Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 33 Today
» 1160 Yesterday
» 3358 Week
» 3358 Month
» 70220 Year
» 1735596 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

117


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
51332 28/11/1959 Reading (W.R.) 61.31
51333 02/01/1960 Reading (W.R.) 61.21
51334 06/02/1960 Southall 61.12
51335 20/02/1960 Reading (W.R.) 61.08
51336 27/02/1960 Reading (W.R.) 61.06
51337 05/03/1960 Reading (W.R.) 61.04
51338 19/03/1960 Reading (W.R.) 61.00
51339 02/04/1960 Southall 60.96
51340 26/03/1960 Southall 60.98
51341 09/04/1960 Southall 60.94
51342 16/04/1960 Southall 60.92
51343 23/04/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.90
51344 30/04/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.88
51345 30/04/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.88
51346 07/05/1960 Southall 60.87
51347 14/05/1960 Southall 60.85
51348 21/05/1960 Southall 60.83
51349 28/05/1960 Southall 60.81
51350 04/06/1960 Southall 60.79
51351 04/06/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.79
51352 11/06/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.77
51353 18/06/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.75
51354 18/06/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.75
51355 25/06/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.73
51356 02/07/1960 Southall 60.71
51357 02/07/1960 Southall 60.71
51358 16/07/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.67
51359 23/07/1960 Southall 60.65
51360 23/07/1960 Southall 60.65
51361 30/07/1960 Southall 60.64
51362 30/07/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.64
51363 30/07/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.64
51364 27/08/1960 Southall 60.56
51365 27/08/1960 Southall 60.56
51366 03/09/1960 Southall 60.54
51367 10/09/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.52
51368 17/09/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.50
51369 01/10/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.46
51370 01/10/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.46
51371 15/10/1960 Southall 60.42
51372 15/10/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.42
51373 22/10/1960 Southall 60.41
51374 28/11/1959 Reading (W.R.) 61.31
51375 02/01/1960 Reading (W.R.) 61.21
51376 06/02/1960 Southall 61.12
51377 20/02/1960 Reading (W.R.) 61.08
51378 27/02/1960 Reading (W.R.) 61.06
51379 05/03/1960 Reading (W.R.) 61.04
51380 19/03/1960 Reading (W.R.) 61.00
51381 26/03/1960 Southall 60.98
51382 02/04/1960 Southall 60.96
51383 09/04/1960 Southall 60.94
51384 16/04/1960 Southall 60.92
51385 23/04/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.90
51386 30/04/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.88
51387 30/04/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.88
51388 07/05/1960 Southall 60.87
51389 14/05/1960 Southall 60.85
51390 21/05/1960 Southall 60.83
51391 28/05/1960 Southall 60.81
51392 04/06/1960 Southall 60.79
51393 04/06/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.79
51394 11/06/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.77
51395 18/06/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.75
51396 18/06/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.75
51397 25/06/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.73
51398 02/07/1960 Southall 60.71
51399 02/07/1960 Southall 60.71
51400 16/07/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.67
51401 23/07/1960 Southall 60.65
51402 23/07/1960 Southall 60.65
51403 30/07/1960 Southall 04/04/1982 Reading (W.R.) 21.75 60.64
51404 30/07/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.64
51405 30/07/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.64
51406 27/08/1960 Southall 60.56
51407 27/08/1960 Southall 60.56
51408 03/09/1960 Southall 60.54
51409 10/09/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.52
51410 17/09/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.50
51411 01/10/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.46
51412 01/10/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.46
51413 15/10/1960 Southall 60.42
51414 15/10/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.42
51415 22/10/1960 Southall 60.41