119
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
31/10/1958 | To Service | 51052 | NEW | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | |
31/10/1958 | To Service | 51053 | NEW | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | |
31/10/1958 | To Service | 51054 | NEW | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | |
31/10/1958 | To Service | 51055 | NEW | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | |
31/10/1958 | To Service | 51082 | NEW | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | |
31/10/1958 | To Service | 51083 | NEW | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | |
14/12/1968 | Condemned | 51053 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | COND | |
14/12/1968 | Condemned | 51061 | NYA | COND | ||
14/12/1968 | Condemned | 51081 | NYA | COND | ||
14/12/1968 | Condemned | 51089 | NYA | COND | ||
31/05/1981 | Reallocation | 51052 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | CF | Cardiff Canton |
31/05/1981 | Reallocation | 51057 | NYA | RG | Reading (W.R.) | |
31/05/1981 | Reallocation | 51058 | NYA | RG | Reading (W.R.) | |
31/05/1981 | Reallocation | 51080 | NYA | CF | Cardiff Canton | |
31/05/1981 | Reallocation | 51087 | NYA | RG | Reading (W.R.) | |
16/12/1986 | Condemned | 51096 | COND | |||
16/12/1986 | Condemned | 51105 | NYA | COND | ||
29/03/1988 | Condemned | 51056 | NYA | COND | ||
29/03/1988 | Condemned | 51083 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | COND | |
29/03/1988 | Condemned | 51100 | RG | Reading (W.R.) | COND | |
11/05/1988 | Reallocation | 51057 | RG | Reading (W.R.) | TS | Tyseley |
09/09/1988 | Condemned | 51058 | RG | Reading (W.R.) | COND |