Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Donations

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 274 Today
» 3545 Yesterday
» 16581 Week
» 68466 Month
» 693821 Year
» 3720674 Total
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)

31 A1A-A1A


BR (Pre Tops) BR (31/0) BR (31/1) BR (31/4) BR (31/4 (2)) BR (31/5) BR (31/5 (2)) BR (31/6) BR (31/9) BR (97/2) BR (Dept) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
D5500 31018                   10/10/1957 30A
31B
32A
30A

W
Stratford (New)
March
Norwich Thorpe
Stratford

Withdrawn
10/10/1957
13/06/1959
20/06/1959
23/06/1962
09/05/1976
10/07/1976
10/07/1976
D5501 31001                   25/11/1957 30A

W
Stratford (New)

Withdrawn
25/11/1957
09/05/1976
10/07/1976
10/07/1976
D5502 31002                 ADB968014 16/12/1957 30A
32B
30A
W
Stratford (New)
Ipswich
Stratford
Withdrawn
16/12/1957
14/03/1959
07/11/1959
01/01/1980
01/01/1980
D5503 31003                   09/01/1958 30A
31B
30A
W
Stratford (New)
March
Stratford
Withdrawn
09/01/1958
09/05/1959
05/12/1959
03/02/1980
03/02/1980
D5504 31004                   30/01/1958 30A
31B
30A
MR
SF
W
Stratford (New)
March
Stratford
March
Stratford
Withdrawn
30/01/1958
13/06/1959
05/12/1959
11/10/1975
25/01/1976
05/10/1980
05/10/1980
D5505 31005                   20/02/1958 30A
W
Stratford (New)
Withdrawn
20/02/1958
03/02/1980
03/02/1980
D5506 31006                   13/03/1958 30A
W
Stratford (New)
Withdrawn
13/03/1958
05/01/1980
05/01/1980
D5507 31007                   19/04/1958 30A
31B
30A
32B
30A

W
Stratford (New)
March
Stratford
Ipswich
Stratford

Withdrawn
19/04/1958
07/03/1959
05/12/1959
17/09/1960
26/11/1960
09/05/1976
04/11/1976
04/11/1976
D5508 31008                 ADB968016 17/04/1958 30A
31B
30A
31B
30A
W
Stratford (New)
March
Stratford
March
Stratford
Withdrawn
17/04/1958
07/03/1959
05/12/1959
17/09/1960
23/06/1962
01/10/1980
01/10/1980
D5509 31009                   01/05/1958 30A

W
Stratford (New)

Withdrawn
01/05/1958
09/05/1976
10/07/1976
10/07/1976
D5510 31010                   16/05/1958 30A
31B
30A

W
Stratford (New)
March
Stratford

Withdrawn
16/05/1958
07/03/1959
09/01/1960
09/05/1976
10/07/1976
10/07/1976
D5511 31011                   05/06/1958 30A
60A
30A

W
Stratford (New)
Inverness
Stratford

Withdrawn
05/06/1958
05/07/1958
13/09/1958
09/05/1976
10/07/1976
10/07/1976
D5512 31012                   19/06/1958 30A

W
Stratford (New)

Withdrawn
19/06/1958
09/05/1976
04/11/1976
04/11/1976
D5513 31013                 ADB968013 13/07/1958 30A
W
Stratford (New)
Withdrawn
13/07/1958
01/03/1979
01/03/1979
D5514 31014                 ADB968015 24/07/1958 30A
32B
30A

W
Stratford (New)
Ipswich
Stratford

Withdrawn
24/07/1958
02/12/1967
06/04/1968
09/05/1976
01/11/1976
01/11/1976
D5515 31015                   31/07/1958 30A
31B
32A
32B
30A
32B
30A
W
Stratford (New)
March
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Stratford
Ipswich
Stratford
Withdrawn
31/07/1958
07/03/1959
05/03/1960
09/04/1960
17/09/1960
02/12/1967
13/01/1968
04/05/1980
04/05/1980
D5516 31016                   04/09/1958 30A
32B
30A

