Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Donations

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 2601 Today
» 5326 Yesterday
» 7927 Week
» 143332 Month
» 603273 Year
» 5042710 Total
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)

29 Bo-Bo


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Sun 07/06/1959 D6114 30A   On Stratford shed - Fresh all over green The Early Years of London Diesels  
Sun 20/05/1962 D6101,
D6106,
D6112,
D6123,
D6133
65A,
65A,
65A,
65A,
65A
  Carriage shops at St. Rollox Works: In store
Carriage shops at St. Rollox Works: In store
Carriage shops at St. Rollox Works: In store
Carriage shops at St. Rollox Works: In store
Carriage shops at St. Rollox Works: In store
SLS 7/1962  
Wed 01/05/1963 D6121 65A   18:00 Dundee - Glasgow Buchanan Street, but failed at Ninewells Junction. Train taken back to Dundee and then worked forward by a B1 MR 8/1963  
Wed 10/07/1963 D6123 65A   Test run at Fulwood Junction, Mossend, after re-engineering MR 9/1963  
Tue 13/08/1963 D6123 65A   Worked the Gushetfaulds - Aston "Condor" throughout to Birmingham MR 10/1963  
Tue 13/08/1963 D6123 65A   Worked the Aston - Gushetfaulds "Condor" throughout from Birmingham to Glasgow MR 10/1963  
Wed 21/08/1963 D6123 65A   Worked the Gushetfaulds - Aston "Condor" throughout to Birmingham MR 10/1963  
Wed 21/08/1963 D6123 65A   Worked the Aston - Gushetfaulds "Condor" throughout from Birmingham to Glasgow MR 10/1963  
Wed 12/02/1964 D6113 65A   Minor fire caused by brake blocks igniting oil and dirt CD&E #9  
Fri 17/07/1964 D6119 65A   Serious fire caused by brake blocks igniting oil and dirt CD&E #9  
Tue 22/09/1964 D6129 65A   Minor fire caused by brake blocks igniting oil and dirt CD&E #9  
Sun 24/10/1965 D6103 65A   St Rollox shed: Stabled on St Rollox shed RCTS 12/1965  
Sun 24/10/1965 D6100,
D6107,
D6112,
D6113,
D6133
65A,
65A,
65A,
65A,
65A
  St Rollox shed: Stored at St Rollox shed
St Rollox shed: Stored at St Rollox shed
St Rollox shed: Stored at St Rollox shed
St Rollox shed: Stored at St Rollox shed
St Rollox shed: Stored at St Rollox shed
RCTS 12/1965  
Sat 19/03/1966 D6121 65A   Rugby special from Glasgow to Edinburgh Stephen Hall  
Mon 18/07/1966 D6123 65A   Dundee - Glasgow working. Two tone green, no headcode box, rectangular yellow warning panel Barking Bill  
Mon 18/07/1966 D6121 65A   Worked a Glasgow - Dundee service. Two tone green with large square yellow warning panel Barking Bill  
Thu 22/09/1966 D6129 65A   Stabled at Kittybrewster shed: Stabled at Kittybrewster    
Sun 06/11/1966 D6102 65A   On Eastfield depot - On shed - two tone green, large yellow panel    
Sat 15/07/1967 D6108,
D6114
65A,
65A
  Inverurie Works visit: On works - Dumped outside the Works
Inverurie Works visit: On works
RO 9/1969  
Sun 17/12/1967 D6124 65A   At Edinburgh Waverley RO 2/1968  
Fri 24/05/1968 D6112,
D6137
65A,
65A
  On Eastfield depot - On shed - two tone green, large yellow panel
On Eastfield depot - On shed - blue with full yellow ends
   
Thu 15/08/1968 D6113,
D6124
65A,
65A
  Inverurie Works visit: In Works
Inverurie Works visit: In Works
RO 10/1968  
Tue 27/08/1968 D6100 65A   Dundee depot: Around the area - On the shed RO 12/1968  
Wed 28/08/1968 D6121 65A   Inverurie Works visit: In Works - In the shops RO 11/1968  
Tue 10/09/1968 D6100 65A   D1974 ran low on fuel while working the 10:20 Edinburgh - Aberdeen at barry Links. D6100 in blue took over for the rest of the run. RO 11/1968  
Wed 02/10/1968 D6129 65A 1F50 D6129 arrived at Waverley from Bonar Bridge with a 3 coach special conveying Sheik Zaid of Abu Dhabi. The occupants had been on a shooting party. The train was taken on to Kings Cross by D1971 (1F50) RO 12/1968  
Mon 06/01/1969 D6102 65A   Eastfield shed - Snow covered and stabled.    
Wed 16/04/1969 D6130 65A   Dundee - Glasgow service - Two tone green with square yellow warning panel David Mant  
Tue 15/07/1969 D6108 Wdn   Stabled out of use at Inverurie Works K Hughes  
Sat 09/08/1969 D6100 65A   On Eastfield shed. - BR blue livery. Rail Blue  
Sat 28/02/1970 D6102 65A   Worked ecs of football special (Hib v Rangers) in Edinburgh Bill Jamieson  
Thu 09/04/1970 D6123 65A   15:40 Dundee - Glasgow Queen Street Bill Jamieson  
Tue 11/08/1970 D6108,
D6130
Wdn,
65A
  On Eastfield shed. - BR blue livery.
On Eastfield shed. - Green livery.
Rail Blue  
Wed 16/06/1971 D6124 65A   Worked out of Grangemouth on 12 x 45t oil tankers Bill Jamieson  
Wed 16/06/1971 D6121 65A   Worked a Grangemouth - Bishopriggs rake of 45t oil tankers Bill Jamieson  
Fri 20/08/1971 D6101,
D6102,
D6106,
D6123
Wdn,
65A,
Wdn,
65A
  Polmadie depot.: Around the shed. - Inside the shed - two tone green with full yellow ends.
Polmadie depot.: Around the shed. - Outside the shed - two tone green with full yellow ends.
Polmadie depot.: Around the shed. - Outside the shed - two tone green with full yellow ends.
Polmadie depot.: Around the shed. - Inside the shed - two tone green with full yellow ends.
Keith Long  
Sat 25/09/1971 D6103,
D6119,
D6130
65A,
65A,
65A
  Eastfield depot: On shed.
Eastfield depot: On shed.
Eastfield depot: On shed.
Flickr - Ian "B"  
Sat 15/04/1972 D6101,
D6107,
D6114,
D6119,
D6124,
D6137
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn
  Polmadie depot: Dumped - Still in green livery