101
BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
50138 | 17/10/1956 | 67.49 | ||||||||
50139 | 17/10/1956 | 67.49 | ||||||||
50140 | 17/10/1956 | 67.49 | ||||||||
50141 | 17/10/1956 | 67.49 | ||||||||
50142 | 23/10/1956 | 67.48 | ||||||||
50143 | 23/10/1956 | 29/09/1987 | Ayr | 30.92 | 67.48 | |||||
50144 | 09/11/1956 | 67.43 | ||||||||
50145 | 09/11/1956 | 67.43 | ||||||||
50146 | 09/11/1956 | 67.43 | ||||||||
50147 | 09/11/1956 | 67.43 | ||||||||
50148 | 21/11/1956 | 67.40 | ||||||||
50149 | 21/11/1956 | 67.40 | ||||||||
50150 | 30/11/1956 | 67.37 | ||||||||
50151 | 30/11/1956 | 67.37 | ||||||||
50152 | 10/12/1956 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 67.35 | |||||||
50153 | 10/12/1956 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 67.35 | |||||||
50154 | 17/12/1956 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 67.33 | |||||||
50155 | 17/12/1956 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 67.33 | |||||||
50156 | 01/01/1957 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 67.28 | |||||||
50157 | 01/01/1957 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 67.28 | |||||||
50158 | 10/12/1956 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 67.35 | |||||||
50159 | 10/12/1956 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 67.35 | |||||||
50160 | 17/12/1956 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 67.33 | |||||||
50161 | 17/12/1956 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 67.33 | |||||||
50162 | 01/01/1957 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 67.28 | |||||||
50163 | 01/01/1957 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 67.28 | |||||||
50164 | 10/01/1957 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 67.26 | |||||||
50165 | 10/01/1957 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 67.26 | |||||||
50166 | 23/01/1957 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 67.22 | |||||||
50167 | 23/01/1957 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 67.22 | |||||||
50168 | 10/01/1957 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 67.26 | |||||||
50169 | 10/01/1957 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 67.26 | |||||||
50170 | 23/01/1957 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 67.22 | |||||||
50171 | 23/01/1957 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 67.22 | |||||||
50172 | 28/01/1957 | Darlington | 10/09/1987 | Haymarket | 30.67 | 67.21 | ||||
50173 | 28/01/1957 | Darlington | 07/10/1957 | 0.75 | 67.21 | |||||
50174 | 04/02/1957 | Darlington | 10/09/1987 | Ayr | 30.58 | 67.19 | ||||
50175 | 04/02/1957 | Darlington | 29/09/1987 | Ayr | 30.58 | 67.19 | ||||
50176 | 11/02/1957 | Darlington | 67.17 | |||||||
50177 | 11/02/1957 | Darlington | 67.17 | |||||||
50178 | 15/02/1957 | Darlington | 67.16 | |||||||
50179 | 15/02/1957 | Darlington | 67.16 | |||||||
50180 | 28/02/1957 | Darlington | 67.13 | |||||||
50181 | 28/02/1957 | Darlington | 67.13 | |||||||
50182 | 19/03/1957 | Darlington | 67.07 | |||||||
50183 | 19/03/1957 | Darlington | 67.07 | |||||||
50184 | 28/02/1957 | Darlington | 67.13 | |||||||
