Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 71 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 5602 Week
» 30436 Month
» 64768 Year
» 1730144 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

120


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
50647
50648 29/09/1987 Haymarket
50649
50650 29/09/1987 Ayr
50651
50652 29/09/1987 Haymarket
50653
50654
50655
50656
50657
50658
50659 29/09/1987 Ayr
50660
50661
50662
50663
50664
50665
50666
50667
50668
50669
50670 29/09/1987 Ayr
50671
50672
50673
50674
50675
50676
50677 30/09/1958 62.45
50678 30/09/1958 62.45
50679 30/09/1958 62.45
50680 30/09/1958 62.45
50681 30/09/1958 62.45
50682 30/09/1958 62.45
50683 31/10/1958 To Western Region / GWR 62.37
50684 31/10/1958 To Western Region / GWR 62.37
50685 31/10/1958 To Western Region / GWR 62.37
50686 31/10/1958 To Western Region / GWR 05/05/1969 10.58 62.37
50687 31/10/1958 To Western Region / GWR 62.37
50688 31/10/1958 To Western Region / GWR 62.37
50689 31/01/1959 62.12
50690 31/01/1959 62.12
50691 31/01/1959 62.12
50692 28/02/1959 62.04
50693 28/02/1959 62.04
50694 31/03/1959 61.96
50695 31/03/1959 61.96
51582
51583
51584
51585
51586
51587 24/05/1988 Haymarket
51588
51589
51590 24/02/1987 Cambridge
51788 09/01/1960 Kittybrewster 10/09/1987 Haymarket 27.67 61.18
51789 16/01/1960 Kittybrewster 61.16
51790 23/01/1960 Kittybrewster 61.14
51791 23/01/1960 Kittybrewster 61.14
51792 13/02/1960 Kittybrewster 61.08
51793 20/02/1960 Kittybrewster 61.06
51794 20/02/1960 Kittybrewster 08/06/1986 Ayr 26.33 61.06