W
Stratford (New)
Ipswich
Stratford

Withdrawn
04/09/1958
02/12/1967
11/05/1968
09/05/1976
10/07/1976
10/07/1976
D5517 31017                   25/09/1958 30A
32B
30A
31B
30A
W
Stratford (New)
Ipswich
Stratford
March
Stratford
Withdrawn
25/09/1958
07/10/1967
11/05/1968
10/10/1970
24/10/1970
04/05/1980
04/05/1980
D5518   31101                 16/10/1958 30A
31B
30A
31B
55A
30A
31B
SF
W
Stratford (New)
March
Stratford
March
Holbeck (MR)
Stratford
March
Stratford
Withdrawn
16/10/1958
07/03/1959
17/09/1960
24/10/1970
23/01/1971
03/04/1971
07/10/1972
02/05/1976
11/01/1993
11/01/1993
D5519 31019                   12/12/1958 30A
31B
30A
32B
30A
W
Stratford (New)
March
Stratford
Ipswich
Stratford
Withdrawn
12/12/1958
07/03/1959
26/11/1960
07/10/1967
13/01/1968
05/10/1980
05/10/1980
D5520   31102                 26/02/1959 30A
32B
31B
30A
31B
30A
55B
MR
SF
Stratford (New)
Ipswich
March
Stratford
March
Stratford
York (North)
March
Stratford
26/02/1959
07/11/1959
11/05/1968
01/11/1969
24/10/1970
03/04/1971
09/10/1971
06/10/1973
02/05/1976
11/1996
D5521   31103                 05/03/1959 32B
31B
30A
55B
FP
SF
MR
W
Ipswich (New)
March
Stratford
York (North)
Finsbury Park
Stratford
March
Withdrawn
05/03/1959
11/05/1968
03/04/1971
09/10/1971
19/05/1973
02/05/1976
23/05/1976
05/10/1980
05/10/1980
D5522   31104 31418               12/03/1959 30A
32B
31B
30A
55B
CD
FP
GD
W
Stratford (New)
Ipswich
March
Stratford
York (North)
Cricklewood East
Finsbury Park
Gateshead
Withdrawn
12/03/1959
07/11/1959
11/05/1968
03/04/1971
09/10/1971
18/08/1973
11/10/1975
02/05/1976
06/10/1995
06/10/1995
D5523   31105                 19/03/1959 30A
32B
31B
40B
SF
TE
W
Stratford (New)
Ipswich
March
Immingham
Stratford
Thornaby
Withdrawn
19/03/1959
07/11/1959
11/05/1968
12/08/1972
16/05/1976
15/05/1988
01/05/1997
01/05/1997
D5524   31106                 26/03/1959 30A
32A
31B
30A
32B
31B
40B
SF
SF
W
Stratford (New)
Norwich Thorpe
March
Stratford
Ipswich
March
Immingham
Stratford
Stratford
Withdrawn
26/03/1959
25/04/1959
20/06/1959
05/12/1959
27/08/1960
11/05/1968
12/08/1972
16/05/1976
04/10/1987
01/11/1995
01/11/1995
D5525   31107                 09/04/1959 31B
32B
30A
40B
32B
31B
30A
31B
SF
W
March (New)
Ipswich
Stratford
Immingham
Ipswich
March
Stratford
March
Stratford
Withdrawn
09/04/1959
05/10/1963
25/09/1965
23/04/1966
12/08/1967
11/05/1968
03/04/1971
08/01/1972
10/1977
31/10/2008
31/10/2008
D5526   31108                 16/04/1959 30A
32B
31B
FP
MR
W
Stratford (New)
Ipswich
March
Finsbury Park
March
Withdrawn
16/04/1959
07/11/1959
11/05/1968
09/03/1974
05/1977
27/09/1991
27/09/1991
D5527   31109                 23/04/1959 30A
32B
41A
41f
40A
30A
40B
32B
31B
52A
40B
MR
IM
SF
W
Stratford (New)
Ipswich
Sheffield Darnall
Wath
Lincoln
Stratford
Immingham
Ipswich
March
Gateshead
Immingham
March
Immingham
Stratford
Withdrawn
23/04/1959
07/11/1959
23/02/1963
05/10/1963
11/01/1964
13/03/1965
23/04/1966
12/08/1967
11/05/1968
09/10/1971
12/08/1972
23/05/1976
01/1977
10/1977
11/03/1988
11/03/1988
D5528   31110                 30/04/1959 32A
31B
32A
32B
41A
41f
40A
41A
32B
31B
81A