50185 | 28/02/1957 | Darlington | 67.13 | |||||||
50186 | 06/03/1957 | Darlington | 67.11 | |||||||
50187 | 06/03/1957 | Darlington | 67.11 | |||||||
50188 | 14/03/1957 | Darlington | 67.09 | |||||||
50189 | 14/03/1957 | Darlington | 67.09 | |||||||
50190 | 25/03/1957 | Darlington | 67.06 | |||||||
50191 | 25/03/1957 | Darlington | 67.06 | |||||||
50192 | 29/03/1957 | Darlington | 67.05 | |||||||
50193 | 29/03/1957 | Darlington | 67.05 | |||||||
50194 | 04/04/1957 | Darlington | 67.03 | |||||||
50195 | 04/04/1957 | Darlington | 67.03 | |||||||
50196 | 12/04/1957 | Darlington | 67.01 | |||||||
50197 | 12/04/1957 | Darlington | 67.01 | |||||||
50198 | 25/04/1957 | Darlington | 66.97 | |||||||
50199 | 25/04/1957 | Darlington | 66.97 | |||||||
50200 | 03/05/1957 | Darlington | 66.95 | |||||||
50201 | 03/05/1957 | Darlington | 66.95 | |||||||
50202 | 15/05/1957 | Darlington | 66.92 | |||||||
50203 | 15/05/1957 | Darlington | 66.92 | |||||||
50204 | 21/05/1957 | Darlington | 66.90 | |||||||
50205 | 29/04/1957 | Darlington | 66.96 | |||||||
50206 | 29/04/1957 | Darlington | 66.96 | |||||||
50207 | 22/05/1957 | Darlington | 66.90 | |||||||
50208 | 22/05/1957 | Darlington | 66.90 | |||||||
50209 | 21/05/1957 | Darlington | 66.90 | |||||||
50210 | 28/05/1957 | Sunderland | 66.88 | |||||||
50211 | 28/05/1957 | Sunderland | 66.88 | |||||||
50212 | 06/06/1957 | Sunderland | 66.86 | |||||||
50213 | 06/06/1957 | Sunderland | 66.86 | |||||||
50214 | 26/06/1957 | Sunderland | 66.80 | |||||||
50215 | 02/07/1957 | Sunderland | 66.79 | |||||||
50216 | 02/07/1957 | Sunderland | 66.79 | |||||||
50217 | 09/07/1957 | Sunderland | 66.77 | |||||||
50218 | 23/07/1957 | Sunderland | 66.73 | |||||||
50219 | 31/07/1957 | Sunderland | 66.71 | |||||||
50220 | 31/07/1957 | Sunderland | 66.71 | |||||||
50221 | 21/08/1957 | Sunderland | 66.65 | |||||||
50222 | 13/06/1957 | Sunderland | 66.84 | |||||||
50223 | 13/06/1957 | Sunderland | 66.84 | |||||||
50224 | 20/06/1957 | Sunderland | 66.82 | |||||||
50225 | 25/06/1957 | Sunderland | 66.81 | |||||||
50226 | 09/07/1957 | Sunderland | 66.77 | |||||||
50227 | 16/07/1957 | Sunderland | 66.75 | |||||||
50228 | 16/07/1957 | Sunderland | 66.75 | |||||||
50229 | 23/07/1957 | Sunderland | 66.73 | |||||||
50230 | 21/08/1957 | Sunderland | 66.65 | |||||||
50231 | 27/08/1957 | Sunderland | 66.63 | |||||||
50232 | 27/08/1957 | Sunderland | 66.63 | |||||||
50233 | 03/09/1957 | Sunderland | 66.61 | |||||||
50234 | 17/09/1957 | 66.58 | ||||||||
50235 | 17/09/1957 | 66.58 | ||||||||
50236 | 24/09/1957 | 13/09/1965 | 8 | 66.56 | ||||||
50237 | 24/09/1957 | 66.56 | ||||||||
50238 | 01/10/1957 | 66.54 | ||||||||
50239 | 01/10/1957 | 66.54 | ||||||||
50240 | 08/10/1957 | 66.52 | ||||||||
50241 | 08/10/1957 | 66.52 | ||||||||
50242 | 15/10/1957 | 66.50 | ||||||||
50243 | 15/10/1957 | 66.50 | ||||||||
50244 | 22/10/1957 | 66.48 | ||||||||
50245 | 22/10/1957 | 66.48 | ||||||||
50246 | 03/09/1957 | 66.61 | ||||||||
50247 | 10/09/1957 | 66.59 | ||||||||
50248 | 10/09/1957 | 66.59 | ||||||||
50250 | 14/06/1957 | Darlington | 66.84 | |||||||
50251 | 26/06/1957 | Darlington | 66.80 | |||||||
