25 Bo-Bo
Old Number | Company | Old Num Type | New Number | Company | Subtype | New Num Type | Date | Notes | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D7558 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25208 | BR | Tops | TOPS | on | 01/09/1973 | |
D7519 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25169 | BR | Tops | TOPS | on | 11/09/1973 | |
D7632 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25282 | BR | Tops | TOPS | on | 12/09/1973 | |
D5299 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25149 | BR | Tops | TOPS | on | 14/09/1973 | |
D5161 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25011 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 10/1973 | |
D7638 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25288 | BR | Tops | TOPS | on | 01/10/1973 | |
D5274 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25124 | BR | Tops | TOPS | on | 03/10/1973 | |
D5283 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25133 | BR | Tops | TOPS | on | 10/10/1973 | |
D5177 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25027 | BR | Tops | TOPS | on | 12/10/1973 | |
D7634 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25284 | BR | Tops | TOPS | on | 20/10/1973 | |
D7594 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25244 | BR | Tops | TOPS | on | 30/10/1973 | |
D5181 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25031 | BR | Tops | TOPS | on | 01/11/1973 | |
D5296 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25146 | BR | Tops | TOPS | on | 06/11/1973 | |
D7585 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25235 | BR | Tops | TOPS | on | 12/11/1973 | |
D7673 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25323 | BR | Tops | TOPS | on | 13/11/1973 | |
D7563 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25213 | BR | Tops | TOPS | on | 14/11/1973 | |
D5169 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25019 | BR | Tops | TOPS | on | 16/11/1973 | |
D7561 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25211 | BR | Tops | TOPS | on | 24/11/1973 | |
D7587 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25237 | BR | Tops | TOPS | on | 26/11/1973 | |
D7650 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25300 | BR | Tops | TOPS | on | 30/11/1973 | |
D5251 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25101 | BR | Tops | TOPS | on | 05/12/1973 | |
D7616 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25266 | BR | Tops | TOPS | on | 05/12/1973 | |
D7647 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25297 | BR | Tops | TOPS | on | 15/12/1973 | |
D7560 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25210 | BR | Tops | TOPS | on | 19/12/1973 | |
D5155 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25005 | BR | Tops | TOPS | 01/1974 | ||
D5230 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25080 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 01/1974 | |
D7565 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25215 | BR | Tops | TOPS | 5w/e | 05/01/1974 | |
D5184 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25034 | BR | Tops | TOPS | w/e | 26/01/1974 | |
D5272 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25122 | BR | Tops | TOPS | on | 28/01/1974 | |
D7629 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25279 | BR | Tops | TOPS | on | 29/01/1974 | |
D7628 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25278 | BR | Tops | TOPS | on | 31/01/1974 | |
D5162 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25012 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5166 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25016 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5167 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25017 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5168 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25018 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5171 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25021 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5173 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25023 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5175 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25025 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5176 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25026 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5180 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25030 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5183 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25033 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5185 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25035 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5188 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25038 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5189 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25039 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5191 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25041 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5192 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25042 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5195 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25045 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5196 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25046 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5198 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25048 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5201 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25051 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5202 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25052 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5203 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25053 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5208 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25058 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5209 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25059 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5210 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25060 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5212 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25062 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5213 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25063 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5219 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25069 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5228 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25078 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5231 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25081 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5233 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25083 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5234 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25084 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5236 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25086 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5237 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25087 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5240 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25090 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5242 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25092 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5248 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25098 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5255 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25105 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5259 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25109 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5260 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25110 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5264 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25114 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5266 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25116 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5267 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25117 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5269 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25119 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5271 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25121 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5282 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25132 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5288 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25138 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5289 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25139 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5293 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25143 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5295 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25145 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5298 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25148 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7500 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25150 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7501 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25151 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7517 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25167 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7532 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25182 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7533 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25183 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7535 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25185 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7539 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25189 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7542 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25192 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7543 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25193 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7544 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25194 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7545 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25195 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7546 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25196 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7547 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25197 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7552 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25202 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7553 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25203 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7557 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25207 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7562 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25212 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7570 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25220 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7571 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25221 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7574 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25224 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7575 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25225 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7582 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25232 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7584 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25234 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7590 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25240 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7592 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25242 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7596 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25246 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7598 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25248 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7599 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25249 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7600 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25250 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7617 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25267 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7633 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25283 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7639 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25289 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7641 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25291 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7642 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25292 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7643 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25293 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7645 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25295 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7646 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25296 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7649 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25299 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7652 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25302 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7653 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25303 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7660 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25310 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7661 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25311 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7667 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25317 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7675 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25325 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D7676 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25326 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5229 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25079 | BR | Tops | TOPS | w/e | 02/02/1974 | |
D7627 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25277 | BR | Tops | TOPS | on | 02/02/1974 | |
D5152 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25002 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5153 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25003 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5156 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25006 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5163 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25013 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5170 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25020 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5172 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25022 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5174 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25024 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5182 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25032 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5186 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25036 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5187 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25037 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5194 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25044 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5197 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25047 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5200 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25050 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5204 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25054 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5205 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25055 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5206 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25056 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5214 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25064 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5215 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25065 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5216 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25066 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5217 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25067 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5218 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25068 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5220 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25070 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5222 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25072 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5223 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25073 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5224 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25074 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5226 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25076 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5249 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25099 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5253 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25103 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5257 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25107 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5258 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25108 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5261 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25111 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5268 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25118 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5270 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25120 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5277 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25127 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5280 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25130 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5285 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25135 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5286 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25136 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5290 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25140 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5291 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25141 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5292 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25142 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5297 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25147 