101
BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
50138 | 17/10/1956 | 67.49 | ||||||||
50139 | 17/10/1956 | 67.49 | ||||||||
50140 | 17/10/1956 | 67.49 | ||||||||
50141 | 17/10/1956 | 67.49 | ||||||||
50142 | 23/10/1956 | 67.47 | ||||||||
50143 | 23/10/1956 | 29/09/1987 | Ayr | 30.92 | 67.47 | |||||
50144 | 09/11/1956 | 67.43 | ||||||||
50145 | 09/11/1956 | 67.43 | ||||||||
50146 | 09/11/1956 | 67.43 | ||||||||
50147 | 09/11/1956 | 67.43 | ||||||||
50148 | 21/11/1956 | 67.39 | ||||||||
50149 | 21/11/1956 | 67.39 | ||||||||
50150 | 30/11/1956 | 67.37 | ||||||||
50151 | 30/11/1956 | 67.37 | ||||||||
50158 | 10/12/1956 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 67.34 | |||||||
50159 | 10/12/1956 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 67.34 | |||||||
50160 | 17/12/1956 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 67.32 | |||||||
50161 | 17/12/1956 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 67.32 | |||||||
50162 | 01/01/1957 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 67.28 | |||||||
50163 | 01/01/1957 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 67.28 | |||||||
50168 | 10/01/1957 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 67.26 | |||||||
50169 | 10/01/1957 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 67.26 | |||||||
50170 | 23/01/1957 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 67.22 | |||||||
50171 | 23/01/1957 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 67.22 | |||||||
50172 | 28/01/1957 | Darlington | 10/09/1987 | Haymarket | 30.67 | 67.21 | ||||
50173 | 28/01/1957 | Darlington | 07/10/1957 | 0.75 | 67.21 | |||||
50174 | 04/02/1957 | Darlington | 10/09/1987 | Ayr | 30.58 | 67.19 | ||||
50175 | 04/02/1957 | Darlington | 29/09/1987 | Ayr | 30.58 | 67.19 | ||||
50176 | 11/02/1957 | Darlington | 67.17 | |||||||
50177 | 11/02/1957 | Darlington | 67.17 | |||||||
50178 | 15/02/1957 | Darlington | 67.16 | |||||||
50179 | 15/02/1957 | Darlington | 67.16 | |||||||
50180 | 28/02/1957 | Darlington | 67.12 | |||||||
50181 | 28/02/1957 | Darlington | 67.12 | |||||||
50182 | 19/03/1957 | Darlington | 67.07 | |||||||
50183 | 19/03/1957 | Darlington | 67.07 | |||||||
50184 | 28/02/1957 | Darlington | 67.12 | |||||||
50185 | 28/02/1957 | Darlington | 67.12 | |||||||
50186 | 06/03/1957 | Darlington | 67.11 | |||||||
50187 | 06/03/1957 | Darlington | 67.11 | |||||||
50188 | 14/03/1957 | Darlington | 67.08 | |||||||
50189 | 14/03/1957 | Darlington | 67.08 | |||||||
50190 | 25/03/1957 | Darlington | 67.05 | |||||||
50191 | 25/03/1957 | Darlington | 67.05 | |||||||
50192 | 29/03/1957 | Darlington | 67.04 | |||||||
50193 | 29/03/1957 | Darlington | 67.04 | |||||||
50194 | 04/04/1957 | Darlington | 67.03 | |||||||
50195 | 04/04/1957 | Darlington | 67.03 | |||||||
50196 | 12/04/1957 | Darlington | 67.01 | |||||||
50197 | 12/04/1957 | Darlington | 67.01 | |||||||
50234 | 17/09/1957 | 66.57 | ||||||||
50235 | 17/09/1957 | 66.57 | ||||||||
50236 | 24/09/1957 | 13/09/1965 | 8 | 66.55 | ||||||
50237 | 24/09/1957 | 66.55 | ||||||||
50238 | 01/10/1957 | 66.53 | ||||||||
50239 | 01/10/1957 | 66.53 | ||||||||
50240 | 08/10/1957 | 66.52 | ||||||||
50241 | 08/10/1957 | 66.52 | ||||||||
50242 | 15/10/1957 | 66.50 | ||||||||
50243 | 15/10/1957 | 66.50 | ||||||||
50244 | 22/10/1957 | 66.48 | ||||||||
50245 | 22/10/1957 | 66.48 | ||||||||
50260 | 14/06/1957 | Darlington | 66.83 | |||||||
50261 | 26/06/1957 | Darlington | 66.80 | |||||||
50262 | 08/07/1957 | Darlington | 66.77 | |||||||
50263 | 25/07/1957 | Darlington | 66.72 | |||||||
50264 | 26/08/1957 | Darlington | 66.63 | |||||||
50265 | 06/09/1957 | Darlington | 66.60 | |||||||
50266 | 14/10/1957 | Darlington | 66.50 | |||||||
50267 | 04/10/1957 | Darlington | 66.53 | |||||||
50268 | 18/10/1957 | Darlington | 66.49 | |||||||
50269 | 31/10/1957 | Darlington | 66.45 | |||||||
50321 | ||||||||||
50322 | ||||||||||
50323 | ||||||||||
50324 | ||||||||||
50325 | ||||||||||
50326 | ||||||||||
50327 | ||||||||||
50328 | ||||||||||
50329 | ||||||||||
50330 | ||||||||||
50331 | ||||||||||
50332 | ||||||||||
50333 | ||||||||||
50334 | ||||||||||
50335 | ||||||||||
50336 | ||||||||||
50337 | ||||||||||
50338 | ||||||||||
50745 | 13/11/1957 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 66.42 | |||||||
50746 | 21/11/1957 | Darlington | 66.39 | |||||||
50747 | 26/11/1957 | Darlington | 66.38 | |||||||
50748 | 05/11/1957 | 66.44 | ||||||||
50749 | 05/11/1957 | 66.44 | ||||||||
50750 | 12/11/1957 | 66.42 | ||||||||
50751 | 12/11/1957 | 66.42 |