GWR Dean "3300" Class 4-4-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/1929 | Condemned | 3320 | COND | ||||
01/1930 | Condemned | 3365 | COND | ||||
04/1930 | Condemned | 3334 | COND | ||||
03/1931 | Condemned | 3317 | COND | ||||
03/1931 | Condemned | 3351 | COND | ||||
04/1931 | Condemned | 3301 | COND | ||||
04/1931 | Condemned | 3312 | COND | ||||
06/1931 | Condemned | 3315 | COND | ||||
10/1931 | Condemned | 3332 | COND | ||||
05/1932 | Condemned | 3303 | COND | ||||
05/1932 | Condemned | 3310 | COND | ||||
05/1932 | Condemned | 3311 | COND | ||||
05/1932 | Condemned | 3319 | COND | ||||
05/1932 | Condemned | 3329 | COND | ||||
07/1932 | Condemned | 3302 | COND | ||||
10/1932 | Condemned | 3333 | COND | ||||
04/11/1933 | Condemned | 3338 | 98W | COND | |||
04/11/1933 | Condemned | 3352 | 98W | COND | |||
24/11/1933 | Condemned | 3326 | 98W | COND | |||
02/01/1934 | Condemned | 3346 | 98W | COND | |||
13/01/1934 | Condemned | 3344 | 98W | COND | |||
13/01/1934 | Condemned | 3355 | 98W | COND | |||
03/02/1934 | Condemned | 3331 | 98W | COND | |||
10/02/1934 | Condemned | 3307 | 98W | COND | |||
10/02/1934 | Condemned | 3318 | 98W | COND | |||
28/03/1934 | Condemned | 3343 | 98W | COND | |||
04/04/1934 | Condemned | 3328 | 98W | COND | |||
24/05/1934 | Condemned | 3337 | 98W | COND | |||
02/06/1934 | Condemned | 3309 | 98W | COND | |||
02/06/1934 | Condemned | 3340 | 98W | COND | |||
01/11/1934 | Condemned | 3394 | 98W | COND | |||
16/11/1934 | Condemned | 3314 | 98W | COND | |||
16/11/1934 | Condemned | 3348 | 98W | COND | |||
16/11/1934 | Condemned | 3349 | 98W | COND | |||
16/11/1934 | Condemned | 3354 | 98W | COND | |||
17/11/1934 | Condemned | 3304 | 98W | COND | |||
17/11/1934 | Condemned | 3397 | 98W | COND | |||
30/11/1934 | Condemned | 3357 | 98W | COND | |||
30/11/1934 | Condemned | 3360 | 98W | COND | |||
30/11/1934 | Condemned | 3385 | 98W | COND | |||
06/12/1934 | Condemned | 3387 | 98W | COND | |||
03/1935 | Condemned | 3322 | COND | ||||
03/1935 | Condemned | 3368 | COND | ||||
04/1935 | Condemned | 3321 | COND | ||||
06/1935 | Condemned | 3324 | COND | ||||
07/1935 | Condemned | 3350 | COND | ||||
08/1935 | Condemned | 3323 | COND | ||||
09/1935 | Condemned | 3325 | COND | ||||
09/1935 | Condemned | 3367 | COND | ||||
09/1935 | Condemned | 3398 | COND | ||||
10/1935 | Condemned | 3388 | COND | ||||
11/1935 | Condemned | 3381 | COND | ||||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 3305 | SDN.1 | Andover Junction (MSWJR) | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 3306 | WES | Westbury | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 3364 | SDN | Swindon | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 3376 | SDN.1 | Andover Junction (MSWJR) | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 3378 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 3412 | BRD.1 | Weston-super-Mare | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 3416 | TN.1 | Barnstaple | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 3417 | TYS.1 | Stratford-on-Avon (GWR) | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 3421 | SDN | Swindon | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 3426 | TYS.1 | Stratford-on-Avon (GWR) | |||
01/1936 | Condemned | 3300 | COND | ||||
01/1936 | Condemned | 3336 | COND | ||||
01/1936 | Condemned | 3345 | COND | ||||
01/1936 | Condemned | 3356 | COND | ||||
11/01/1936 | Reallocation | 3395 | BAN | Banbury | |||
11/01/1936 | Reallocation | 3419 | NA | Newton Abbot | |||
08/02/1936 | Reallocation | 3327 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | |||
08/02/1936 | Reallocation | 3403 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | |||
08/02/1936 | Reallocation | 3408 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |||
