GWR Collett "6100" Class 2-6-2T
Class | GWR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
6100 | 6100 | 04/1931 | TR RDG SLO RDG W |
Truro Reading (W.R.) Slough Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 14/12/1935 15/06/1947 07/08/1948 09/1958 |
29/09/1958 |
6100 | 6101 | 05/1931 | SLO SLO RDG 84E W |
Slough Slough Reading (W.R.) Tyseley Withdrawn |
07/03/1936 15/06/1947 07/08/1948 31/12/1960 03/1962 |
05/03/1962 |
6100 | 6102 | 05/1931 | PDN SHL 82A 82A 86E 86A 86E W |
Old Oak Common Southall Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Severn Tunnel Junction Ebbw Junction (Newport) Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn |
07/09/1946 15/06/1947 02/12/1950 31/12/1950 31/10/1953 25/11/1953 25/01/1958 08/1959 |
17/08/1959 |
6100 | 6103 | 05/1931 | OXF PDN OXF OXF RDG 83C W |
Oxford Old Oak Common Oxford Oxford Reading (W.R.) Exeter Withdrawn |
07/03/1936 26/01/1946 23/03/1946 15/06/1947 07/08/1948 26/03/1955 12/1964 |
26/12/1964 |
6100 | 6104 | 05/1931 | SLO 81F 81F 81D W |
Slough Oxford Oxford Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 19/04/1952 17/05/1952 12/07/1952 06/1960 |
30/06/1960 |
6100 | 6105 | 05/1931 | SLO RDG 84E 87H 84E 81E W |
Slough Reading (W.R.) Tyseley Neyland Tyseley Didcot Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 07/08/1948 03/10/1953 23/04/1955 21/05/1955 28/11/1959 03/1960 |
14/03/1960 |
6100 | 6106 | 05/1931 | PZ DID SLO 81F 81D 82C 85A 82C 81E 81C 81F W |
Penzance Didcot Slough Oxford Reading (W.R.) Swindon Worcester Swindon Didcot Southall Oxford Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 14/12/1935 15/06/1947 05/09/1953 09/03/1963 25/01/1964 20/07/1964 24/08/1964 08/11/1964 10/01/1965 19/09/1965 12/1965 |
31/12/1965 |
6100 | 6107 | 05/1931 | SLO 82A 82A 86G 86A 82A 83A 82A 81D W |
Slough Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Pontypool Road Ebbw Junction (Newport) Bristol Bath Road Newton Abbot Bristol Bath Road Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 02/12/1950 31/12/1950 31/10/1953 25/11/1953 30/01/1954 11/07/1959 08/08/1959 05/09/1959 11/1964 |
27/11/1964 |
6100 | 6108 | 05/1931 | SLO 81A 87H 88B 81F W |
Slough Old Oak Common Neyland Radyr Oxford Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 28/11/1959 16/07/1960 08/10/1960 12/10/1964 08/1965 |
06/08/1965 |
6100 | 6109 | 06/1931 | RDG OXF 82A 82A 81E 81D 81A 81C 81B 81E W |
Reading (W.R.) Oxford Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Didcot Reading (W.R.) Old Oak Common Southall Slough Didcot Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 07/08/1948 31/12/1950 31/01/1951 27/12/1952 21/02/1953 31/10/1953 16/06/1956 23/02/1957 16/07/1960 08/1962 |
29/08/1962 |
6100 | 6110 | 08/1931 | SHL 81A 81C 81A 81C 81A 81C 81F W |
Southall Old Oak Common Southall Old Oak Common Southall Old Oak Common Southall Oxford Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 11/07/1953 26/12/1959 13/08/1960 05/11/1960 20/07/1964 24/08/1964 28/03/1965 06/1965 |
16/06/1965 |
6100 | 6111 | 08/1931 | PDN DID W |
Old Oak Common Didcot Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 14/10/1948 12/1965 |
31/12/1965 |
6100 | 6112 | 08/1931 | PDN DID 81F 81F 81D 81C 81E 81C W |
Old Oak Common Didcot Oxford Oxford Reading (W.R.) Southall Didcot Southall Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 14/10/1948 28/02/1951 31/03/1951 03/10/1959 03/12/1960 24/02/1962 27/12/1964 09/1965 |
