127
BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
51591 | 16/05/1959 | Cricklewood East | 01/05/1977 | Cricklewood East | 18 | 64.89 | ||||
51592 | 16/05/1959 | Cricklewood East | 64.89 | |||||||
51593 | ||||||||||
51594 | 19/11/1966 | |||||||||
51595 | ||||||||||
51596 | ||||||||||
51597 | ||||||||||
51598 | ||||||||||
51599 | ||||||||||
51600 | ||||||||||
51601 | 31/12/1977 | |||||||||
51602 | ||||||||||
51603 | ||||||||||
51604 | ||||||||||
51605 | ||||||||||
51606 | ||||||||||
51607 | ||||||||||
51608 | ||||||||||
51609 | 11/04/1964 | |||||||||
51610 | ||||||||||
51611 | ||||||||||
51612 | ||||||||||
51613 | ||||||||||
51614 | ||||||||||
51615 | ||||||||||
51616 | ||||||||||
51617 | ||||||||||
51618 | ||||||||||
51619 | ||||||||||
51620 | ||||||||||
51621 | ||||||||||
51622 | ||||||||||
51623 | ||||||||||
51624 | ||||||||||
51625 | ||||||||||
51626 | ||||||||||
51627 | ||||||||||
51628 | ||||||||||
51629 | ||||||||||
51630 | ||||||||||
51631 | ||||||||||
51632 | ||||||||||
51633 | ||||||||||
51634 | ||||||||||
51635 | ||||||||||
51636 | ||||||||||
51637 | 14/11/1959 | 64.39 | ||||||||
51638 | 14/11/1959 | 64.39 | ||||||||
51639 | 14/11/1959 | 64.39 | ||||||||
51640 | 14/11/1959 | 64.39 | ||||||||
51641 | 14/11/1959 | 31/12/1977 | 18.08 | 64.39 | ||||||
51642 | 14/11/1959 | 64.39 | ||||||||
51643 | 28/11/1959 | 64.35 | ||||||||
51644 | 28/11/1959 | 64.35 | ||||||||
51645 | 19/12/1959 | 64.29 | ||||||||
51646 | 19/12/1959 | 64.29 | ||||||||
51647 | 28/11/1959 | 64.35 | ||||||||
51648 | 28/11/1959 | 64.35 | ||||||||
51649 | 19/12/1959 | Cricklewood East | 64.29 | |||||||
51650 | 19/12/1959 | Cricklewood East | 64.29 |