Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 1012 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 5504 Week
» 30338 Month
» 64670 Year
» 1730046 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

120


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
50647
50648 29/09/1987 Haymarket
50649
50650 29/09/1987 Ayr
50651
50652 29/09/1987 Haymarket
50653
50654
50655
50656
50657
50658
50659 29/09/1987 Ayr
50660
50661
50662
50663
50664
50665
50666
50667
50668
50669
50670 29/09/1987 Ayr
50671
50672
50673
50674
50675
50676
50677 30/09/1958 62.45
50678 30/09/1958 62.45
50679 30/09/1958 62.45
50680 30/09/1958 62.45
50681 30/09/1958 62.45
50682 30/09/1958 62.45
50683 31/10/1958 To Western Region / GWR 62.37
50684 31/10/1958 To Western Region / GWR 62.37
50685 31/10/1958 To Western Region / GWR 62.37
50686 31/10/1958 To Western Region / GWR 05/05/1969 10.58 62.37
50687 31/10/1958 To Western Region / GWR 62.37
50688 31/10/1958 To Western Region / GWR 62.37
50689 31/01/1959 62.12
50690 31/01/1959 62.12
50691 31/01/1959 62.12
50692 28/02/1959 62.04
50693 28/02/1959 62.04
50694 31/03/1959 61.95
50695 31/03/1959 61.95
50696
50697
50698 10/09/1987 Haymarket
50699
50700
50701
50702
50703
50704
50705
50706
50707
50708
50709 29/09/1987 Ayr
50710
50711
50712
50713
50714
50715
50716
50717
50718
50719
50720
50721
50722 31/07/1958 To Western Region / GWR 15/07/1987 Ayr 29 62.62
50723 31/07/1958 To Western Region / GWR 62.62
50724 31/08/1958 62.53
50725 31/08/1958 62.53
50726 31/08/1958 62.53
50727 31/08/1958 62.53
50728 31/08/1958 62.53
50729 31/08/1958 62.53
50730 31/08/1958 62.53
50731 31/08/1958 62.53
50732 30/11/1958 62.28
50733 30/11/1958 05/05/1969 10.5 62.28
50734 30/11/1958 62.28
50735 30/11/1958 62.28
50736 30/11/1958 62.28
50737 31/12/1958 62.20
50738 31/12/1958 29/09/1987 Haymarket 28.75 62.20
50739 31/12/1958 16/08/1987 Cambridge 28.67 62.20
50740 31/12/1958 62.20
50741 31/12/1958 62.20
50742 31/12/1958 62.20
50743 31/12/1958 62.20
50744 31/12/1958 62.20
51573 31/01/1961 60.11
51574 31/01/1961 60.11
51575 31/01/1961 16/08/1987 Cambridge 26.58 60.11
51576
51577
51578
51579 16/11/1987 Neville Hill
51580
51581
51582
51583
51584
51585
51586
51587 24/05/1988 Haymarket
51588
51589
51590 24/02/1987 Cambridge
51781 28/11/1959 Kittybrewster 61.29
51782 28/11/1959 Kittybrewster 10/09/1987 Haymarket 27.83 61.29
51783 28/11/1959 Kittybrewster 61.29
51784 05/12/1959 Kittybrewster 61.27
51785 05/12/1959 Kittybrewster 61.27
51786 12/12/1959 Kittybrewster 61.25
51787 12/12/1959 Kittybrewster 61.25
51788 09/01/1960 Kittybrewster 10/09/1987 Haymarket 27.67 61.18
51789 16/01/1960 Kittybrewster 61.16
51790 23/01/1960 Kittybrewster 61.14
51791 23/01/1960 Kittybrewster 61.14
51792 13/02/1960 Kittybrewster 61.08
51793 20/02/1960 Kittybrewster 61.06
51794 20/02/1960 Kittybrewster 08/06/1986 Ayr 26.33 61.06