Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 122 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4614 Week
» 29448 Month
» 63780 Year
» 1729156 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

125


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
50988 12/12/1958 Stratford 62.25
50989 15/01/1959 Stratford 62.16
50990 09/01/1959 Stratford 62.18
50991 09/01/1959 Stratford 62.18
50992 06/01/1959 Stratford 62.18
50993 30/01/1959 Stratford 62.12
50994 28/01/1959 Stratford 62.12
50995 03/02/1959 Stratford 62.11
50996 05/03/1959 Stratford 62.02
50997 13/02/1959 Stratford 62.08
50998 18/02/1959 Stratford 62.07
50999 26/02/1959 Stratford 62.04
51000 12/03/1959 Stratford 62.01
51001 12/05/1959 Stratford 61.84
51002 12/05/1959 Stratford 61.84
51003 12/05/1959 Stratford 61.84
51004 14/04/1959 Stratford 61.92
51005 14/04/1959 Stratford 61.92
51006 07/05/1959 Stratford 61.85
51007