82A
TI
SF
W
Norwich Thorpe (New)
March
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Sheffield Darnall
Wath
Lincoln
Tinsley
Ipswich
March
Old Oak Common
Bristol Bath Road
Tinsley
Stratford
Withdrawn
30/04/1959
20/06/1959
31/10/1959
16/09/1961
23/02/1963
05/10/1963
11/01/1964
19/06/1965
11/03/1967
11/05/1968
29/03/1969
10/03/1973
09/10/1976
10/1977
31/05/2006
31/05/2006
D5529   31111                 07/05/1959 31B
32A
32B
31B
52A
30A
31B
HO
YK
TI
HO
W
March (New)
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
March
Gateshead
Stratford
March
Holbeck (MR)
York (North)
Tinsley
Holbeck (MR)
Withdrawn
07/05/1959
31/10/1959
16/09/1961
11/05/1968
09/10/1971
06/11/1971
08/01/1972
26/10/1974
02/05/1976
05/1977
27/11/1977
12/06/1983
12/06/1983
D5530   31112                 14/05/1959 31B
32A
32B
32A
32B
31B
81A
BR
SF
W
March (New)
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
March
Old Oak Common
Bristol Bath Road
Stratford
Withdrawn
14/05/1959
07/11/1959
16/09/1961
23/06/1962
13/01/1968
11/05/1968
28/12/1968
02/06/1973
09/10/1976
01/05/1997
01/05/1997
D5531   31113                 21/05/1959 30A
32B
31B
32A
32B
32A
32B
31B
52A
40B
IM
W
Stratford (New)
Ipswich
March
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
March
Gateshead
Immingham
Immingham
Withdrawn
21/05/1959
07/11/1959
26/11/1960
17/06/1961
16/09/1961
23/06/1962
13/01/1968
11/05/1968
09/10/1971
12/08/1972
01/1977
30/07/2004
30/07/2004
D5532   31114 31453   31553           04/06/1959 32A
31B
52A
30A
31B
SF
MR
W
Norwich Thorpe (New)
March
Gateshead
Stratford
March
Stratford
March
Withdrawn
04/06/1959
11/10/1969
09/10/1971
06/11/1971
08/01/1972
02/05/1976
26/07/1981
01/11/1995
01/11/1995
D5533   31115 31466               04/06/1959 32A
41A
40B
32B
40B
32A
31B
52A
40B
31B
FP
YK
HO
YK
IM
CD
W
Norwich Thorpe (New)
Tinsley
Immingham
Ipswich
Immingham
Norwich Thorpe
March
Gateshead
Immingham
March
Finsbury Park
York (North)
Holbeck (MR)
York (North)
Immingham
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
04/06/1959
09/10/1965
12/02/1966
20/08/1966
15/10/1966
25/03/1967
11/10/1969
09/10/1971
08/01/1972
12/08/1972
09/03/1974
09/11/1974
08/03/1975
02/05/1976
10/1976
15/05/1988
01/02/2001
01/02/2001
D5534   31116                 11/06/1959 31B
32A
30A
40B
32B
32A
31B
41A
52A
51L
52A
40B
TI
TE
W
March (New)
Norwich Thorpe
Stratford
Immingham
Ipswich
Norwich Thorpe
March
Tinsley
Gateshead
Thornaby
Gateshead
Immingham
Tinsley
Thornaby
Withdrawn
11/06/1959
07/11/1959
13/03/1965
23/04/1966
12/08/1967
11/05/1968
11/10/1969
23/05/1970
15/05/1971
29/05/1971
09/10/1971
06/05/1972
08/03/1975
04/10/1987
04/02/2000
04/02/2000
D5535   31117                 18/06/1959 32A
41A
32A
81A
W
Norwich Thorpe (New)
Tinsley
Norwich Thorpe
Old Oak Common
Withdrawn
18/06/1959
18/11/1967
10/08/1968
30/11/1968
11/03/1987
11/03/1987
D5536   31118                 18/06/1959 30A
32B
32A
41A
30A
81A
IM
W
Stratford (New)
Ipswich
Norwich Thorpe
Tinsley
Stratford
Old Oak Common
Immingham
Withdrawn
18/06/1959
07/11/1959
17/06/1961
09/10/1965
10/08/1968
24/05/1969
04/10/1987
20/02/1989
20/02/1989
