114
BR | BR (Parcels) | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
50001 | 15/10/1956 | Lincoln | 67.50 | ||||||||
50002 | 02/11/1956 | Lincoln | 67.45 | ||||||||
50003 | 02/11/1956 | Lincoln | 67.45 | ||||||||
50004 | 07/11/1956 | Lincoln | 67.44 | ||||||||
50005 | 07/11/1956 | Lincoln | 67.44 | ||||||||
50006 | 20/11/1956 | Lincoln | 67.40 | ||||||||
50007 | 20/11/1956 | Lincoln | 67.40 | ||||||||
50008 | 16/11/1956 | Lincoln | 67.41 | ||||||||
50009 | 20/11/1956 | Lincoln | 67.40 | ||||||||
50010 | 55930 | 04/12/1956 | Lincoln | 67.36 | |||||||
50011 | 27/11/1956 | Lincoln | 67.38 | ||||||||
50012 | 27/11/1956 | Lincoln | 67.38 | ||||||||
50013 | 04/12/1956 | Lincoln | 67.36 | ||||||||
50014 | 04/12/1956 | Lincoln | 67.36 | ||||||||
50015 | 27/02/1957 | Lincoln | 67.13 | ||||||||
50016 | 11/12/1956 | Lincoln | 67.34 | ||||||||
50017 | 01/01/1957 | Lincoln | 67.28 | ||||||||
50018 | 01/01/1957 | Lincoln | 67.28 | ||||||||
50019 | 01/01/1957 | Lincoln | 67.28 | ||||||||
50020 | 01/01/1957 | Lincoln | 67.28 | ||||||||
50021 | 01/01/1957 | Lincoln | 67.28 | ||||||||
50022 | 01/01/1957 | Lincoln | 67.28 | ||||||||
50023 | 09/01/1957 | Lincoln | 67.26 | ||||||||
50024 | 09/01/1957 | Lincoln | 67.26 | ||||||||
50025 | 11/01/1957 | Lincoln | 67.26 | ||||||||
50026 | 17/01/1957 | Lincoln | 67.24 | ||||||||
50027 | 17/01/1957 | Lincoln | 67.24 | ||||||||
50028 | 17/01/1957 | Lincoln | 25/08/1962 | Lincoln | 5.58 | 67.24 | |||||
50029 | 24/01/1957 | Lincoln | 67.22 | ||||||||
50030 | 24/01/1957 | Lincoln | 67.22 | ||||||||
50031 | 24/01/1957 | Lincoln | 67.22 | ||||||||
50032 | 05/02/1957 | Lincoln | 67.19 | ||||||||
50033 | 05/02/1957 | Lincoln | 67.19 | ||||||||
50034 | 05/02/1957 | Lincoln | 67.19 | ||||||||
50035 | 29/03/1957 | Lincoln | 67.05 | ||||||||
50036 | 22/02/1957 | Lincoln | 67.14 | ||||||||
50037 | 22/02/1957 | Lincoln | 67.14 | ||||||||
50038 | 22/02/1957 | Lincoln | 67.14 | ||||||||
50039 | 27/02/1957 | Lincoln | 67.13 | ||||||||
50040 | 27/02/1957 | Lincoln | 67.13 | ||||||||
50041 | 08/03/1957 | Lincoln | 67.10 | ||||||||
50042 | 08/03/1957 | Lincoln | 67.10 | ||||||||
50043 | 08/03/1957 | Lincoln | 67.10 | ||||||||
50044 | 22/03/1957 | Lincoln | 67.07 | ||||||||
50045 | 29/03/1957 | Lincoln | 67.05 | ||||||||
50046 | 29/03/1957 | Lincoln | 67.05 | ||||||||
50047 | 17/04/1957 | Lincoln | 66.99 | ||||||||
50048 | 09/06/1958 | Lincoln | 65.85 | ||||||||
50049 | 26/08/1957 | Lincoln | 23/06/1968 | 10.83 | 66.64 |