117
BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
51332 | 28/11/1959 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 28/11/1959 | |
51333 | 02/01/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 02/01/1960 | |
51334 | 06/02/1960 | 81C TS |
Southall (New) Tyseley |
06/02/1960 04/10/1987 |
|
51335 | 20/02/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 20/02/1960 | |
51336 | 27/02/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 27/02/1960 | |
51337 | 05/03/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 05/03/1960 | |
51338 | 19/03/1960 | 81D TS |
Reading (W.R.) (New) Tyseley |
19/03/1960 04/10/1987 |
|
51339 | 02/04/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 02/04/1960 | |
51340 | 26/03/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 26/03/1960 | |
51341 | 09/04/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 09/04/1960 | |
51342 | 16/04/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 16/04/1960 | |
51343 | 23/04/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 23/04/1960 | |
51344 | 30/04/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 30/04/1960 | |
51345 | 30/04/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 30/04/1960 | |
51346 | 07/05/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 07/05/1960 | |
51347 | 14/05/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 14/05/1960 | |
51348 | 21/05/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 21/05/1960 | |
51349 | 28/05/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 28/05/1960 | |
51350 | 04/06/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 04/06/1960 | |
51351 | 04/06/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 04/06/1960 | |
51352 | 11/06/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 11/06/1960 | |
51353 | 18/06/1960 | 81D TS |
Reading (W.R.) (New) Tyseley |
18/06/1960 04/10/1987 |
|
51354 | 18/06/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 18/06/1960 | |
51355 | 25/06/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 25/06/1960 | |
51356 | 02/07/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 02/07/1960 | |
51357 | 02/07/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 02/07/1960 | |
51358 | 16/07/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 16/07/1960 | |
51359 | 23/07/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 23/07/1960 | |
51360 | 23/07/1960 | 81C TS |
Southall (New) Tyseley |
23/07/1960 04/10/1987 |
|
51361 | 30/07/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 30/07/1960 | |
51362 | 30/07/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 30/07/1960 | |
51363 | 30/07/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 30/07/1960 | |
51364 | 27/08/1960 | 81C TS |
Southall (New) Tyseley |
27/08/1960 04/10/1987 |
|
51365 | 27/08/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 27/08/1960 | |
51366 | 03/09/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 03/09/1960 | |
51367 | 10/09/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 10/09/1960 | |
51368 | 17/09/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 17/09/1960 | |
51369 | 01/10/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 01/10/1960 | |
51370 | 01/10/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 01/10/1960 | |
51371 | 15/10/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 15/10/1960 | |
51372 | 15/10/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 15/10/1960 | |
51373 | 22/10/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 22/10/1960 | |
51374 | 28/11/1959 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 28/11/1959 | |
51375 | 02/01/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 02/01/1960 | |
51376 | 06/02/1960 | 81C TS |
Southall (New) Tyseley |
06/02/1960 04/10/1987 |
|
51377 | 20/02/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 20/02/1960 | |
51378 | 27/02/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 27/02/1960 | |
51379 | 05/03/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 05/03/1960 | |
51380 | 19/03/1960 | 81D TS |
Reading (W.R.) (New) Tyseley |
19/03/1960 04/10/1987 |
|
51381 | 26/03/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 26/03/1960 | |
51382 | 02/04/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 02/04/1960 | |
51383 | 09/04/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 09/04/1960 | |
51384 | 16/04/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 16/04/1960 | |
51385 | 23/04/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 23/04/1960 | |
51386 | 30/04/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 30/04/1960 | |
51387 | 30/04/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 30/04/1960 | |
51388 | 07/05/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 07/05/1960 | |
51389 | 14/05/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 14/05/1960 | |
51390 | 21/05/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 21/05/1960 | |
51391 | 28/05/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 28/05/1960 | |
51392 | 04/06/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 04/06/1960 | |
51393 | 04/06/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 04/06/1960 | |
51394 | 11/06/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 11/06/1960 | |
51395 | 18/06/1960 | 81D TS |
Reading (W.R.) (New) Tyseley |
18/06/1960 04/10/1987 |
|
51396 | 18/06/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 18/06/1960 | |
51397 | 25/06/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 25/06/1960 | |
51398 | 02/07/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 02/07/1960 | |
51399 | 02/07/1960 | 81C CF |
Southall (New) Cardiff Canton |
02/07/1960 07/1981 |
|
51400 | 16/07/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 16/07/1960 | |
51401 | 23/07/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 23/07/1960 | |
51402 | 23/07/1960 | 81C TS |
Southall (New) Tyseley |
23/07/1960 04/10/1987 |
|
51403 | 30/07/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 30/07/1960 | 04/04/1982 |
51404 | 30/07/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 30/07/1960 | |
51405 | 30/07/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 30/07/1960 | |
51406 | 27/08/1960 | 81C TS |
Southall (New) Tyseley |
27/08/1960 04/10/1987 |
|
51407 | 27/08/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 27/08/1960 | |
51408 | 03/09/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 03/09/1960 | |
51409 | 10/09/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 10/09/1960 | |
51410 | 17/09/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 17/09/1960 | |
51411 | 01/10/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 01/10/1960 | |
51412 | 01/10/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 01/10/1960 | |
51413 | 15/10/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 15/10/1960 | |
51414 | 15/10/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 15/10/1960 | |
51415 | 22/10/1960 | 81C | Southall (New) | 22/10/1960 |