127
BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
51591 | 16/05/1959 | 14A | Cricklewood East (New) | 16/05/1959 | 01/05/1977 |
51592 | 16/05/1959 | 14A | Cricklewood East (New) | 16/05/1959 | |
51593 | |||||
51594 | W | Withdrawn | 19/11/1966 | 19/11/1966 | |
51595 | |||||
51596 | |||||
51597 | |||||
51598 | |||||
51599 | |||||
51600 | |||||
51601 | 31/12/1977 | ||||
51602 | |||||
51603 | |||||
51604 | |||||
51605 | |||||
51606 | |||||
51607 | |||||
51608 | |||||
51609 | 11/04/1964 | ||||
51610 | |||||
51611 | |||||
51612 | |||||
51613 | |||||
51614 | |||||
51615 | |||||
51616 | |||||
51617 | |||||
51618 | |||||
51619 | |||||
51620 | |||||
51621 | |||||
51622 | |||||
51623 | |||||
51624 | |||||
51625 | |||||
51626 | |||||
51627 | |||||
51628 | |||||
51629 | |||||
51630 | |||||
51631 | |||||
51632 | TS | Tyseley | 08/05/1988 | ||
51633 | |||||
51634 | |||||
51635 | |||||
51636 | |||||
51637 | 14/11/1959 | (New) | 14/11/1959 | ||
51638 | 14/11/1959 | (New) | 14/11/1959 | ||
51639 | 14/11/1959 | (New) | 14/11/1959 | ||
51640 | 14/11/1959 | (New) | 14/11/1959 | ||
51641 | 14/11/1959 | (New) | 14/11/1959 | 31/12/1977 | |
51642 | 14/11/1959 | (New) | 14/11/1959 | ||
51643 | 28/11/1959 | (New) | 28/11/1959 | ||
51644 | 28/11/1959 | (New) | 28/11/1959 | ||
51645 | 19/12/1959 | (New) | 19/12/1959 | ||
51646 | 19/12/1959 | (New) | 19/12/1959 | ||
51647 | 28/11/1959 | (New) | 28/11/1959 | ||
51648 | 28/11/1959 | (New) | 28/11/1959 | ||
51649 | 19/12/1959 | 14A | Cricklewood East (New) | 19/12/1959 | |
51650 | 19/12/1959 | 14A | Cricklewood East (New) | 19/12/1959 |