Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 398 Today
» 642 Yesterday
» 4722 Week
» 11430 Month
» 164383 Year
» 1829759 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Hawksworth "1000" Class 4-6-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
01/12/1945 Reallocation 1005     22 Bristol Bath Road  
01/12/1945 Reallocation 1006     133 Newton Abbot  
23/03/1946 Reallocation 1006 133 Newton Abbot LA Laira  
30/10/1948 Reallocation 1001     NEY Neyland  
30/10/1948 Reallocation 1009     NEY Neyland  
30/10/1948 Reallocation 1019     NA Newton Abbot  
30/10/1948 Reallocation 1020     NEY Neyland  
30/10/1948 Reallocation 1022     LA Laira  
27/11/1948 Reallocation 1023     EXE Exeter  
29/01/1949 Reallocation 1013     LA Laira  
18/06/1949 Reallocation 1002     WEY Weymouth Radipole (GWR)  
30/06/1949 Reallocation 1002 WEY Weymouth Radipole (GWR) WEY Weymouth Radipole (GWR)  
08/10/1949 Reallocation 1002 WEY Weymouth Radipole (GWR) BRD Bristol Bath Road  
25/03/1950 Reallocation 1004     83F Truro  
22/04/1950 Reallocation 1023 EXE Exeter 83F Truro  
20/05/1950 Reallocation 1004 83F Truro 83G Penzance  
17/06/1950 Reallocation 1013 LA Laira 83F Truro  
15/07/1950 Reallocation 1023 83F Truro 83D Laira  
04/11/1950 Reallocation 1024     84G Shrewsbury  
04/11/1950 Reallocation 1025     84G Shrewsbury  
30/11/1950 Reallocation 1024 84G Shrewsbury 84G Shrewsbury  
30/11/1950 Reallocation 1025 84G Shrewsbury 84G Shrewsbury  
02/12/1950 Reallocation 1027     87H Neyland  
31/12/1950 Reallocation 1027 87H Neyland 87H Neyland  
31/01/1951 Reallocation 1000     83D Laira  
31/01/1951 Reallocation 1003     83D Laira  
31/01/1951 Reallocation 1010     83D Laira  
31/01/1951 Reallocation 1012     83D Laira  
31/01/1951 Reallocation 1015     83D Laira  
31/01/1951 Reallocation 1018     83G Penzance  
31/01/1951 Reallocation 1019 NA Newton Abbot 83G Penzance  
31/01/1951 Reallocation 1021     83D Laira  
31/01/1951 Reallocation 1022 LA Laira 83G Penzance  
31/01/1951 Reallocation 1023 83D Laira 83G Penzance  
28/02/1951 Reallocation 1000 83D Laira 83D Laira  
28/02/1951 Reallocation 1003 83D Laira 83D Laira  
28/02/1951 Reallocation 1010 83D Laira 83D Laira  
28/02/1951 Reallocation 1012 83D Laira 83D Laira  
28/02/1951 Reallocation 1015 83D Laira 83D Laira  
28/02/1951 Reallocation 1018 83G Penzance 83G Penzance  
28/02/1951 Reallocation 1019 83G Penzance 83G Penzance  
28/02/1951 Reallocation 1021 83D Laira 83D Laira  
28/02/1951 Reallocation 1022 83G Penzance 83G Penzance  
28/02/1951 Reallocation 1023 83G Penzance 83G Penzance  
28/02/1951 Reallocation 1024 84G Shrewsbury 83D Laira  
31/03/1951 Reallocation 1024 83D Laira 83D Laira  
21/04/1951 Reallocation 1003 83D Laira 84G Shrewsbury  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 1003 84G Shrewsbury 84G Shrewsbury  
08/09/1951 Reallocation 1013 83F Truro 83G Penzance  
08/09/1951 Reallocation 1023 83G Penzance 83F Truro  
30/09/1951 Reallocation 1013 83G Penzance 83G Penzance  
30/09/1951 Reallocation 1023 83F Truro 83F Truro  
03/11/1951 Reallocation 1004 83G Penzance 84A Stafford Road  
03/11/1951 Reallocation 1022 83G Penzance 84K Chester West  
01/12/1951 Reallocation 1004 84A Stafford Road 84G Shrewsbury  
01/12/1951 Reallocation 1013 83G Penzance 84G Shrewsbury  
01/12/1951 Reallocation 1017     84G Shrewsbury  
01/12/1951 Reallocation 1018 83G Penzance 84G Shrewsbury  
01/12/1951 Reallocation 1019 83G Penzance 84G Shrewsbury  
31/12/1951 Reallocation 1004 84G Shrewsbury 84G Shrewsbury  
31/12/1951 Reallocation 1013 84G Shrewsbury 84G Shrewsbury  
31/12/1951 Reallocation 1017 84G Shrewsbury 84G Shrewsbury  
31/12/1951 Reallocation 1018 84G Shrewsbury 84G Shrewsbury  
31/12/1951 Reallocation 1019 84G Shrewsbury 84G Shrewsbury  