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7504 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25154 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7509 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25159 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7513 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25163 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7518 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25168 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7524 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25174 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7525 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25175 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7527 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25177 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7528 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25178 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7548 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25198 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7549 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25199 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7551 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25201 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7568 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25218 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7572 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25222 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7580 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25230 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7583 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25233 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7586 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25236 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7593 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25243 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7595 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25245 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7597 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25247 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7602 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25252 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7603 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25253 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7606 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25256 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7609 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25259 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7610 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25260 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7612 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25262 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7614 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25264 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7615 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25265 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7623 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25273 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7637 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25287 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7640 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25290 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7651 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25301 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7655 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25305 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7663 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25313 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7664 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25314 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7665 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25315 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7666 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25316 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7668 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25318 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7669 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25319 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D7670 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25320 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5151 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25001 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5154 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25004 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5159 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25009 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5160 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25010 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5178 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25028 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5179 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25029 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5190 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25040 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5193 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25043 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5199 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25049 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5207 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25057 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5221 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25071 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5227 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25077 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5232 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25082 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5235 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25085 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5238 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25088 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5239 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25089 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5241 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25091 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5243 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25093 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5244 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25094 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5245 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25095 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5246 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25096 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5250 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25100 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5252 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25102 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5254 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25104 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5262 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25112 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5263 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25113 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5265 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25115 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5275 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25125 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5276 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25126 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5279 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25129 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5281 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25131 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5287 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25137 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7502 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25152 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7503 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25153 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7505 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25155 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7510 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25160 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7511 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25161 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7512 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25162 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7514 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25164 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7515 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25165 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7516 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25166 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7523 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25173 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7526 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25176 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7529 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25179 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7530 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25180 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7531 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25181 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7536 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25186 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7537 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25187 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7538 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25188 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7541 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25191 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7550 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25200 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7555 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25205 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7559 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25209 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7566 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25216 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7567 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25217 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7573 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25223 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7578 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25228 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7579 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25229 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7589 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25239 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7591 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25241 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7601 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25251 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7604 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25254 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7607 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25257 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7608 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25258 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7611 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25261 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7619 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25269 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7621 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25271 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7625 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25275 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7626 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25276 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7630 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25280 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7631 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25281 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7635 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25285 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7636 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25286 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7648 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25298 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7654 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25304 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7658 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25308 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7659 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25309 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7662 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25312 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7672 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25322 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D7674 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25324 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5157 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25007 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D5164 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25014 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D5165 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25015 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D5211 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25061 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D5247 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25097 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D5256 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25106 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D5273 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25123 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D5284 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25134 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D5294 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25144 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D7507 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25157 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D7508 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25158 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D7522 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25172 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D7554 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25204 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D7556 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25206 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D7564 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25214 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D7569 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25219 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D7588 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25238 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D7613 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25263 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D7618 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25268 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D7622 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25272 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D7624 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25274 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D7644 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25294 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D7656 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25306 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D7657 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25307 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D7671 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25321 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D7677 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25327 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D7521 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25171 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 06/1974 | |
D7540 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25190 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 06/1974 | |
D7577 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25227 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 06/1974 | |
D7620 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25270 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 06/1974 | |
D7506 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25156 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 07/1974 | |
D7520 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25170 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 07/1974 | |
D7534 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25184 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 07/1974 | |
D5158 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25008 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 09/1974 | |
D7576 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25226 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 09/1974 | |
D7581 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25231 | BR | Tops | TOPS | m/e | 09/1974 | |
D5225 | BR | Pre TOPS | 25075 | BR | Tops | TOPS | 12/1974 | ||
25310 | BR | TOPS | 97250 | BR | ETHEL | Departmental | m/e | 06/1983 | |
25305 | BR | TOPS | 97251 | BR | Ethel | Departmental | m/e | 08/1983 | Unpowered |
25314 | BR | TOPS | 97252 | BR | Ethel | Departmental | m/e | 08/1983 | Unpowered |
25131 | BR | TOPS | 97202 | BR | 97/2 | Departmental | on | 01/10/1983 | |
25283 | BR | TOPS | 25904 | BR | 25/9 | TOPS | on | 12/11/1985 | |
25322 | BR | TOPS | 25912 | BR | 25/9 | TOPS | on | 20/11/1985 | |
25286 | BR | TOPS | 25905 | BR | 25/9 | TOPS | on | 25/11/1985 | |
25297 | BR | TOPS | 25907 | BR | 25/9 | TOPS | on | 26/11/1985 | |
25315 | BR | TOPS | 25910 | BR | 25/9 | TOPS | on | 04/12/1985 | |
25268 | BR | TOPS | 25902 | BR | 25/9 | TOPS | on | 11/12/1985 | |
25309 | BR | TOPS | 25909 | BR | 25/9 | TOPS | on | 11/12/1985 | |
25296 | BR | TOPS | 25906 | BR | 25/9 | TOPS | on | 13/12/1985 | |
25307 | BR | TOPS | 25908 | BR | 25/9 | TOPS | on | 14/12/1985 | |
25316 | BR | TOPS | 25911 | BR | 25/9 | TOPS | on | 16/12/1985 | |
25262 | BR | TOPS | 25901 | BR | 25/9 | TOPS | on | 20/12/1985 | |
25276 | BR | TOPS | 25903 | BR | 25/9 | TOPS | on | 02/01/1986 |