Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 861 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 3026 Week
» 3026 Month
» 69888 Year
» 1735264 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

117


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
51332 28/11/1959 Reading (W.R.) 61.30
51333 02/01/1960 Reading (W.R.) 61.21
51334 06/02/1960 Southall 61.11
51335 20/02/1960 Reading (W.R.) 61.07
51336 27/02/1960 Reading (W.R.) 61.05
51337 05/03/1960 Reading (W.R.) 61.04
51338 19/03/1960 Reading (W.R.) 61.00
51339 02/04/1960 Southall 60.96
51340 26/03/1960 Southall 60.98
51341 09/04/1960 Southall 60.94
51342 16/04/1960 Southall 60.92
51343 23/04/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.90
51344 30/04/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.88
51345 30/04/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.88
51346 07/05/1960 Southall 60.86
51347 14/05/1960 Southall 60.84
51348 21/05/1960 Southall 60.82
51349 28/05/1960 Southall 60.81
51350 04/06/1960 Southall 60.79
51351 04/06/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.79
51352 11/06/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.77
51353 18/06/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.75
51354 18/06/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.75
51355 25/06/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.73
51356 02/07/1960 Southall 60.71
51357 02/07/1960 Southall 60.71
51358 16/07/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.67
51359 23/07/1960 Southall 60.65
51360 23/07/1960 Southall 60.65
51361 30/07/1960 Southall 60.63
51362 30/07/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.63
51363 30/07/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.63
51364 27/08/1960 Southall 60.56
51365 27/08/1960 Southall 60.56
51366 03/09/1960 Southall 60.54
51367 10/09/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.52
51368 17/09/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.50
51369 01/10/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.46
51370 01/10/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.46
51371 15/10/1960 Southall 60.42
51372 15/10/1960 Reading (W.R.) 60.42
51373 22/10/1960 Southall 60.40