10/09/1965 |
6100 | 6113 | 08/1931 | SLO 81F 81A 81E 83B 88B 85B 82F 85B W |
Slough Oxford Old Oak Common Didcot Taunton Radyr Gloucester Horton Road Bath Green Park (S&D) Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 24/01/1953 05/10/1957 13/08/1960 12/08/1961 30/11/1963 12/10/1964 08/11/1964 29/11/1964 18/11/1965 |
18/11/1965 |
6100 | 6114 | 09/1931 | pdn SLO 82A 82A 86E 86A 83F 86A 86E 81D 87E 87H 86E 87G 86E 86G 86E W |
Aylesbury (GWR) Slough Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Severn Tunnel Junction Ebbw Junction (Newport) Truro Ebbw Junction (Newport) Severn Tunnel Junction Reading (W.R.) Landore Neyland Severn Tunnel Junction Carmarthen Severn Tunnel Junction Pontypool Road Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 15/06/1947 14/07/1951 31/07/1951 31/10/1953 25/11/1953 16/06/1956 14/07/1956 25/01/1958 04/10/1958 11/07/1959 17/06/1961 24/03/1962 16/06/1962 09/02/1963 30/11/1963 22/06/1964 10/1964 |
23/10/1964 |
6100 | 6115 | 09/1931 | RDG RDG SLO 81D 81B 86G 86E W |
Reading (W.R.) Reading (W.R.) Slough Reading (W.R.) Slough Pontypool Road Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 15/06/1947 07/08/1948 16/07/1955 06/10/1956 25/02/1961 22/06/1964 11/1964 |
06/11/1964 |
6100 | 6116 | 09/1931 | SLO 81E 81E 84E 87J 88B W |
Slough Didcot Didcot Tyseley Fishguard Goodwick Radyr Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 08/09/1951 30/09/1951 31/10/1953 14/07/1962 04/05/1963 06/1965 |
16/06/1965 |
6100 | 6117 | 09/1931 | rdg PDN PDN 81D 81D 81B 81C W |
Basingstoke (GWR) Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Reading (W.R.) Reading (W.R.) Slough Southall Withdrawn |
11/01/1936 15/06/1947 24/01/1948 19/04/1952 17/05/1952 09/08/1958 22/02/1964 09/1965 |
10/09/1965 |
6100 | 6118 | 09/1931 | SHL DID 84E 86E 87G 87H 81D W |
Southall Didcot Tyseley Severn Tunnel Junction Carmarthen Neyland Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 14/10/1948 03/10/1953 09/08/1958 16/06/1962 09/02/1963 28/09/1963 11/1963 |
25/11/1963 |
6100 | 6119 | 09/1931 | SLO 86E 81C 86E 83A 81D W |
Slough Severn Tunnel Junction Southall Severn Tunnel Junction Newton Abbot Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 24/03/1956 11/08/1956 01/12/1956 11/07/1959 28/11/1959 03/1963 |
01/03/1963 |
6100 | 6120 | 09/1931 | PDN 81E W |
Old Oak Common Didcot Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 05/11/1960 04/1962 |
13/04/1962 |
6100 | 6121 | 10/1931 | PDN PDN 84E 81A W |
Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Tyseley Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 24/01/1948 03/10/1953 31/10/1953 07/1960 |
21/07/1960 |
6100 | 6122 | 10/1931 | OXF 81B 81D 81D 82C W |
Oxford Slough Reading (W.R.) Reading (W.R.) Swindon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 06/10/1956 16/05/1959 30/11/1963 24/08/1964 09/1964 |
21/09/1964 |
6100 | 6123 | 10/1931 | SLO 81D 81B 81E W |
Slough Reading (W.R.) Slough Didcot Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 13/08/1955 09/08/1958 18/06/1960 04/1962 |
05/04/1962 |
6100 | 6124 | 10/1931 | SLO 81E 81F 81A 88B W |
Slough Didcot Oxford Old Oak Common Radyr Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 28/11/1959 27/01/1962 04/05/1963 04/05/1964 06/1964 |