D5537   31119                 25/06/1959 30A
32B
32A
41A
30A
34G
30A
31B
52A
40B
55B
HO
YK
TI
SF
Stratford (New)
Ipswich
Norwich Thorpe
Tinsley
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Stratford
March
Gateshead
Immingham
York (North)
Holbeck (MR)
York (North)
Tinsley
Stratford
25/06/1959
07/11/1959
15/09/1962
18/11/1967
10/08/1968
15/03/1969
07/06/1969
24/10/1970
09/10/1971
08/01/1972
11/11/1972
19/05/1973
08/03/1975
02/05/1976
04/10/1987
09/1995
D5538   31120                 02/07/1959 32B
41A
41f
2E
41C
41A
41C
41A
D10
41A
55B
TI
IM
TI
IM
IM
TE
W
Ipswich (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Wath
Saltley
Wath
Tinsley
Wath
Tinsley
Preston Division
Tinsley
York (North)
Tinsley
Immingham
Tinsley
Immingham
Immingham
Thornaby
Withdrawn
02/07/1959
23/02/1963
05/10/1963
05/06/1965
12/06/1965
09/10/1965
22/01/1966
18/06/1966
11/09/1971
09/10/1971
07/10/1972
06/10/1973
12/01/1974
29/02/1976
02/05/1976
01/11/1981
04/10/1987
27/09/1991
27/09/1991
D5539   31121                 09/07/1959 32B
41A
41f
41A
41C
41A
81A
W
Ipswich (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Wath
Tinsley
Wath
Tinsley
Old Oak Common
Withdrawn
09/07/1959
23/03/1963
05/10/1963
09/10/1965
22/01/1966
18/06/1966
28/12/1968
01/09/1988
01/09/1988
D5540   31122                 16/07/1959 32B
41A
31B
41A
D16
41A
55A
MR
SF
W
Ipswich (New)
Tinsley
March
Tinsley
Nottingham Division
Tinsley
Holbeck (MR)
March
Stratford
Withdrawn
16/07/1959
20/02/1965
10/10/1970
30/01/1971
25/03/1972
08/04/1972
07/10/1972
06/10/1973
02/05/1976
22/01/1987
22/01/1987
D5541   31123                 23/07/1959 32B
41A
55C
55A
51L
41A
HO
YK
OC
IM
W
Ipswich (New)
Tinsley
Healey Mills
Holbeck (MR)
Thornaby
Tinsley
Holbeck (MR)
York (North)
Old Oak Common
Immingham
Withdrawn
23/07/1959
03/04/1965
29/05/1971
09/10/1971
29/07/1972
11/11/1972
19/05/1973
08/03/1975
09/10/1976
04/10/1987
16/03/1992
16/03/1992
D5542   31124                 30/07/1959 32B
41A
41f
41A
41C
41A
51L
IM
TI
IM
BR
OC
W
Ipswich (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Wath
Tinsley
Wath
Tinsley
Thornaby
Immingham
Tinsley
Immingham
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Withdrawn
30/07/1959
23/03/1963
05/10/1963
09/10/1965
22/01/1966
18/06/1966
09/10/1971
10/05/1975
29/02/1976
02/05/1976
09/10/1976
10/1977
25/05/1990
25/05/1990
D5543   31125                 30/07/1959 32B
41A
40B
32A
30A
32A
41A
31B
41A
51L
FP
MR
FP
MR
Ipswich (New)
Tinsley
Immingham
Norwich Thorpe
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
Tinsley
March
Tinsley
Thornaby
Finsbury Park
March
Finsbury Park
March
30/07/1959
09/10/1965
05/03/1966
25/03/1967
25/05/1968
12/10/1968
29/03/1969
10/10/1970
30/01/1971
09/10/1971
06/10/1973
05/1977
09/1977
10/1977
12/1994
D5544   31126                 20/08/1959 32B
40B
32A
41A
31B
41A
51L
FP
MR
W
Ipswich (New)
Immingham
Norwich Thorpe
Tinsley
March
Tinsley
Thornaby
Finsbury Park
March
Withdrawn
20/08/1959
07/01/1967
25/03/1967
14/06/1969
10/10/1970
30/01/1971
09/10/1971
06/10/1973
10/1977
14/01/2000
14/01/2000
D5545   31127                 08/10/1959 30A
31B
