BR (Pre Tops) |
Date To Service |
Bld |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
Name |
D8588
|
20/03/1964 |
BP |
Thornaby |
04/10/1971 |
|
7.58 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) |
07/1973 |
9.33 |
|
D8589
|
04/05/1964 |
BP |
Thornaby |
06/07/1970 |
|
6.17 |
Cut |
W Willoughby (at Gateshead MPD) |
04/1971 |
6.95 |
|
D8590
|
12/05/1964 |
BP |
Thornaby |
27/03/1971 |
|
6.83 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) |
12/1971 |
7.60 |
|
D8591
|
08/07/1964 |
BP |
Thornaby |
22/12/1968 |
|
4.42 |
Cut |
J McWilliams (Shettleston) |
06/1969 |
4.94 |
|
D8592
|
12/05/1964 |
BP |
Gateshead |
21/09/1971 |
|
7.33 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) |
03/1972 |
7.85 |
|
D8593
|
28/05/1964 |
BP |
Gateshead |
04/10/1971 |
|
7.42 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) |
09/1973 |
9.31 |
|
D8594
|
03/07/1964 |
BP |
Gateshead |
21/09/1971 |
|
7.17 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) |
03/1972 |
7.70 |
|
D8595
|
21/07/1964 |
BP |
Gateshead |
22/12/1968 |
|
4.42 |
Cut |
J McWilliams (Shettleston) |
05/1969 |
4.82 |
|
D8596
|
28/07/1964 |
BP |
Gateshead |
22/12/1968 |
|
4.42 |
Cut |
J McWilliams (Shettleston) |
05/1969 |
4.80 |
|
D8597
|
21/07/1964 |
BP |
Gateshead |
06/10/1971 |
|
7.25 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) |
07/1973 |
8.99 |
|
D8598
|
06/08/1964 |
BP |
Gateshead |
31/12/1971 |
Polmadie |
7.33 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) |
03/1979 |
14.61 |
|
D8599
|
28/08/1964 |
BP |
Gateshead |
05/10/1971 |
|
7.17 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) |
11/1971 |
7.22 |
|
D8600
|
06/08/1964 |
BP |
Gateshead |
06/10/1971 |
|
7.17 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) |
04/1973 |
8.70 |
|
D8601
|
02/09/1964 |
BP |
Gateshead |
06/10/1971 |
|
7.08 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) |
11/1973 |
9.21 |
|
D8602
|
09/09/1964 |
BP |
Gateshead |
06/10/1971 |
|
7.08 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) |
04/1972 |
7.60 |
|
D8603
|
07/09/1964 |
BP |
Gateshead |
06/10/1971 |
|
7.08 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) |
04/1972 |
7.61 |
|
D8604
|
15/09/1964 |
BP |
Tinsley |
04/10/1971 |
|
7.08 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) |
04/1972 |
7.59 |
|
D8605
|
01/10/1964 |
BP |
Tinsley |
28/10/1968 |
|
4 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
05/1969 |
4.62 |
|
D8606
|
05/10/1964 |
BP |
Tinsley |
27/03/1971 |
|
6.42 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) |
04/1972 |
7.53 |
|
D8607
|
16/10/1964 |
BP |
Tinsley |
05/10/1971 |
|
7 |
Cut |
J McWilliams (Shettleston) |
08/1975 |
10.84 |
|
D8608
|
27/10/1964 |
BP |
Tinsley |
05/10/1971 |
|
7 |
Cut |
J McWilliams (Shettleston) |
08/1975 |
10.81 |
|
D8609
|
23/11/1964 |
BP |
Tinsley |
13/10/1968 |
|
3.92 |
Cut |
J McWilliams (Shettleston) |
06/1969 |
4.56 |
|
D8610
|
07/12/1964 |
BP |
Tinsley |
05/10/1971 |
|
6.83 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) |
08/1973 |
8.69 |
|
D8611
|
17/12/1964 |
BP |
Tinsley |
13/10/1968 |
|
3.83 |
Cut |
J McWilliams (Shettleston) |
05/1969 |
4.41 |
|
D8612
|
27/01/1965 |
BP |
Tinsley |
05/10/1971 |
|
6.75 |
Cut |
J McWilliams (Shettleston) |
08/1975 |
10.55 |
|
D8613
|
22/01/1965 |
BP |
Tinsley |
06/10/1971 |
|
6.75 |
Cut |
J McWilliams (Shettleston) |
08/1975 |
10.57 |
|
D8614
|
11/02/1965 |
BP |
Tinsley |
05/10/1971 |
|
6.67 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) |
12/1972 |
7.85 |
|
D8615
|
10/03/1965 |
BP |
Tinsley |
05/10/1971 |
|
6.58 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) |
11/1973 |
8.69 |
|
D8616
|
23/04/1965 |
BP |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
21/09/1971 |
|
6.42 |
Cut |
J McWilliams (Shettleston) |
08/1975 |
10.32 |
|