11/10/1958 |
41.35 |
5314
|
8314
|
5314
|
06/1917 |
|
22/07/1957 |
|
40.08 |
1,183,059 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
07/09/1957 |
40.26 |
5315
|
8315
|
5315
|
07/1917 |
|
17/02/1959 |
|
41.58 |
|
|
|
|
|
5318
|
8318
|
5318
|
07/1917 |
|
04/09/1961 |
|
44.17 |
|
|
|
|
|
5320
|
8320
|
5320
|
08/1917 |
|
27/09/1948 |
|
31.08 |
|
|
|
|
|
5322
|
8322
|
5322
|
08/1917 |
|
24/04/1964 |
|
46.67 |
|
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
5325
|
8325
|
5325
|
09/1917 |
|
26/08/1957 |
|
39.92 |
1,279,486 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
02/11/1957 |
40.16 |
5326
|
8326
|
5326
|
09/1917 |
|
15/03/1962 |
|
44.5 |
|
|
|
|
|
5327
|
8327
|
5327
|
09/1917 |
|
02/07/1956 |
|
38.83 |
1,293,226 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
11/08/1956 |
38.93 |
5328
|
8328
|
5328
|
09/1917 |
|
29/07/1958 |
|
40.83 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
04/10/1958 |
41.08 |
5329
|
8329
|
|
09/1917 |
|
03/1939 |
|
21.5 |
|
|
|
|
|
5331
|
8331
|
5331
|
09/1917 |
|
10/11/1960 |
|
43.17 |
|
|
|
|
|
5332
|
8332
|
5332
|
11/1917 |
|
09/10/1961 |
|
43.92 |
|
|
|
|
|
5333
|
8333
|
5333
|
11/1917 |
|
16/05/1960 |
|
42.5 |
|
|
|
|
|
5334
|
8334
|
5334
|
11/1917 |
|
18/11/1957 |
|
40 |
1,255,557 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
28/12/1957 |
40.15 |
5335
|
8335
|
5335
|
12/1917 |
|
16/10/1958 |
|
40.83 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
27/12/1958 |
41.06 |
5337
|
8337
|
5337
|
12/1917 |
|
24/10/1960 |
|
42.83 |
|
|
|
|
|
5338
|
8338
|
5338
|
01/1918 |
|
11/08/1958 |
|
40.58 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
04/10/1958 |
40.75 |
5340
|
8340
|
5340
|
01/1918 |
|
27/09/1948 |
|
30.67 |
|
|
|
|
|
5341
|
8341
|
5341
|
02/1918 |
|
28/07/1959 |
|
41.42 |
|
|
|
|
|
5342
|
8342
|
|
02/1918 |
|
04/1937 |
|
19.17 |
|
|
|
|
|
5343
|
8343
|
5343
|
02/1918 |
|
03/07/1948 |
|
30.42 |
|
|
|
|
|
5344
|
8344
|
5344
|
03/1918 |
|
22/09/1958 |
|
40.5 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
29/11/1958 |
40.74 |
5350
|
8350
|
5350
|
07/1918 |
|
07/12/1959 |
|
41.42 |
|
|
|
|
|
5351
|
8351
|
5351
|
08/1918 |
|
13/06/1961 |
|
42.83 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
|
5352
|
8352
|
|
08/1918 |
|
06/1937 |
|
18.83 |
|
|
|
|
|
5353
|
8353
|
5353
|
08/1918 |
|
02/05/1960 |
|
41.75 |
|
|
|
|
|
5354
|
8354
|
|
08/1918 |
|
05/1937 |
|
18.75 |
|
|
|
|
|
5357
|
8357
|
5357
|
09/1918 |
|
21/09/1962 |
|
44 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
|
5358
|
8358
|
5358
|
09/1918 |
|
17/07/1962 |
|
43.83 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
|
|
5359
|
8359
|
5359
|
09/1918 |
|
22/10/1951 |
|
33.08 |
|
|
|
|
|
5360
|
8360
|
5360
|
01/1919 |
|
26/09/1958 |
|
39.67 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
01/11/1958 |
39.82 |
5361
|
8361
|
5361
|
02/1919 |
|
18/01/1960 |
|
40.92 |
|
|
|
|
|
5362
|
8362
|
5362
|
02/1919 |
|
22/07/1958 |
|
39.42 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
06/09/1958 |
39.58 |
5363
|
8363
|
|
02/1919 |
|
09/1937 |
|
18.58 |
|
|
|
|
|
5364
|
8364
|
5364
|
03/1919 |
|
16/07/1951 |
|
32.33 |
|
|
|
|
|
5365
|
8365
|
5365
|
04/1919 |
|
05/03/1951 |
|
31.92 |
|
|
|
|
|
5366
|
8366
|
|
05/1919 |
|
03/1939 |
|
19.83 |
|
|
|
|
|
5368
|
8368
|
5368
|
06/1919 |
|
25/09/1958 |
|
39.25 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
29/11/1958 |
39.48 |
5369
|
8369
|
5369
|
06/1919 |
|
20/11/1963 |
|
44.42 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
|
5372
|
8372
|
5372
|
07/1919 |
|
04/07/1958 |
|
39 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
06/09/1958 |
39.17 |
5373
|
8373
|
5373
|
07/1919 |
|
12/06/1950 |
|
30.92 |
|
|
|
|
|
5374
|
8374
|
5374
|
07/1919 |
|
14/06/1948 |
|
28.92 |
|
|
|
|
|
5376
|
8376
|
5376
|
08/1919 |
|
08/06/1962 |
|
42.83 |
|
|
|
|
|
5378
|
8378
|
5378
|
08/1919 |
|
14/09/1959 |
|
40.08 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
|
5379
|
8379
|
5379
|
08/1919 |
|
13/05/1958 |
|
38.75 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
12/07/1958 |
38.93 |
5381
|
8381
|
5381
|
06/1920 |
|
01/09/1959 |
|
39.25 |
|
|
|
|
|
5382
|
8382
|
5382
|
06/1920 |
|
23/04/1959 |
|
38.83 |
|
|
|
|
|
5383
|
8383
|
|
07/1920 |
|
05/1937 |
|
16.83 |
|
|
|
|
|
5384
|
8384
|
5384
|
07/1920 |
|
11/10/1960 |
|
40.25 |
|
|
|
|
|
5386
|
8386
|
5386
|
08/1920 |
|
20/10/1958 |
|
38.17 |
|
Cut |
Hayes (Bridgend) |
|
|
5387
|
8387
|
|
08/1920 |
|
03/1939 |
|
18.58 |
|
|
|
|
|
5388
|
8388
|
5388
|
08/1920 |
|
09/03/1959 |
|
38.58 |
|
|
|
|
|
5389
|
8389
|
|
09/1920 |
|
05/1937 |
|
16.67 |
|
|
|
|
|
5390
|
8390
|
5390
|
10/1920 |
|
13/08/1958 |
|
37.83 |
|
Cut |
Hayes (Bridgend) |
|
|
5391
|
8391
|
5391
|
10/1920 |
|
18/03/1957 |
|
36.42 |
1,145,457 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
20/04/1957 |
36.54 |
5393
|
8393
|
5393
|
10/1920 |
|
05/10/1959 |
|
39 |
|
|
|
|
|