30A
32A
31B
40B
YK
HO
W
Stratford (New)
March
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
March
Immingham
York (North)
Holbeck (MR)
Withdrawn
08/10/1959
09/12/1961
15/09/1962
13/03/1965
11/10/1969
12/08/1972
10/1976
02/1978
21/06/1989
21/06/1989
D5546   31128                 27/08/1959 32B
31B
32B
41A
31B
41A
40B
31B
TI
Ipswich (New)
March
Ipswich
Tinsley
March
Tinsley
Immingham
March
Tinsley
27/08/1959
12/09/1959
09/01/1965
31/07/1965
10/10/1970
30/01/1971
08/05/1971
12/08/1972
07/1977
D5547   31129 31461               27/08/1959 32B
31B
31B
32B
31B
32B
41A
32B
41A
34G
40B
31B
SF
Ipswich (New)
March
March
Ipswich
March
Ipswich
Tinsley
Ipswich
Tinsley
Finsbury Park
Immingham
March
Stratford
27/08/1959
12/09/1959
23/02/1963
09/01/1965
06/08/1966
20/08/1966
07/01/1967
11/03/1967
07/10/1967
28/12/1968
07/06/1969
27/03/1971
02/05/1976
D5548   31130                 03/09/1959 32B
31B
40B
32B
41A
40B
52A
51L
41A
TE
IM
Ipswich (New)
March
Immingham
Ipswich
Tinsley
Immingham
Gateshead
Thornaby
Tinsley
Thornaby
Immingham
03/09/1959
06/08/1966
07/01/1967
12/08/1967
07/10/1967
10/01/1970
29/05/1971
08/01/1972
11/11/1972
11/05/1974
26/07/1981
08/1997
D5549   31131                 10/09/1959 32B
41A
40B
34G
30A
31B
40B
YK
TI
OC
TE
W
Ipswich (New)
Tinsley
Immingham
Finsbury Park
Stratford
March
Immingham
York (North)
Tinsley
Old Oak Common
Thornaby
Withdrawn
10/09/1959
09/10/1965
10/01/1970
18/09/1971
09/10/1971
12/02/1972
12/08/1972
10/1976
07/1977
19/02/1978
15/05/1988
22/03/1989
22/03/1989
D5550   31132                 24/09/1959 32B
41A
40B
41A
40B
51L
30A
31B
55B
TI
TE
IM
TI
IM
BR
OC
W
Ipswich (New)
Tinsley
Immingham
Tinsley
Immingham
Thornaby
Stratford
March
York (North)
Tinsley
Thornaby
Immingham
Tinsley
Immingham
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Withdrawn
24/09/1959
09/10/1965
12/02/1966
11/07/1970
09/01/1971
07/08/1971
13/11/1971
12/02/1972
10/03/1973
06/10/1973
09/03/1974
10/05/1975
29/02/1976
02/05/1976
09/10/1976
09/01/1978
16/06/2000
16/06/2000
D5551   31133 31450               10/09/1959 32B
30A
32B
40B
41A
40B
31B
55A
MR
SF
CD
W
Ipswich (New)
Stratford
Ipswich
Immingham
Tinsley
Immingham
March
Holbeck (MR)
March
Stratford
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
10/09/1959
06/08/1966
11/03/1967
11/05/1968
11/07/1970
09/01/1971
12/08/1972
10/03/1973
06/10/1973
02/05/1976
15/05/1988
01/12/1998
01/12/1998
D5552   31134                 17/09/1959 32B
34G
41A
40B
41A
40B
31B
IM
YK
FP
IM
TI
IM
SF
W
Ipswich (New)
Finsbury Park
Tinsley
Immingham
Tinsley
Immingham
March
Immingham
York (North)
Finsbury Park
Immingham
Tinsley
Immingham
Stratford
Withdrawn
17/09/1959
03/04/1965
19/06/1965
12/02/1966
11/07/1970
08/05/1971
12/08/1972
09/03/1974
12/10/1974
09/11/1974
30/11/1974
29/02/1976
02/05/1976
15/05/1988
14/01/2000
14/01/2000
D5553   31135                 24/09/1959 32B
32A
30A
31B
40B
31B
BR
SF
W
Ipswich (New)
Norwich Thorpe
Stratford
March
Immingham
March
Bristol Bath Road
Stratford
Withdrawn
24/09/1959
22/06/1963
09/10/1965
14/03/1970
27/03/1971
12/08/1972
19/02/1978
04/10/1987
04/02/2000
04/02/2000