15/06/1964 |
6100 | 6125 | 10/1931 | SHL 81A 81D 87G 86E 87H 81A 81C W |
Southall Old Oak Common Reading (W.R.) Carmarthen Severn Tunnel Junction Neyland Old Oak Common Southall Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/10/1959 28/11/1959 16/07/1960 20/05/1961 15/07/1961 21/04/1962 24/08/1964 01/1965 |
15/01/1965 |
6100 | 6126 | 10/1931 | SLO 81C 81D 81B 85B 81E 81F W |
Slough Southall Reading (W.R.) Slough Gloucester Horton Road Didcot Oxford Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 25/02/1950 27/12/1952 20/04/1957 31/12/1960 19/05/1962 04/05/1964 12/1965 |
31/12/1965 |
6100 | 6127 | 10/1931 | SLO W |
Slough Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/1962 |
05/03/1962 |
6100 | 6128 | 10/1931 | SHL 85D 81B 85B 81C 85B W |
Southall Kidderminster Slough Gloucester Horton Road Southall Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 13/08/1960 24/03/1962 04/05/1964 08/11/1964 10/01/1965 03/1965 |
26/03/1965 |
6100 | 6129 | 11/1931 | PDN 91W 91W 81D 81D 81F 84C 2C W |
Old Oak Common To Western Region / GWR To Western Region / GWR Reading (W.R.) Reading (W.R.) Oxford Banbury Stourbridge Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 19/05/1951 23/06/1951 14/07/1951 31/07/1951 03/12/1960 08/09/1962 16/01/1965 09/1965 |
18/09/1965 |
6100 | 6130 | 09/1932 | pdn RDG 81E 82C W |
Aylesbury (GWR) Reading (W.R.) Didcot Swindon Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 15/06/1947 20/05/1961 25/01/1964 07/1964 |
06/07/1964 |
6100 | 6131 | 10/1932 | NA RDG RDG SLO 81D W |
Newton Abbot Reading (W.R.) Reading (W.R.) Slough Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 07/03/1936 15/06/1947 07/08/1948 09/08/1958 09/1964 |
01/09/1964 |
6100 | 6132 | 10/1932 | PDN DID 81B 81B 86E 81A 81C 81F W |
Old Oak Common Didcot Slough Slough Severn Tunnel Junction Old Oak Common Southall Oxford Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 10/09/1949 14/07/1951 31/07/1951 03/12/1955 31/12/1955 05/11/1960 19/09/1965 10/1965 |
01/10/1965 |
6100 | 6133 | 10/1932 | SLO 81F 81C W |
Slough Oxford Southall Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 28/11/1959 30/01/1960 12/1963 |
02/12/1963 |
6100 | 6134 | 10/1932 | PDN DID 84E 84D 86E 81D 81C 81F W |
Old Oak Common Didcot Tyseley Leamington Severn Tunnel Junction Reading (W.R.) Southall Oxford Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/12/1949 03/10/1953 30/11/1957 25/01/1958 22/03/1958 10/01/1965 19/09/1965 12/1965 |
31/12/1965 |
6100 | 6135 | 10/1932 | PDN 81D 81C 81F W |
Old Oak Common Reading (W.R.) Southall Oxford Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 12/10/1964 10/01/1965 19/09/1965 12/1965 |
31/12/1965 |
6100 | 6136 | 10/1932 | RDG SLO 81E 81F W |
Reading (W.R.) Slough Didcot Oxford Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 07/08/1948 10/09/1960 11/07/1965 12/1965 |
31/12/1965 |
6100 | 6137 | 10/1932 | PDN PDN 82A 85B 2A 2C W |
Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Gloucester Horton Road Tyseley Stourbridge Junction Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 15/06/1947 16/07/1955 04/10/1958 06/10/1963 30/11/1963 11/1964 |
21/11/1964 |
6100 | 6138 | 11/1932 | OXF 81D W |
Oxford Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 14/07/1962 09/1963 |
20/09/1963 |
