Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 36 Today
» 1160 Yesterday
» 3361 Week
» 3361 Month
» 70223 Year
» 1735599 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

122


BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
55000 LA Laira 23/09/1987
55001
55002 W Withdrawn 21/12/1986 21/12/1986
55003 LA Laira 23/09/1987
55004
55005
55006
55007
55008
55009 LA Laira 23/09/1987
55010
55011
55012
55016 31/07/1958 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 31/07/1958
55017 31/07/1958 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 31/07/1958
55018 31/07/1958 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 31/07/1958
55019 31/07/1958 91W
W
To Western Region / GWR (New)
Withdrawn
31/07/1958
02/11/1969
02/11/1969