Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 801 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2966 Week
» 2966 Month
» 69828 Year
» 1735204 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

127


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To
16/05/1959 To Service 51591   NEW 14A Cricklewood East
16/05/1959 To Service 51592   NEW 14A Cricklewood East
19/12/1959 To Service 51649   NEW 14A Cricklewood East
19/12/1959 To Service 51650   NEW 14A Cricklewood East
11/04/1964 Condemned 51609       COND
19/11/1966 Condemned 51594       COND