Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 220 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2385 Week
» 2385 Month
» 69247 Year
» 1734623 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

101


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To
10/12/1956 To Service 50152   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
10/12/1956 To Service 50153   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
10/12/1956 To Service 50158   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
10/12/1956 To Service 50159   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
17/12/1956 To Service 50154   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
17/12/1956 To Service 50155   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
17/12/1956 To Service 50160   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
17/12/1956 To Service 50161   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
01/01/1957 To Service 50156   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
01/01/1957 To Service 50157   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
01/01/1957 To Service 50162   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
01/01/1957 To Service 50163   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
10/01/1957 To Service 50164   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
10/01/1957 To Service 50165   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
10/01/1957 To Service 50168   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
10/01/1957 To Service 50169   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
23/01/1957 To Service 50166   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
23/01/1957 To Service 50167   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
23/01/1957 To Service 50170   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
23/01/1957 To Service 50171   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
28/01/1957 To Service 50172   NEW 51A Darlington
28/01/1957 To Service 50173   NEW 51A Darlington
04/02/1957 To Service 50174   NEW 51A Darlington
04/02/1957 To Service 50175   NEW 51A Darlington
11/02/1957 To Service 50176   NEW 51A Darlington
11/02/1957 To Service 50177   NEW 51A Darlington
15/02/1957 To Service 50178   NEW 51A Darlington
15/02/1957 To Service 50179   NEW 51A Darlington
28/02/1957 To Service 50180   NEW 51A Darlington
28/02/1957 To Service 50181   NEW 51A Darlington
28/02/1957 To Service 50184   NEW 51A Darlington
28/02/1957 To Service 50185   NEW 51A Darlington
06/03/1957 To Service 50186   NEW 51A Darlington
06/03/1957 To Service 50187   NEW 51A Darlington
14/03/1957 To Service 50188   NEW 51A Darlington
14/03/1957 To Service 50189   NEW 51A Darlington
19/03/1957 To Service 50182   NEW 51A Darlington
19/03/1957 To Service 50183   NEW 51A Darlington
25/03/1957 To Service 50190   NEW 51A Darlington
25/03/1957 To Service 50191   NEW 51A Darlington
29/03/1957 To Service 50192   NEW 51A Darlington
29/03/1957 To Service 50193   NEW 51A Darlington
04/04/1957 To Service 50194   NEW 51A Darlington
04/04/1957 To Service 50195   NEW 51A Darlington
12/04/1957 To Service 50196   NEW 51A Darlington
12/04/1957 To Service 50197   NEW 51A Darlington
25/04/1957 To Service 50198   NEW 51A Darlington
25/04/1957 To Service 50199   NEW 51A Darlington
29/04/1957 To Service 50205   NEW 51A Darlington
29/04/1957 To Service 50206   NEW 51A Darlington
03/05/1957 To Service 50200   NEW 51A Darlington
03/05/1957 To Service 50201   NEW 51A Darlington
15/05/1957 To Service 50202   NEW 51A Darlington
15/05/1957 To Service 50203   NEW 51A Darlington
21/05/1957 To Service 50204   NEW 51A Darlington
21/05/1957 To Service 50209   NEW 51A Darlington
22/05/1957 To Service 50207   NEW 51A Darlington
22/05/1957 To Service 50208   NEW 51A Darlington
28/05/1957 To Service 50210   NEW 54A Sunderland
28/05/1957 To Service 50211   NEW 54A Sunderland
06/06/1957 To Service 50212   NEW 54A Sunderland
06/06/1957 To Service 50213   NEW 54A Sunderland
13/06/1957 To Service 50222   NEW 54A Sunderland
13/06/1957 To Service 50223   NEW 54A Sunderland
14/06/1957 To Service 50250   NEW 51A Darlington
14/06/1957 To Service 50260   NEW 51A Darlington
20/06/1957 To Service 50224   NEW 54A Sunderland
25/06/1957 To Service 50225   NEW 54A Sunderland
26/06/1957 To Service 50214   NEW 54A Sunderland
26/06/1957 To Service 50251   NEW 51A Darlington
26/06/1957 To Service 50261   NEW 51A Darlington
02/07/1957 To Service 50215   NEW 54A Sunderland
02/07/1957 To Service 50216   NEW 54A Sunderland
08/07/1957 To Service 50252   NEW 51A Darlington
08/07/1957 To Service 50262   NEW 51A Darlington
09/07/1957 To Service 50217   NEW 54A Sunderland
09/07/1957 To Service 50226   NEW 54A Sunderland
16/07/1957 To Service 50227   NEW 54A Sunderland
16/07/1957 To Service 50228   NEW 54A Sunderland
23/07/1957 To Service 50218   NEW 54A Sunderland
23/07/1957 To Service 50229   NEW 54A Sunderland
25/07/1957 To Service 50253   NEW 51A Darlington
25/07/1957 To Service 50263   NEW 51A Darlington
31/07/1957 To Service 50219   NEW 54A Sunderland
31/07/1957 To Service 50220   NEW 54A Sunderland
21/08/1957 To Service 50221   NEW 54A Sunderland
21/08/1957 To Service 50230   NEW 54A Sunderland
26/08/1957 To Service 50254   NEW 51A Darlington
26/08/1957 To Service 50264   NEW 51A Darlington
27/08/1957 To Service 50231   NEW 54A Sunderland
27/08/1957 To Service 50232   NEW 54A Sunderland
03/09/1957 To Service 50233   NEW 54A Sunderland
06/09/1957 To Service 50255   NEW 51A Darlington
06/09/1957 To Service 50265   NEW 51A Darlington
04/10/1957 To Service 50257   NEW 51A Darlington
04/10/1957 To Service 50267   NEW 51A Darlington
07/10/1957 Condemned 50173 51A Darlington   COND
14/10/1957 To Service 50256   NEW 51A Darlington
14/10/1957 To Service 50266   NEW 51A Darlington
18/10/1957 To Service 50258   NEW 51A Darlington
18/10/1957 To Service 50268   NEW 51A Darlington