50252 | 08/07/1957 | Darlington | 66.77 | |||||||
50253 | 25/07/1957 | Darlington | 66.72 | |||||||
50254 | 26/08/1957 | Darlington | 66.64 | |||||||
50255 | 06/09/1957 | Darlington | 66.61 | |||||||
50256 | 14/10/1957 | Darlington | 66.50 | |||||||
50257 | 04/10/1957 | Darlington | 66.53 | |||||||
50258 | 18/10/1957 | Darlington | 66.49 | |||||||
50259 | 31/10/1957 | Darlington | 66.45 | |||||||
50260 | 14/06/1957 | Darlington | 66.84 | |||||||
50261 | 26/06/1957 | Darlington | 66.80 | |||||||
50262 | 08/07/1957 | Darlington | 66.77 | |||||||
50263 | 25/07/1957 | Darlington | 66.72 | |||||||
50264 | 26/08/1957 | Darlington | 66.64 | |||||||
50265 | 06/09/1957 | Darlington | 66.61 | |||||||
50266 | 14/10/1957 | Darlington | 66.50 | |||||||
50267 | 04/10/1957 | Darlington | 66.53 | |||||||
50268 | 18/10/1957 | Darlington | 66.49 | |||||||
50269 | 31/10/1957 | Darlington | 66.45 | |||||||
50290 | 13/11/1957 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 66.42 | |||||||
50291 | 21/11/1957 | Darlington | 66.40 | |||||||
50292 | 26/11/1957 | Darlington | 66.38 | |||||||
50293 | 05/12/1957 | Darlington | 66.36 | |||||||
50294 | 05/12/1957 | Darlington | 66.36 | |||||||
50295 | 11/12/1957 | Darlington | 66.34 | |||||||
50296 | 11/12/1957 | Darlington | 66.34 | |||||||
50303 | ||||||||||
50304 | ||||||||||
50305 | ||||||||||
50306 | ||||||||||
50307 | ||||||||||
50308 | ||||||||||
50309 | ||||||||||
50310 | ||||||||||
50311 | ||||||||||
50312 | ||||||||||
50313 | ||||||||||
50314 | ||||||||||
50315 | ||||||||||
50316 | ||||||||||
50317 | ||||||||||
50318 | ||||||||||
50319 | ||||||||||
50320 | ||||||||||
50321 | ||||||||||
50322 | ||||||||||
50323 | ||||||||||
50324 | ||||||||||
50325 | ||||||||||
50326 | ||||||||||
50327 | ||||||||||
50328 | ||||||||||
50329 | ||||||||||
50330 | ||||||||||
50331 | ||||||||||
50332 | ||||||||||
50333 | ||||||||||
50334 | ||||||||||
50335 | ||||||||||
50336 | ||||||||||
50337 | ||||||||||
50338 | ||||||||||
50745 | 13/11/1957 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 66.42 | |||||||
50746 | 21/11/1957 | Darlington | 66.40 | |||||||
50747 | 26/11/1957 | Darlington | 66.38 | |||||||
50748 | 05/11/1957 | 66.44 | ||||||||
50749 | 05/11/1957 | 66.44 | ||||||||
50750 | 12/11/1957 | 66.42 | ||||||||
50751 | 12/11/1957 | 66.42 | ||||||||
51174 | 31/10/1958 | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 65.45 | |||||||
51175 | 08/11/1958 | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 65.43 | |||||||
51176 | 08/11/1958 | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 65.43 | |||||||
51177 | 08/11/1958 | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 65.43 | |||||||
51178 | 08/11/1958 | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 65.43 | |||||||
51179 | 15/11/1958 | Monument Lane | 65.41 | |||||||
51180 | 15/11/1958 | Monument Lane | 65.41 | |||||||
51181 | 15/11/1958 | Monument Lane | 65.41 | |||||||
51182 | 15/11/1958 | Monument Lane | 65.41 | |||||||
51183 | 29/11/1958 | Monument Lane | 65.38 | |||||||
51184 | 22/11/1958 | Monument Lane | 65.39 | |||||||
51185 | 29/11/1958 | Monument Lane | 65.38 | |||||||
51186 | 29/11/1958 | Monument Lane | 65.38 | |||||||
