125
BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
50988 | 12/12/1958 | Stratford | 65.41 | |||||||
50989 | 15/01/1959 | Stratford | 65.32 | |||||||
50990 | 09/01/1959 | Stratford | 65.34 | |||||||
50991 | 09/01/1959 | Stratford | 65.34 | |||||||
50992 | 06/01/1959 | Stratford | 65.35 | |||||||
50993 | 30/01/1959 | Stratford | 65.28 | |||||||
50994 | 28/01/1959 | Stratford | 65.28 | |||||||
50995 | 03/02/1959 | Stratford | 65.27 | |||||||
50996 | 05/03/1959 | Stratford | 65.19 | |||||||
50997 | 13/02/1959 | Stratford | 65.24 | |||||||
50998 | 18/02/1959 | Stratford | 65.23 | |||||||
50999 | 26/02/1959 | Stratford | 65.21 | |||||||
51000 | 12/03/1959 | Stratford | 65.17 | |||||||
51001 | 12/05/1959 | Stratford | 65.00 | |||||||
51002 | 12/05/1959 | Stratford | 65.00 | |||||||
51003 | 12/05/1959 | Stratford | 65.00 | |||||||
51004 | 14/04/1959 | Stratford | 65.08 | |||||||
51005 | 14/04/1959 | Stratford | 65.08 | |||||||
51006 | 07/05/1959 | Stratford | 65.01 | |||||||
51007 | ||||||||||
51154 | 12/12/1958 | Stratford | 65.41 | |||||||
51155 | 15/01/1959 | Stratford | 65.32 | |||||||
51156 | 09/01/1959 | Stratford | 65.34 | |||||||
51157 | 09/01/1959 | Stratford | 65.34 | |||||||
51158 | 06/01/1959 | Stratford | 65.35 | |||||||
51159 | 30/01/1959 | Stratford | 65.28 | |||||||
51160 | 28/01/1959 | Stratford | 65.28 | |||||||
51161 | 03/02/1959 | Stratford | 65.27 | |||||||
51162 | 05/03/1959 | Stratford | 65.19 | |||||||
51163 | 13/02/1959 | Stratford | 65.24 | |||||||
51164 | 18/02/1959 | Stratford | 65.23 | |||||||
51165 | 26/02/1959 | Stratford | 65.21 | |||||||
51166 | 12/03/1959 | Stratford | 65.17 | |||||||
51167 | 12/05/1959 | Stratford | 65.00 | |||||||
51168 | 12/05/1959 | Stratford | 65.00 | |||||||
51169 | 12/05/1959 | Stratford | 65.00 | |||||||
51170 | 14/04/1959 | Stratford | 65.08 | |||||||
51171 | 14/04/1959 | Stratford | 65.08 | |||||||
51172 | 07/05/1959 | Stratford | 65.01 | |||||||
51173 |