125
BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
50988 | 12/12/1958 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 12/12/1958 | |
50989 | 15/01/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 15/01/1959 | |
50990 | 09/01/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 09/01/1959 | |
50991 | 09/01/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 09/01/1959 | |
50992 | 06/01/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 06/01/1959 | |
50993 | 30/01/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 30/01/1959 | |
50994 | 28/01/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 28/01/1959 | |
50995 | 03/02/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 03/02/1959 | |
50996 | 05/03/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 05/03/1959 | |
50997 | 13/02/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 13/02/1959 | |
50998 | 18/02/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 18/02/1959 | |
50999 | 26/02/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 26/02/1959 | |
51000 | 12/03/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 12/03/1959 | |
51001 | 12/05/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 12/05/1959 | |
51002 | 12/05/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 12/05/1959 | |
51003 | 12/05/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 12/05/1959 | |
51004 | 14/04/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 14/04/1959 | |
51005 | 14/04/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 14/04/1959 | |
51006 | 07/05/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 07/05/1959 | |
51007 | |||||
51154 | 12/12/1958 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 12/12/1958 | |
51155 | 15/01/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 15/01/1959 | |
51156 | 09/01/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 09/01/1959 | |
51157 | 09/01/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 09/01/1959 | |
51158 | 06/01/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 06/01/1959 | |
51159 | 30/01/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 30/01/1959 | |
51160 | 28/01/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 28/01/1959 | |
51161 | 03/02/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 03/02/1959 | |
51162 | 05/03/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 05/03/1959 | |
51163 | 13/02/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 13/02/1959 | |
51164 | 18/02/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 18/02/1959 | |
51165 | 26/02/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 26/02/1959 | |
51166 | 12/03/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 12/03/1959 | |
51167 | 12/05/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 12/05/1959 | |
51168 | 12/05/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 12/05/1959 | |
51169 | 12/05/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 12/05/1959 | |
51170 | 14/04/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 14/04/1959 | |
51171 | 14/04/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 14/04/1959 | |
51172 | 07/05/1959 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 07/05/1959 | |
51173 |