31/10/1957 To Service 50259   NEW 51A Darlington
31/10/1957 To Service 50269   NEW 51A Darlington
13/11/1957 To Service 50290   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
13/11/1957 To Service 50745   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
21/11/1957 To Service 50291   NEW 51A Darlington
21/11/1957 To Service 50746   NEW 51A Darlington
26/11/1957 To Service 50292   NEW 51A Darlington
26/11/1957 To Service 50747   NEW 51A Darlington
05/12/1957 To Service 50293   NEW 51A Darlington
05/12/1957 To Service 50294   NEW 51A Darlington
11/12/1957 To Service 50295   NEW 51A Darlington
11/12/1957 To Service 50296   NEW 51A Darlington
31/07/1958 To Service 51204   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
31/07/1958 To Service 51205   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
08/08/1958 To Service 51206   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
08/08/1958 To Service 51207   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
29/08/1958 To Service 51208   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
29/08/1958 To Service 51209   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
11/09/1958 To Service 51210   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
11/09/1958 To Service 51211   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
11/09/1958 To Service 51212   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
18/09/1958 To Service 51213   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
18/09/1958 To Service 51214   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
25/09/1958 To Service 51215   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
25/09/1958 To Service 51216   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
23/10/1958 To Service 51223   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
31/10/1958 To Service 51174   NEW 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)
06/11/1958 To Service 51187   NEW 3E Monument Lane
06/11/1958 To Service 51188   NEW 3E Monument Lane
08/11/1958 To Service 51175   NEW 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)
08/11/1958 To Service 51176   NEW 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)
08/11/1958 To Service 51177   NEW 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)
08/11/1958 To Service 51178   NEW 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)
13/11/1958 To Service 51189   NEW 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)
13/11/1958 To Service 51190   NEW 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)
13/11/1958 To Service 51191   NEW 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)
13/11/1958 To Service 51192   NEW 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)
15/11/1958 To Service 51179   NEW 3E Monument Lane
15/11/1958 To Service 51180   NEW 3E Monument Lane
15/11/1958 To Service 51181   NEW 3E Monument Lane
15/11/1958 To Service 51182   NEW 3E Monument Lane
22/11/1958 To Service 51184   NEW 3E Monument Lane
29/11/1958 To Service 51183   NEW 3E Monument Lane
29/11/1958 To Service 51185   NEW 3E Monument Lane
29/11/1958 To Service 51186   NEW 3E Monument Lane
20/12/1958 To Service 51193   NEW 3E Monument Lane
20/12/1958 To Service 51194   NEW 3E Monument Lane
27/12/1958 To Service 51195   NEW 2D Coventry
27/12/1958 To Service 51196   NEW 2D Coventry
03/01/1959 To Service 51197   NEW 26A Newton Heath
10/01/1959 To Service 51198   NEW 26A Newton Heath
17/01/1959 To Service 51199   NEW 26A Newton Heath
17/01/1959 To Service 51200   NEW 26A Newton Heath
24/01/1959 To Service 51201   NEW 26A Newton Heath
24/01/1959 To Service 51202   NEW 26A Newton Heath
24/01/1959 To Service 51203   NEW 26A Newton Heath
13/09/1965 Condemned 50236 SGosfo     COND
28/09/1986 Condemned 51199 26A Newton Heath   COND
16/08/1987 Reallocation 50206 51A Darlington BG Hull Botanic Gardens
10/09/1987 Condemned 50172 51A Darlington   COND
10/09/1987 Condemned 50174 51A Darlington   COND
27/09/1987 Reallocation 50159 56G Bradford Hammerton Street NL Neville Hill
27/09/1987 Reallocation 50253 51A Darlington HA Haymarket
29/09/1987 Condemned 50143 SGosfo     COND
29/09/1987 Condemned 50175 51A Darlington   COND
29/09/1987 Condemned 51193 3E Monument Lane   COND
29/09/1987 Condemned 51235       COND
29/09/1987 Condemned 51237       COND
29/09/1987 Condemned 51239       COND
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50164 56G Bradford Hammerton Street HA Haymarket
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50206 BG Hull Botanic Gardens NL Neville Hill
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50211 54A Sunderland NL Neville Hill
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50212 54A Sunderland LA Laira
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50215 54A Sunderland NL Neville Hill
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50216 54A Sunderland ED Eastfield
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50247 SGosfo   LA Laira
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50250 51A Darlington ED Eastfield
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50262 51A Darlington NL Neville Hill
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50291 51A Darlington ED Eastfield
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50294 51A Darlington ED Eastfield
04/10/1987 Reallocation 51175 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) NL Neville Hill
04/10/1987 Reallocation 51204 56G Bradford Hammerton Street NL Neville Hill
04/10/1987 Reallocation 51210 56G Bradford Hammerton Street NL Neville Hill
04/10/1987 Reallocation 51223 53C Hull Springhead LA Laira
16/03/1988 Reallocation 50219 54A Sunderland TS Tyseley
16/03/1988 Reallocation 51206 56G Bradford Hammerton Street TS Tyseley
10/05/1988 Reallocation 51209 53C Hull Springhead TS Tyseley
14/05/1988 Reallocation 51187 3E Monument Lane TS Tyseley