D5554   31136                 01/10/1959 32B
32A
40B
41A
40B
81A
BR
OC
BR
OC
W
Ipswich (New)
Norwich Thorpe
Immingham
Tinsley
Immingham
Old Oak Common
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Withdrawn
01/10/1959
22/06/1963
24/02/1968
11/07/1970
08/05/1971
08/01/1972
06/10/1973
08/11/1975
06/03/1976
10/1977
24/08/1980
24/08/1980
D5555   31137 31444 31444 31544           01/10/1959 32B
32A
41A
32B
40B
41A
40B
55A
TE
SF
W
Ipswich (New)
Norwich Thorpe
Tinsley
Ipswich
Immingham
Tinsley
Immingham
Holbeck (MR)
Thornaby
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/10/1959
17/06/1961
09/10/1965
11/03/1967
11/05/1968
11/07/1970
08/05/1971
07/10/1972
06/10/1973
10/1977
01/12/1995
01/12/1995
D5556   31138                 08/10/1959 32B
32A
30A
41A
32B
40B
41A
40B
55A
TE
SF
W
Ipswich (New)
Norwich Thorpe
Stratford
Tinsley
Ipswich
Immingham
Tinsley
Immingham
Holbeck (MR)
Thornaby
Stratford
Withdrawn
08/10/1959
17/06/1961
10/04/1965
25/02/1967
12/08/1967
11/05/1968
11/07/1970
08/05/1971
07/10/1972
06/10/1973
10/1977
02/02/1989
02/02/1989
D5557   31139 31438   31538           15/10/1959 32B
32A
41A
40B
TE
CD
W
Ipswich (New)
Norwich Thorpe
Tinsley
Immingham
Thornaby
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
15/10/1959
17/06/1961
13/03/1965
12/10/1968
12/10/1974
15/05/1988
01/09/1995
01/09/1995
D5558   31140 31421               22/10/1959 32B
32A
41A
40B
41A
51L
30A
D16
41A
55B
TI
CW
CW
OC
OC
BR
IM
CD
W
Ipswich (New)
Norwich Thorpe
Tinsley
Immingham
Tinsley
Thornaby
Stratford
Nottingham Division
Tinsley
York (North)
Tinsley
Cricklewood East
Cricklewood East
Old Oak Common
Old Oak Common
Bristol Bath Road
Immingham
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
22/10/1959
17/06/1961
09/10/1965
05/03/1966
11/07/1970
09/10/1971
13/11/1971
05/02/1972
18/03/1972
07/10/1972
06/10/1973
17/08/1974
24/08/1974
28/02/1976
06/03/1976
08/1977
04/10/1987
15/05/1988
01/03/1997
01/03/1997
D5559   31141                 22/10/1959 32B
32A
30A
40B
32B
40B
41A
51L
30A
55B
TE
W
Ipswich (New)
Norwich Thorpe
Stratford
Immingham
Ipswich
Immingham
Tinsley
Thornaby
Stratford
York (North)
Thornaby
Withdrawn
22/10/1959
17/06/1961
10/04/1965
23/04/1966
12/08/1967
11/05/1968
11/07/1970
09/10/1971
13/11/1971
07/10/1972
12/01/1974
25/01/1989
25/01/1989
D5560   31142                 29/10/1959 32B
32A
31B
41A
55A
YK
HO
W
Ipswich (New)
Norwich Thorpe
March
Tinsley
Holbeck (MR)
York (North)
Holbeck (MR)
Withdrawn
29/10/1959
17/06/1961
11/10/1969
06/05/1972
07/10/1972
12/01/1974
08/03/1975
05/05/2000
05/05/2000
D5561   31143                 29/10/1959 32B
32A
41A
40B
30A
TE
W
Ipswich (New)
Norwich Thorpe
Tinsley
Immingham
Stratford
Thornaby
Withdrawn
29/10/1959
17/06/1961
09/10/1965
05/03/1966
19/11/1966
11/05/1974
12/12/1988
12/12/1988
D5562   31144                 05/11/1959 32B
32A
32B
40B
41A
40B
Ipswich (New)
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Immingham
Tinsley
Immingham
05/11/1959
17/06/1961
12/08/1967
11/05/1968
11/07/1970
09/10/1971
D5563   31145                 12/11/1959 31B
32A
31B
40B
SF
TI
W
March (New)
