GWR Collett "8100" Class 2-6-2T
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 8100 | LMTN | Leamington | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 8109 | LMTN | Leamington | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 8107 | TYS | Tyseley | WTD | Whitland | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 8102 | 217 | WTD | Whitland | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 8106 | WOS | Worcester | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 8101 | KDR | Kidderminster | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 8104 | NEATH | Neath (Court Sart) | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 8105 | BRD.1 | Weston-super-Mare | SPM | St Philips Marsh | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 8108 | TYS | Tyseley | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 8103 | OSY | Oswestry | |||
04/09/1948 | Reallocation | 8105 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |
14/10/1948 | Reallocation | 8105 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | SPM | St Philips Marsh | |
10/09/1949 | Reallocation | 8105 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | SPM | St Philips Marsh | |
05/11/1949 | Reallocation | 8105 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |
01/12/1951 | Reallocation | 8105 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 85A | Worcester | |
31/12/1951 | Reallocation | 8105 | 85A | Worcester | 85A | Worcester | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 8103 | OSY | Oswestry | 87G | Carmarthen | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 8104 | NEATH | Neath (Court Sart) | 83F | Truro | |
14/07/1956 | Reallocation | 8104 | 83F | Truro | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | |
20/06/1957 | Condemned | 8105 | 98W | COND | |||
05/10/1957 | Reallocation | 8102 | WTD | Whitland | 87G | Carmarthen | |
31/10/1959 | Reallocation | 8103 | 87G | Carmarthen | 87H | Neyland | |
28/11/1959 | Reallocation | 8103 | 87H | Neyland | 87G | Carmarthen | |
08/10/1960 | Reallocation | 8107 | WTD | Whitland | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
29/11/1960 | Condemned | 8108 | TYS | Tyseley | COND | ||
03/12/1960 | Reallocation | 8109 | LMTN | Leamington | 84E | Tyseley | |
31/12/1960 | Reallocation | 8102 | 87G | Carmarthen | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | |
22/03/1961 | Condemned | 8101 | 98W | COND | |||
12/08/1961 | Reallocation | 8107 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 85A | Worcester | |
18/05/1962 | Condemned | 8107 | 98W | COND | |||
14/07/1962 | Reallocation | 8103 | 87G | Carmarthen | 87F | Llanelli | |
04/10/1962 | Condemned | 8100 | LMTN | Leamington | COND | ||
06/10/1962 | Reallocation | 8104 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 85A | Worcester | |
06/04/1963 | Reallocation | 8102 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | |
28/09/1963 | Reallocation | 8103 | 87F | Llanelli | 88G | Llantrisant | |
02/11/1963 | Reallocation | 8102 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 83C | Westbury | |
02/11/1963 | Reallocation | 8104 | 85A | Worcester | 85A | Worcester | |
02/11/1963 | Reallocation | 8103 | 88G | Llantrisant | 88B | Radyr | |
28/11/1963 | Condemned | 8103 | 88B | Radyr | COND | ||
28/12/1963 | Condemned | 8106 | 98W | COND | |||
25/01/1964 | Reallocation | 8102 | 83C | Westbury | 85A | Worcester | |
14/05/1964 | Condemned | 8102 | 98W | COND | |||
26/12/1964 | Condemned | 8104 | 98W | COND | |||
26/06/1965 | Condemned | 8109 | 98W | COND |