119/1 |
51052
|
31/10/1958 |
|
Leyland Engine fitted |
13/08/1977 |
119/1 |
51054
|
31/10/1958 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
09/08/1973 |
119/1 |
51055
|
31/10/1958 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
10/06/1972 |
119/1 |
51056
|
30/11/1958 |
29/03/1988 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
08/04/1972 |
119/1 |
51060
|
31/01/1959 |
|
AEC Engine removed |
08/10/1977 |
119/1 |
51062
|
28/02/1959 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
04/03/1972 |
119/1 |
51063
|
28/02/1959 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
03/07/1973 |
119/1 |
51066
|
30/04/1959 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
07/11/1970 |
119/1 |
51067
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
04/03/1972 |
119/1 |
51068
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
12/02/1972 |
119/1 |
51069
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
06/05/1972 |
119/1 |
51070
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
23/03/1973 |
119/1 |
51075
|
31/10/1959 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
04/11/1972 |
119/1 |
51077
|
30/11/1959 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
10/03/1973 |
119/1 |
51079
|
30/01/1960 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
02/12/1972 |
119/2 |
51080
|
30/09/1958 |
|
AEC Engine removed |
13/08/1977 |
119/2 |
51082
|
31/10/1958 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
09/08/1973 |
119/2 |
51083
|
31/10/1958 |
29/03/1988 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
10/06/1972 |
119/2 |
51084
|
30/11/1958 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
08/04/1972 |
119/2 |
51088
|
31/01/1959 |
|
AEC Engine removed |
08/10/1977 |
119/2 |
51090
|
28/02/1959 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
04/03/1972 |
119/2 |
51091
|
28/02/1959 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
03/07/1973 |
119/2 |
51094
|
30/04/1959 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
07/11/1970 |
119/2 |
51095
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
04/03/1972 |
119/2 |
51096
|
|
16/12/1986 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
12/02/1972 |
119/2 |
51097
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
06/05/1972 |
119/2 |
51098
|
|
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
23/03/1973 |
119/2 |
51103
|
31/10/1959 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
04/11/1972 |
119/2 |
51105
|
30/11/1959 |
16/12/1986 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
10/03/1973 |
119/2 |
51106
|
31/12/1959 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
08/04/1972 |
119/2 |
51107
|
30/01/1960 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
02/12/1972 |