Norwich Thorpe
March
Immingham
Stratford
Tinsley
Withdrawn
12/11/1959
10/02/1962
11/10/1969
12/08/1972
05/1977
04/10/1987
14/01/2000
14/01/2000
D5564   31146                 12/11/1959 31B
32A
31B
YK
HO
TI
HO
W
March (New)
Norwich Thorpe
March
York (North)
Holbeck (MR)
Tinsley
Holbeck (MR)
Withdrawn
12/11/1959
10/02/1962
11/10/1969
11/05/1974
08/03/1975
05/1977
27/11/1977
24/03/2000
24/03/2000
D5565   31147                 19/11/1959 31B
34B
32A
41A
40B
41A
40B
YK
TI
IM
March (New)
Hornsey
Norwich Thorpe
Tinsley
Immingham
Tinsley
Immingham
York (North)
Tinsley
Immingham
19/11/1959
05/12/1959
02/04/1960
09/10/1965
12/02/1966
11/07/1970
09/10/1971
12/01/1974
02/05/1976
11/1978
D5566   31148 31448   31548           19/11/1959 30A
34B
32A
31B
YK
TI
IM
SF
CD
W
Stratford (New)
Hornsey
Norwich Thorpe
March
York (North)
Tinsley
Immingham
Stratford
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
19/11/1959
05/12/1959
26/03/1960
11/10/1969
11/05/1974
08/03/1975
11/10/1975
05/1977
15/05/1988
01/07/1995
01/07/1995
D5567   31149                 26/11/1959 34B
32A
31B
41A
40B
41A
40B
TO
SF
W
Hornsey (New)
Norwich Thorpe
March
Tinsley
Immingham
Tinsley
Immingham
Toton
Stratford
Withdrawn
26/11/1959
26/03/1960
05/10/1963
09/10/1965
05/03/1966
11/07/1970
09/10/1971
18/10/1981
04/10/1987
05/05/2000
05/05/2000
D5568   31150                 03/12/1959 34B
32A
31B
32A
41A
32A
34G
40B
31B
W
Hornsey (New)
Norwich Thorpe
March
Norwich Thorpe
Tinsley
Norwich Thorpe
Finsbury Park
Immingham
March
Withdrawn
03/12/1959
16/04/1960
26/11/1960
10/02/1962
21/08/1965
09/11/1968
22/02/1969
05/07/1969
12/08/1972
04/10/1975
04/10/1975
D5569   31151 31436               03/12/1959 34B
32A
31B
32A
31B
SF
W
Hornsey (New)
Norwich Thorpe
March
Norwich Thorpe
March
Stratford
Withdrawn
03/12/1959
02/04/1960
26/11/1960
09/01/1965
11/10/1969
10/03/1979
01/10/1986
01/10/1986
D5570   31152                 10/12/1959 31B
32A
30A
40B
32B
40B
TE
W
March (New)
Norwich Thorpe
Stratford
Immingham
Ipswich
Immingham
Thornaby
Withdrawn
10/12/1959
09/01/1965
26/06/1965
23/04/1966
12/08/1967
11/05/1968
11/05/1974
01/06/1989
01/06/1989
D5571   31153 31432               10/12/1959 31B
32A
30A
40B
32B
40B
TE
CD
W
March (New)
Norwich Thorpe
Stratford
Immingham
Ipswich
Immingham
Thornaby
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
10/12/1959
09/01/1965
14/08/1965
23/04/1966
12/08/1967
11/05/1968
06/07/1974
15/05/1988
01/05/1996
01/05/1996
D5572   31154                 17/12/1959 31B
32A
31B
BR
W
March (New)
Norwich Thorpe
March
Bristol Bath Road
Withdrawn
17/12/1959
09/01/1965
11/10/1969
19/02/1978
31/05/2006
31/05/2006
D5573   31155                 17/12/1959 31B
32A
32B
30A
32B
40B
IM
W
March (New)
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Stratford
Ipswich
Immingham
Immingham
Withdrawn
17/12/1959
09/01/1965
23/10/1965
06/08/1966
11/03/1967
09/03/1968
26/07/1981
26/05/2000
26/05/2000
D5574   31156                 23/12/1959 32A
31B
32A
31B
30A
40B
32B
31B
40B
SF
IM
SF
W
Norwich Thorpe (New)
March
Norwich Thorpe
March
Stratford
Immingham
Ipswich
March
Immingham
Stratford