04/10/1952 Reallocation 1024 83D Laira 81A Old Oak Common  
04/10/1952 Reallocation 1026     83D Laira  
01/11/1952 Reallocation 1000 83D Laira 84K Chester West  
01/11/1952 Reallocation 1008     84K Chester West  
01/11/1952 Reallocation 1016     83D Laira  
01/11/1952 Reallocation 1024 81A Old Oak Common 84K Chester West  
29/11/1952 Reallocation 1016 83D Laira 84G Shrewsbury  
24/01/1953 Reallocation 1018 84G Shrewsbury 84A Stafford Road  
24/01/1953 Reallocation 1019 84G Shrewsbury 84A Stafford Road  
21/02/1953 Reallocation 1004 84G Shrewsbury 84A Stafford Road  
21/02/1953 Reallocation 1010 83D Laira 83F Truro  
21/02/1953 Reallocation 1026 83D Laira 82A Bristol Bath Road  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 1002 BRD Bristol Bath Road 83D Laira  
16/05/1953 Reallocation 1002 83D Laira 83G Penzance  
16/05/1953 Reallocation 1010 83F Truro 83D Laira  
26/12/1953 Reallocation 1029     87H Neyland  
27/03/1954 Reallocation 1000 84K Chester West 82A Bristol Bath Road  
27/03/1954 Reallocation 1004 84A Stafford Road 82C Swindon  
27/03/1954 Reallocation 1019 84A Stafford Road 82C Swindon  
27/03/1954 Reallocation 1026 82A Bristol Bath Road 84K Chester West  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 1006 LA Laira 87G Carmarthen  
09/10/1954 Reallocation 1018 84A Stafford Road 83D Laira  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 1006 87G Carmarthen 83G Penzance  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 1018 83D Laira 83G Penzance  
01/01/1955 Reallocation 1007     83F Truro  
29/01/1955 Reallocation 1009 NEY Neyland 82A Bristol Bath Road  
26/03/1955 Reallocation 1021 83D Laira 83G Penzance  
16/07/1955 Reallocation 1006 83G Penzance 83F Truro  
16/07/1955 Reallocation 1021 83G Penzance 83D Laira  
08/10/1955 Reallocation 1006 83F Truro 83G Penzance  
08/10/1955 Reallocation 1026 84K Chester West 84G Shrewsbury  
05/11/1955 Reallocation 1023 83F Truro 83D Laira  
03/12/1955 Reallocation 1023 83D Laira 83F Truro  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 1012 83D Laira 82C Swindon  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 1020 NEY Neyland 87G Carmarthen  
03/11/1956 Reallocation 1020 87G Carmarthen 87H Neyland  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 1008 84K Chester West 83G Penzance  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 1022 84K Chester West 84G Shrewsbury  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 1024 84K Chester West 82A Bristol Bath Road  
09/08/1958 Reallocation 1008 83G Penzance 83D Laira  
24/01/1959 Reallocation 1008 83D Laira 83G Penzance  
08/08/1959 Reallocation 1022 84G Shrewsbury 85C Hereford  
03/10/1959 Reallocation 1007 83F Truro 83C Exeter  
03/10/1959 Reallocation 1010 83D Laira 82C Swindon  
03/10/1959 Reallocation 1015 83D Laira 82C Swindon  
03/10/1959 Reallocation 1023 83F Truro 83C Exeter  
31/10/1959 Reallocation 1022 85C Hereford 84G Shrewsbury  
28/11/1959 Reallocation 1021 83D Laira 82C Swindon  
28/11/1959 Reallocation 1027 87H Neyland 82A Bristol Bath Road  
18/06/1960 Reallocation 1002 83G Penzance 83E St Blazey  
18/06/1960 Reallocation 1006 83G Penzance 83E St Blazey  
18/06/1960 Reallocation 1018 83G Penzance 83D Laira  
10/09/1960 Reallocation 1000 82A Bristol Bath Road 82B St Philips Marsh  
10/09/1960 Reallocation 1005 22 Bristol Bath Road 82B St Philips Marsh  
10/09/1960 Reallocation 1009 82A Bristol Bath Road 82B St Philips Marsh  
10/09/1960 Reallocation 1011     82B St Philips Marsh  
10/09/1960 Reallocation 1014     82B St Philips Marsh  
10/09/1960 Reallocation 1024 82A Bristol Bath Road 82B St Philips Marsh  
10/09/1960 Reallocation 1027 82A Bristol Bath Road 82B St Philips Marsh  
10/09/1960 Reallocation 1028     82B St Philips Marsh  