08/02/1936 | Reallocation | 3411 | TDU | Tondu | |||
03/1936 | Condemned | 3327 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | COND | ||
03/1936 | Condemned | 3422 | COND | ||||
07/03/1936 | Reallocation | 3408 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | WES | Westbury | |
07/03/1936 | Reallocation | 3432 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |||
13/03/1936 | Condemned | 3412 | 98W | COND | |||
04/1936 | Condemned | 3339 | COND | ||||
05/1936 | Condemned | 3384 | COND | ||||
05/1936 | Condemned | 3424 | COND | ||||
15/05/1936 | Condemned | 3416 | 98W | COND | |||
07/1936 | Condemned | 3389 | COND | ||||
07/1936 | Condemned | 3439 | COND | ||||
08/1936 | Condemned | 3347 | COND | ||||
08/1936 | Condemned | 3413 | COND | ||||
09/1936 | Condemned | 3305 | SDN.1 | Andover Junction (MSWJR) | COND | ||
09/1936 | Condemned | 3359 | COND | ||||
10/1936 | Condemned | 3372 | COND | ||||
10/1936 | Condemned | 3428 | COND | ||||
11/1936 | Condemned | 3410 | COND | ||||
01/1937 | Condemned | 3392 | COND | ||||
01/1937 | Condemned | 3403 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | COND | ||
02/1937 | Condemned | 3415 | COND | ||||
03/1937 | Condemned | 3402 | COND | ||||
04/1937 | Condemned | 3362 | COND | ||||
04/1937 | Condemned | 3405 | COND | ||||
06/1937 | Condemned | 3374 | COND | ||||
07/1937 | Condemned | 3434 | COND | ||||
09/1937 | Condemned | 3404 | COND | ||||
09/1937 | Condemned | 3420 | COND | ||||
02/1938 | Condemned | 3425 | COND | ||||
03/1938 | Condemned | 3380 | COND | ||||
04/1938 | Condemned | 3316 | COND | ||||
04/1938 | Condemned | 3427 | COND | ||||
08/1938 | Condemned | 3308 | COND | ||||
08/1938 | Condemned | 3330 | COND | ||||
10/1938 | Condemned | 3342 | COND | ||||
10/1938 | Condemned | 3411 | TDU | Tondu | COND | ||
10/1938 | Condemned | 3414 | COND | ||||
12/1938 | Condemned | 3436 | COND | ||||
01/1939 | Condemned | 3306 | WES | Westbury | COND | ||
01/1939 | Condemned | 3409 | COND | ||||
01/1939 | Condemned | 3423 | COND | ||||
02/1939 | Condemned | 3370 | COND | ||||
02/1939 | Condemned | 3373 | COND | ||||
03/1939 | Condemned | 3390 | COND | ||||
03/1939 | Condemned | 3437 | COND | ||||
04/1939 | Condemned | 3433 | COND | ||||
09/1939 | Condemned | 3429 | COND | ||||
08/11/1944 | Condemned | 3371 | 98W | COND | |||
03/11/1945 | Condemned | 3389 | 98W | COND | |||
03/11/1945 | Condemned | 3435 | 98W | COND | |||
30/11/1945 | Condemned | 3358 | 98W | COND | |||
30/11/1945 | Condemned | 3378 | 98W | COND | |||
04/04/1946 | Condemned | 3313 | 98W | COND | |||
07/12/1946 | Condemned | 3353 | 98W | COND | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3335 | EXE | Exeter | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3341 | NA | Newton Abbot | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3361 | TN | Taunton | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3363 | WES | Westbury | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3364 | SDN | Swindon | WES | Westbury | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3366 | CHR | Chester West | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3375 | NA | Newton Abbot | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3376 | SDN.1 | Andover Junction (MSWJR) | DID | Didcot | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3377 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3379 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3382 | WOS | Worcester | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3383 | NA | Newton Abbot | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3386 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3391 | LA | Laira | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3393 | WOS | Worcester | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3395 | BAN | Banbury | EXE | Exeter | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3396 | DID | Didcot | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3399 | CHR | Chester West | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3400 | NA | Newton Abbot | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3401 | LA | Laira | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3406 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3407 | NA | Newton Abbot | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3408 | WES | Westbury | DID | Didcot | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3417 | TYS.1 | Stratford-on-Avon (GWR) | WLN | Wellington | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3418 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3419 | NA | Newton Abbot | DID | Didcot | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3421 | SDN | Swindon | SDN | Swindon | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3426 | TYS.1 | Stratford-on-Avon (GWR) | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3430 | NA | Newton Abbot | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3431 | LA | Laira | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3432 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | HFD | Hereford | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3438 | WES | Westbury | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3440 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | |||
11/09/1947 | Condemned | 3375 | 98W | COND | |||
17/09/1947 | Condemned | 3361 | 98W | COND | |||
08/10/1947 | Condemned | 3399 | 98W | COND | |||
21/02/1948 | Reallocation | 3418 | RDGw | Reading (W.R.) | SHL | Southall | |
01/03/1948 | Condemned | 3396 | 98W | COND | |||
10/04/1948 | Condemned | 3408 | 98W | COND | |||
19/04/1948 | Condemned | 3421 | 98W | COND | |||
24/04/1948 | Condemned | 3366 | 98W | COND | |||
24/04/1948 | Condemned | 3417 | 98W | COND | |||
14/05/1948 | Condemned | 3391 | 98W | COND | |||
19/06/1948 | Condemned | 3379 | 98W | COND | |||
21/06/1948 | Condemned | 3440 | 98W | COND | |||
20/08/1948 | Condemned | 3395 | 98W | COND | |||
04/09/1948 | Reallocation | 3401 | LA | Laira | HFD | Hereford | |
27/09/1948 | Condemned | 3376 | 98W | COND | |||
04/10/1948 | Condemned | 3335 | 98W | COND | |||
27/11/1948 | Reallocation | 3400 | NA | Newton Abbot | EXE | Exeter | |
02/12/1948 | Condemned | 3430 | 98W | COND | |||
08/12/1948 | Condemned | 3431 | 98W | COND | |||
26/02/1949 | Reallocation | 3341 | NA | Newton Abbot | EXE | Exeter | |
10/05/1949 | Condemned | 3400 | 98W | COND | |||
21/06/1949 | Condemned | 3364 | 98W | COND | |||
15/08/1949 | Condemned | 3418 | 98W | COND | |||
18/08/1949 | Condemned | 3419 | 98W | COND | |||
21/10/1949 | Condemned | 3363 | 98W | COND | |||
26/10/1949 | Condemned | 3438 | 98W | COND | |||
05/11/1949 | Reallocation | 3432 | HFD | Hereford | WOS | Worcester | |
22/11/1949 | Condemned | 3341 | 98W | COND | |||
22/11/1949 | Condemned | 3386 | 98W | COND | |||
25/11/1949 | Condemned | 3382 | 98W | COND | |||
28/11/1949 | Condemned | 3393 | 98W | COND | |||
29/11/1949 | Condemned | 3401 | 98W | COND | |||
03/12/1949 | Reallocation | 3377 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | WOS | Worcester | |
03/12/1949 | Reallocation | 3406 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | HFD | Hereford | |
06/12/1949 | Condemned | 3432 | 98W | COND | |||
08/12/1949 | Condemned | 3407 | 98W | COND | |||
13/12/1949 | Condemned | 3383 | 98W | COND | |||
14/12/1949 | Condemned | 3426 | 98W | COND | |||
31/01/1951 | Condemned | 3406 | 98W | COND | |||
21/03/1951 | Condemned | 3377 | 98W | COND |