6100 | 6139 | 11/1932 | SHL 84E 81F 81E 81C W |
Southall Tyseley Oxford Didcot Southall Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/10/1953 28/11/1959 26/03/1960 25/01/1964 11/1964 |
27/11/1964 |
6100 | 6140 | 11/1932 | RDG SLO 81D 83B 86E 85A W |
Reading (W.R.) Slough Reading (W.R.) Taunton Severn Tunnel Junction Worcester Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 07/08/1948 09/08/1958 11/07/1959 28/11/1959 25/01/1964 07/1964 |
13/07/1964 |
6100 | 6141 | 11/1932 | PDN 81C 81A 81C 82E W |
Old Oak Common Southall Old Oak Common Southall Bristol Barrow Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 26/03/1960 05/11/1960 24/08/1964 07/11/1965 12/1965 |
31/12/1965 |
6100 | 6142 | 11/1932 | PDN 81C W |
Old Oak Common Southall Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 24/08/1964 09/1964 |
07/09/1964 |
6100 | 6143 | 11/1932 | SLO 81C 81F W |
Slough Southall Oxford Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 22/06/1964 07/11/1965 18/11/1965 |
18/11/1965 |
6100 | 6144 | 11/1932 | PDN PDN 81C 85D 81F 85A 88J W |
Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Southall Kidderminster Oxford Worcester Aberdare Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 15/06/1947 30/01/1960 13/08/1960 19/05/1962 30/11/1963 28/12/1963 06/1964 |
15/06/1964 |
6100 | 6145 | 12/1932 | SLO RDG 81A 81F W |
Slough Reading (W.R.) Old Oak Common Oxford (Re-instd) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 07/08/1948 12/06/1958 16/06/1965 26/06/1965 12/1965 |
31/12/1965 |
6100 | 6146 | 12/1932 | PDN SLO 83C 83B W |
Old Oak Common Slough Exeter Taunton Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 15/06/1947 13/08/1960 19/05/1962 09/1962 |
21/09/1962 |
6100 | 6147 | 02/01/1933 | SHL 82B 82E 83C 85A W |
Southall St Philips Marsh Bristol Barrow Road Westbury Worcester Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/12/1960 03/11/1962 02/11/1963 25/01/1964 12/1965 |
31/12/1965 |
6100 | 6148 | 03/01/1933 | SHL 87H 83B 82B 82E 83B W |
Southall Neyland Taunton St Philips Marsh Bristol Barrow Road Taunton Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 05/11/1960 12/08/1961 09/03/1963 06/04/1963 22/06/1964 09/1964 |
07/09/1964 |
6100 | 6149 | 05/01/1933 | PDN 81C 81F 87A W |
Old Oak Common Southall Oxford Neath (Court Sart) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 28/11/1959 17/06/1961 28/12/1963 06/1964 |
15/06/1964 |
6100 | 6150 | 03/02/1933 | SLO 81F W |
Slough Oxford Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 28/01/1961 03/1965 |
08/03/1965 |
6100 | 6151 | 10/02/1933 | PDN SLO 87G 86G W |
Old Oak Common Slough Carmarthen Pontypool Road Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 15/06/1947 14/07/1962 04/05/1963 11/1963 |
29/11/1963 |
6100 | 6152 | 16/02/1933 | SLO W |
Slough Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/1962 |
24/01/1962 |
6100 | 6153 | 23/02/1933 | SLO RDG 82A 82A 81B 81B 81D W |
Slough Reading (W.R.) Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Slough Slough Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/09/1948 31/12/1950 31/01/1951 14/07/1951 31/07/1951 26/03/1955 01/1962 |
24/01/1962 |
6100 | 6154 | 10/03/1933 | rdg RDG SLO 81F W |
Basingstoke (GWR) Reading (W.R.) Slough Oxford Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 15/06/1947 07/08/1948 16/07/1960 06/1965 |
