GWR Dean "3300" Class 4-4-0
GWR (Orig) | GWR (1912) | Date To Service | Rebuilt From | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
3253 | 3300 | 05/1895 | 11/1908 from 3252 |
01/1936 | 40.67 | ||||||
3262 | 3301 | 04/1896 | 10/1906 from 3252 |
04/1931 | 35 | ||||||
3263 | 3302 | 04/1896 | 07/1907 from 3252 |
07/1932 | 36.25 | ||||||
3264 | 3303 | 05/1896 | 12/1907 from 3252 |
05/1932 | 36 | ||||||
3268 | 3304 | 06/1896 | 06/1907 from 3252 |
17/11/1934 | 38.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 09/02/1935 | 38.68 | ||
3269 | 3305 | 06/1896 | 05/1907 from 3252 |
09/1936 | 40.25 | ||||||
3273 | 3306 | 11/1896 | 02/1902 from 3252 |
01/1939 | 42.17 | ||||||
3279 | 3307 | 01/1897 | 12/1907 from 3252 |
10/02/1934 | 37.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 02/06/1934 | 37.40 | ||
3280 | 3308 | 01/1897 | 01/1909 from 3252 |
08/1938 | 41.58 | ||||||
3282 | 3309 | 02/1897 | 07/1907 from 3252 |
02/06/1934 | 37.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 28/07/1934 | 37.47 | ||
3286 | 3310 | 02/1897 | 09/1908 from 3252 |
05/1932 | 35.25 | ||||||
3312 | 3311 | 10/1898 | 03/1906 from 3252 |
05/1932 | 33.58 | ||||||
3316 | 3312 | 03/1899 | 02/1908 from 3252 |
04/1931 | 32.08 | ||||||
3318 | 3313 | 04/1899 | 02/1908 from 3252 |
04/04/1946 | 47 | ||||||
3322 | 3314 | 04/1899 | 11/1907 from 3252 |
16/11/1934 | 35.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 15/12/1934 | 35.69 | ||
3324 | 3315 | 06/1899 | 12/1908 from 3252 |
06/1931 | 32 | ||||||
3325 | 3316 | 06/1899 | 12/1908 from 3252 |
04/1938 | 38.83 | ||||||
3327 | 3317 | 07/1899 | 05/1908 from 3252 |
03/1931 | 31.67 | ||||||
3330 | 3318 | 07/1899 | 12/1908 from 3252 |
10/02/1934 | 34.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 05/05/1934 | 34.83 | ||
3331 | 3319 | 08/1899 | 07/1907 from 3252 |
05/1932 | 32.75 | ||||||
3332 | 3320 | 11/1899 | 08/1929 | 29.75 | |||||||
3333 | 3321 | 11/1899 | 04/1935 | 35.42 | |||||||
3334 | 3322 | 11/1899 | 03/1935 | 35.33 | |||||||
3335 | 3323 | 11/1899 | 08/1935 | 35.75 | |||||||
3336 | 3324 | 12/1899 | 06/1935 | 35.5 | |||||||
3337 | 3325 | 12/1899 | 09/1935 | 35.75 | |||||||
3338 | 3326 | 01/1900 | 24/11/1933 | 33.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 13/01/1934 | 34.02 | |||
3339 | 3327 | 01/1900 | 03/1936 | 36.17 | |||||||
3340 | 3328 | 01/1900 | 04/04/1934 | 34.25 | |||||||
3341 | 3329 | 01/1900 | 05/1932 | 32.33 | |||||||
3342 | 3330 | 02/1900 | 08/1938 | 38.5 | |||||||
3343 | 3331 | 02/1900 | 03/02/1934 | 34 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 07/04/1934 | 34.16 | |||
3344 | 3332 | 02/1900 | 10/1931 | 31.67 | |||||||
3345 | 3333 | 02/1900 | 10/1932 | 32.67 | |||||||
3346 | 3334 | 02/1900 | 04/1930 | 30.17 | |||||||
3347 | 3335 | 02/1900 | 04/10/1948 | 48.67 | |||||||
3348 | 3336 | 03/1900 | 01/1936 | 35.83 | |||||||
3349 | 3337 | 03/1900 | 24/05/1934 | 34.17 | |||||||
3350 | 3338 | 03/1900 | 04/11/1933 | 33.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 16/12/1933 | 33.78 | |||
3351 | 3339 | 03/1900 | 04/1936 | 36.08 | |||||||
3352 | 3340 | 10/1899 | 02/06/1934 | 34.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 25/08/1934 | 34.88 |