GWR Collett "8100" Class 2-6-2T
Class | GWR (Orig.) | GWR | GWR (51xx) | GWR (81xx) | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
8100 | 99 | 3100 | 5100 | 8100 | 09/1903 | LMTN W |
Leamington Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/10/1962 |
04/10/1962 |
8100 | 3115 | 5115 | 8109 | 02/1905 | LMTN 84E W |
Leamington Tyseley Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/12/1960 06/1965 |
26/06/1965 | |
8100 | 3116 | 5116 | 8107 | 02/1905 | TYS WTD 85B 85A W |
Tyseley Whitland Gloucester Horton Road Worcester Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 15/06/1947 08/10/1960 12/08/1961 05/1962 |
18/05/1962 | |
8100 | 3118 | 5118 | 8102 | 02/1905 | WTD 87G 87A 82E 83C 85A W |
Whitland Carmarthen Neath (Court Sart) Bristol Barrow Road Westbury Worcester Withdrawn |
01/12/1945 15/06/1947 05/10/1957 31/12/1960 06/04/1963 02/11/1963 25/01/1964 05/1964 |
14/05/1964 | |
8100 | 3120 | 5120 | 8106 | 03/1905 | WOS W |
Worcester Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 12/1963 |
28/12/1963 | |
8100 | 3123 | 5123 | 8101 | 05/1905 | KDR W |
Kidderminster Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/1961 |
22/03/1961 | |
8100 | 3124 | 5124 | 8104 | 05/1905 | NEA 83F 87A 85A 85A W |
Neath (Court Sart) Truro Neath (Court Sart) Worcester Worcester Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 16/06/1956 14/07/1956 06/10/1962 02/11/1963 12/1964 |
26/12/1964 | |
8100 | 3126 | 5126 | 8105 | 06/1905 | brd SPM BRD SPM SPM BRD 85A 85A W |
Weston-super-Mare St Philips Marsh Bristol Bath Road St Philips Marsh St Philips Marsh Bristol Bath Road Worcester Worcester Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 15/06/1947 04/09/1948 14/10/1948 10/09/1949 05/11/1949 01/12/1951 31/12/1951 06/1957 |
20/06/1957 | |
8100 | 3133 | 5133 | 8108 | 01/1906 | TYS W |
Tyseley Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 29/11/1960 |
29/11/1960 | |
8100 | 3145 | 5145 | 8103 | 03/1906 | OSY 87G 87H 87G 87F 88G 88B W |
Oswestry Carmarthen Neyland Carmarthen Llanelli Llantrisant Radyr Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/11/1952 31/10/1959 28/11/1959 14/07/1962 28/09/1963 02/11/1963 28/11/1963 |
28/11/1963 |