16/06/1965 |
6100 | 6155 | 07/03/1933 | PDN 86E 83B 85A W |
Old Oak Common Severn Tunnel Junction Taunton Worcester Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 25/02/1956 18/06/1960 03/11/1962 10/1965 |
01/10/1965 |
6100 | 6156 | 16/03/1933 | SHL 81E 81F 81A 81C 81E 81C 81F W |
Southall Didcot Oxford Old Oak Common Southall Didcot Southall Oxford Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 16/07/1960 15/07/1961 20/07/1964 24/08/1964 12/10/1964 16/05/1965 07/11/1965 03/12/1965 |
03/12/1965 |
6100 | 6157 | 22/03/1933 | SLO 81D 81C 81A 83B W |
Slough Reading (W.R.) Southall Old Oak Common Taunton Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 25/01/1958 04/10/1958 28/11/1959 15/07/1961 05/1962 |
11/05/1962 |
6100 | 6158 | 28/03/1933 | PDN 86E 88J W |
Old Oak Common Severn Tunnel Junction Aberdare Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 12/08/1961 02/11/1963 06/1964 |
15/06/1964 |
6100 | 6159 | 06/04/1933 | PDN 81C 81E W |
Old Oak Common Southall Didcot Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 28/11/1959 13/08/1960 06/1965 |
16/06/1965 |
6100 | 6160 | 12/10/1935 | SLO SLO 84E 81B 81C 85B W |
Slough Slough Tyseley Slough Southall Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
14/12/1935 15/06/1947 13/07/1957 07/09/1957 22/06/1964 08/08/1965 12/1965 |
31/12/1965 |
6100 | 6161 | 14/10/1935 | SLO SLO 81D 81C 81F W |
Slough Slough Reading (W.R.) Southall Oxford Withdrawn |
11/01/1936 15/06/1947 17/05/1952 10/01/1965 19/09/1965 10/1965 |
01/10/1965 |
6100 | 6162 | 15/10/1935 | SHL RDG 81C W |
Southall Reading (W.R.) Southall Withdrawn |
14/12/1935 15/06/1947 25/02/1961 03/1962 |
07/03/1962 |
6100 | 6163 | 18/10/1935 | SHL RDG 82C 82A 81F 81A 81C W |
Southall Reading (W.R.) Swindon Bristol Bath Road Oxford Old Oak Common Southall Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 15/06/1947 23/04/1955 16/07/1955 25/01/1958 30/01/1960 24/08/1964 10/1965 |
01/10/1965 |
6100 | 6164 | 21/10/1935 | PDN SLO 81E 81A 81D W |
Old Oak Common Slough Didcot Old Oak Common Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
07/03/1936 15/06/1947 28/11/1959 05/11/1960 14/07/1962 11/1963 |
25/11/1963 |
6100 | 6165 | 25/10/1935 | SHL 81D 81A 81C 85A W |
Southall Reading (W.R.) Old Oak Common Southall Worcester Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 28/12/1963 20/07/1964 24/08/1964 07/11/1965 12/1965 |
31/12/1965 |
6100 | 6166 | 28/10/1935 | PDN 91W 91W 81E 81E 84E 86E 83A 83D 83A W |
Old Oak Common To Western Region / GWR To Western Region / GWR Didcot Didcot Tyseley Severn Tunnel Junction Newton Abbot Laira Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 19/05/1951 23/06/1951 14/07/1951 31/07/1951 03/10/1953 02/11/1957 11/07/1959 03/10/1959 10/09/1960 01/1962 |
19/01/1962 |
6100 | 6167 | 31/10/1935 | SLO 81C W |
Slough Southall Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 22/06/1964 10/1965 |
01/10/1965 |
6100 | 6168 | 01/11/1935 | PDN DID PDN 81F 81A W |
Old Oak Common Didcot Old Oak Common Oxford Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 14/10/1948 13/08/1949 20/05/1961 07/10/1961 03/1962 |
15/03/1962 |
6100 | 6169 | 07/11/1935 | SHL 81A 88B 85A W |
Southall Old Oak Common Radyr Worcester Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 05/11/1960 04/05/1964 22/06/1964 10/1965 |
26/10/1965 |