05/11/1960 Reallocation 1002 83E St Blazey 83D Laira  
05/11/1960 Reallocation 1006 83E St Blazey 83D Laira  
03/12/1960 Reallocation 1002 83D Laira 83G Penzance  
03/12/1960 Reallocation 1008 83G Penzance 83G Penzance  
03/12/1960 Reallocation 1018 83D Laira 83G Penzance  
31/12/1960 Reallocation 1004 82C Swindon 83G Penzance  
31/12/1960 Reallocation 1017 84G Shrewsbury 83D Laira  
31/12/1960 Reallocation 1021 82C Swindon 82B St Philips Marsh  
28/01/1961 Reallocation 1001 NEY Neyland 83G Penzance  
28/01/1961 Reallocation 1003 84G Shrewsbury 83D Laira  
28/01/1961 Reallocation 1017 83D Laira 89A Shrewsbury  
25/02/1961 Reallocation 1002 83G Penzance 81E Didcot  
25/02/1961 Reallocation 1008 83G Penzance 81E Didcot  
25/03/1961 Reallocation 1007 83C Exeter 81E Didcot  
25/03/1961 Reallocation 1023 83C Exeter 82C Swindon  
12/08/1961 Reallocation 1029 87H Neyland 82C Swindon  
09/09/1961 Reallocation 1015 82C Swindon 81E Didcot  
07/10/1961 Reallocation 1014 82B St Philips Marsh 87H Neyland  
07/10/1961 Reallocation 1027 82B St Philips Marsh 87H Neyland  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 1019 82C Swindon 82C Swindon  
13/09/1962 Condemned 1026 98W     COND  
21/09/1962 Condemned 1004 98W     COND  
27/09/1962 Condemned 1018 98W     COND  
05/10/1962 Condemned 1007 81E Didcot   COND  
05/10/1962 Condemned 1022 84G Shrewsbury   COND  
06/10/1962 Reallocation 1001 83G Penzance 87H Neyland  
06/10/1962 Reallocation 1008 81E Didcot 87H Neyland  
06/10/1962 Reallocation 1019 82C Swindon 89A Shrewsbury  
06/10/1962 Reallocation 1023 82C Swindon 89A Shrewsbury  
22/10/1962 Condemned 1003 83D Laira   COND  
03/11/1962 Reallocation 1002 81E Didcot 89A Shrewsbury  
03/11/1962 Reallocation 1015 81E Didcot 83D Laira  
03/11/1962 Reallocation 1020 87H Neyland 82B St Philips Marsh  
13/11/1962 Condemned 1015 83D Laira   COND  
05/12/1962 Condemned 1029 82C Swindon   COND  
15/12/1962 Reallocation 1006 83D Laira 82C Swindon  
19/12/1962 Condemned 1017 89A Shrewsbury   COND  
01/02/1963 Condemned 1009 82B St Philips Marsh   COND  
09/02/1963 Reallocation 1008 87H Neyland 89A Shrewsbury  
11/02/1963 Condemned 1019 89A Shrewsbury   COND  
18/02/1963 Condemned 1025 84G Shrewsbury   COND  
01/03/1963 Condemned 1023 89A Shrewsbury   COND  
02/03/1963 Reallocation 1008 89A Shrewsbury 89A Shrewsbury  
02/03/1963 Reallocation 1027 87H Neyland 89A Shrewsbury  
09/03/1963 Reallocation 1014 87H Neyland 89A Shrewsbury  
30/03/1963 Reallocation 1014 89A Shrewsbury 89A Shrewsbury  
24/05/1963 Condemned 1001 87H Neyland   COND  
24/06/1963 Condemned 1005 98W     COND  
08/09/1963 Reallocation 1008 89A Shrewsbury 82C Swindon  
08/09/1963 Reallocation 1013 84G Shrewsbury 82C Swindon  
08/09/1963 Reallocation 1014 89A Shrewsbury 82C Swindon  
08/09/1963 Reallocation 1027 89A Shrewsbury 82C Swindon  
17/09/1963 Condemned 1002 98W     COND  
17/09/1963 Condemned 1006 98W     COND  
17/09/1963 Condemned 1016 98W     COND  
03/10/1963 Condemned 1008 82C Swindon   COND  
25/10/1963 Condemned 1027 82C Swindon   COND  
01/11/1963 Condemned 1021 82B St Philips Marsh   COND  
02/11/1963 Reallocation 1020 82B St Philips Marsh 82C Swindon  
02/11/1963 Reallocation 1024 82B St Philips Marsh 82C Swindon  
02/11/1963 Reallocation 1028 82B St Philips Marsh 82C Swindon  
30/11/1963 Reallocation 1011 82B St Philips Marsh 82C Swindon  
02/12/1963 Condemned 1028 98W     COND  
25/01/1964 Reallocation 1000 82B St Philips Marsh 82C Swindon  
26/02/1964 Condemned 1020 98W     COND  
08/04/1964 Condemned 1024 98W     COND  
24/04/1964 Condemned 1012 98W     COND  
24/04/1964 Condemned 1014 98W     COND  
06/07/1964 Condemned 1000 98W     COND  
24/07/1964 Condemned 1010 98W     COND  
24/07/1964 Condemned 1013 98W     COND  
06/11/1964 Condemned 1011 98W     COND