51187 | 06/11/1958 | Monument Lane | 65.44 | |||||||
51188 | 06/11/1958 | Monument Lane | 65.44 | |||||||
51189 | 13/11/1958 | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 65.42 | |||||||
51190 | 13/11/1958 | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 65.42 | |||||||
51191 | 13/11/1958 | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 65.42 | |||||||
51192 | 13/11/1958 | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 65.42 | |||||||
51193 | 20/12/1958 | Monument Lane | 29/09/1987 | Haymarket | 28.75 | 65.32 | ||||
51194 | 20/12/1958 | Monument Lane | 65.32 | |||||||
51195 | 27/12/1958 | Coventry | 65.30 | |||||||
51196 | 27/12/1958 | Coventry | 65.30 | |||||||
51197 | 03/01/1959 | Newton Heath | 65.28 | |||||||
51198 | 10/01/1959 | Newton Heath | 65.26 | |||||||
51199 | 17/01/1959 | Newton Heath | 28/09/1986 | Norwich Thorpe | 27.67 | 65.24 | ||||
51200 | 17/01/1959 | Newton Heath | 65.24 | |||||||
51201 | 24/01/1959 | Newton Heath | 65.22 | |||||||
51202 | 24/01/1959 | Newton Heath | 65.22 | |||||||
51203 | 24/01/1959 | Newton Heath | 65.22 | |||||||
51204 | 31/07/1958 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 65.71 | |||||||
51205 | 31/07/1958 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 65.71 | |||||||
51206 | 08/08/1958 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 65.68 | |||||||
51207 | 08/08/1958 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 65.68 | |||||||
51208 | 29/08/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.63 | |||||||
51209 | 29/08/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.63 | |||||||
51210 | 11/09/1958 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 65.59 | |||||||
51211 | 11/09/1958 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 65.59 | |||||||
51212 | 11/09/1958 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 65.59 | |||||||
51213 | 18/09/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.57 | |||||||
51214 | 18/09/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.57 | |||||||
51215 | 25/09/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.55 | |||||||
51216 | 25/09/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.55 | |||||||
51217 | 02/10/1958 | 65.53 | ||||||||
51218 | 02/10/1958 | 65.53 | ||||||||
51219 | 10/10/1958 | 65.51 | ||||||||
51220 | 10/10/1958 | 65.51 | ||||||||
51221 | 16/10/1958 | 65.50 | ||||||||
51222 | 16/10/1958 | 65.50 | ||||||||
51223 | 23/10/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.48 | |||||||
51224 | ||||||||||
51225 | ||||||||||
51226 | ||||||||||
51227 | ||||||||||
51228 | ||||||||||
51229 | ||||||||||
51230 | ||||||||||
51231 | ||||||||||
51232 | ||||||||||
51233 | ||||||||||
51234 | ||||||||||
51235 | 29/09/1987 | Ayr | ||||||||
51236 | ||||||||||
51237 | 29/09/1987 | Ayr | ||||||||
51238 | ||||||||||
51239 | 29/09/1987 | Ayr | ||||||||
51240 | ||||||||||
51241 | ||||||||||
51242 | ||||||||||
51243 | ||||||||||
51244 | ||||||||||
51245 | ||||||||||
51246 | ||||||||||
51247 | ||||||||||
51248 | ||||||||||
51249 | ||||||||||
51250 | ||||||||||
51251 | ||||||||||
51252 | ||||||||||
51253 |