120
BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
50696 | ||||||||||
50697 | ||||||||||
50698 | 10/09/1987 | Haymarket | ||||||||
50699 | ||||||||||
50700 | ||||||||||
50701 | ||||||||||
50702 | ||||||||||
50703 | ||||||||||
50704 | ||||||||||
50705 | ||||||||||
50706 | ||||||||||
50707 | ||||||||||
50708 | ||||||||||
50709 | 29/09/1987 | Ayr | ||||||||
50710 | ||||||||||
50711 | ||||||||||
50712 | ||||||||||
50713 | ||||||||||
50714 | ||||||||||
50715 | ||||||||||
50716 | ||||||||||
50717 | ||||||||||
50718 | ||||||||||
50719 | ||||||||||
50720 | ||||||||||
50721 | ||||||||||
50722 | 31/07/1958 | To Western Region / GWR | 15/07/1987 | Ayr | 29 | 65.70 | ||||
50723 | 31/07/1958 | To Western Region / GWR | 65.70 | |||||||
50724 | 31/08/1958 | 65.62 | ||||||||
50725 | 31/08/1958 | 65.62 | ||||||||
50726 | 31/08/1958 | 65.62 | ||||||||
50727 | 31/08/1958 | 65.62 | ||||||||
50728 | 31/08/1958 | 65.62 | ||||||||
50729 | 31/08/1958 | 65.62 | ||||||||
50730 | 31/08/1958 | 65.62 | ||||||||
50731 | 31/08/1958 | 65.62 | ||||||||
50732 | 30/11/1958 | 65.37 | ||||||||
50733 | 30/11/1958 | 05/05/1969 | 10.5 | 65.37 | ||||||
50734 | 30/11/1958 | 65.37 | ||||||||
50735 | 30/11/1958 | 65.37 | ||||||||
50736 | 30/11/1958 | 65.37 | ||||||||
50737 | 31/12/1958 | 65.28 | ||||||||
50738 | 31/12/1958 | 29/09/1987 | Haymarket | 28.75 | 65.28 | |||||
50739 | 31/12/1958 | 16/08/1987 | Cambridge | 28.67 | 65.28 | |||||
50740 | 31/12/1958 | 65.28 | ||||||||
50741 | 31/12/1958 | 65.28 | ||||||||
50742 | 31/12/1958 | 65.28 | ||||||||
50743 | 31/12/1958 | 65.28 | ||||||||
50744 | 31/12/1958 | 65.28 | ||||||||
51573 | 31/01/1961 | 63.20 | ||||||||
51574 | 31/01/1961 | 63.20 | ||||||||
51575 | 31/01/1961 | 16/08/1987 | Cambridge | 26.58 | 63.20 | |||||
51576 | ||||||||||
51577 | ||||||||||
51578 | ||||||||||
51579 | 16/11/1987 | Neville Hill | ||||||||
51580 | ||||||||||
51581 | ||||||||||
51781 | 28/11/1959 | Kittybrewster | 64.38 | |||||||
51782 | 28/11/1959 | Kittybrewster | 10/09/1987 | Haymarket | 27.83 | 64.38 | ||||
51783 | 28/11/1959 | Kittybrewster | 64.38 | |||||||
51784 | 05/12/1959 | Kittybrewster | 18/12/1980 | 21 | 64.36 | |||||
51785 | 05/12/1959 | Kittybrewster | 64.36 | |||||||
51786 | 12/12/1959 | Kittybrewster | 64.34 | |||||||
51787 | 12/12/1959 | Kittybrewster | 64.34 |