Immingham
Stratford
Withdrawn
23/12/1959
23/06/1962
09/01/1965
19/06/1965
13/11/1965
23/04/1966
12/08/1967
11/05/1968
12/08/1972
05/1977
10/03/1979
04/10/1987
28/02/1992
28/02/1992
D5575   31157 31424   31524           23/12/1959 32A
32B
32A
31B
32B
30A
32B
31B
FP
CW
FP
BR
CD
W
Norwich Thorpe (New)
Ipswich
Norwich Thorpe
March
Ipswich
Stratford
Ipswich
March
Finsbury Park
Cricklewood East
Finsbury Park
Bristol Bath Road
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
23/12/1959
18/02/1961
17/06/1961
23/06/1962
09/01/1965
06/08/1966
11/03/1967
11/05/1968
09/03/1974
09/11/1974
02/05/1976
09/1977
15/05/1988
01/05/1996
01/05/1996
D5576   31158                 31/12/1959 32A
31B
32B
30A
31B
BR
W
Norwich Thorpe (New)
March
Ipswich
Stratford
March
Bristol Bath Road
Withdrawn
31/12/1959
23/06/1962
09/01/1965
19/06/1965
08/10/1966
19/02/1978
07/07/2000
07/07/2000
D5577   31159                 31/12/1959 32A
31B
32B
30A
41A
32B
41A
31B
40B
31B
FP
IM
HO
TI
TI
W
Norwich Thorpe (New)
March
Ipswich
Stratford
Tinsley
Ipswich
Tinsley
March
Immingham
March
Finsbury Park
Immingham
Holbeck (MR)
Tinsley
Tinsley
Withdrawn
31/12/1959
23/06/1962
09/01/1965
06/08/1966
15/04/1967
12/08/1967
02/12/1967
12/10/1968
17/05/1969
12/08/1972
11/05/1974
02/05/1976
05/1977
27/11/1977
04/10/1987
12/06/1996
12/06/1996
D5578   31160                 07/01/1960 30A
30A
31B
32B
40B
41A
40B
34G
32B
41A
31B
W
Stratford (New)
Stratford
March
Ipswich
Immingham
Tinsley
Immingham
Finsbury Park
Ipswich
Tinsley
March
Withdrawn
07/01/1960
09/01/1960
26/11/1960
09/01/1965
17/07/1965
06/11/1965
12/02/1966
15/04/1967
12/08/1967
02/12/1967
12/10/1968
14/01/2000
14/01/2000
D5579   31161 31400               07/01/1960 30A
31B
41A
40B
34G
32A
31B
FP
IM
CD
W
Stratford (New)
March
Tinsley
Immingham
Finsbury Park
Norwich Thorpe
March
Finsbury Park
Immingham
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
07/01/1960
26/11/1960
09/10/1965
05/03/1966
25/03/1967
15/04/1967
11/10/1969
09/1977
02/1978
15/05/1988
01/07/1991
01/07/1991
D5580   31162                 14/01/1960 32A
31B
40B
34G
32A
31B
W
Norwich Thorpe (New)
March
Immingham
Finsbury Park
Norwich Thorpe
March
Withdrawn
14/01/1960
16/09/1961
23/04/1966
25/03/1967
12/08/1967
11/10/1969
01/05/1992
01/05/1992
D5581   31163                 14/01/1960 32A
32B
30A
31B
41A
32B
31B
40B
41A
YK
HO
YK
OC
W
Norwich Thorpe (New)
Ipswich
Stratford
March
Tinsley
Ipswich
March
Immingham
Tinsley
York (North)
Holbeck (MR)
York (North)
Old Oak Common
Withdrawn
14/01/1960
18/02/1961
24/02/1962
23/06/1962
22/01/1966
12/08/1967
11/05/1968
12/08/1972
28/10/1972
06/10/1973
12/01/1974
08/03/1975
09/10/1976
19/01/1999
19/01/1999
D5582   31164                 21/01/1960 32A
32B
32A
31B
40B
32B
41A
31B
Norwich Thorpe (New)
Ipswich
Norwich Thorpe
March
Immingham
Ipswich
Tinsley
March
21/01/1960
18/02/1961
17/06/1961
16/09/1961
23/04/1966
12/08/1967
02/12/1967
12/10/1968
D5583   31165                 21/01/1960 30A
32B
31B
41A
34G
41A
41f
41A
41C
41A
31B
40B
30A
55B
41A
BR
OC
SF
W
Stratford (New)
Ipswich
March
Sheffield Darnall
Finsbury Park
Sheffield Darnall
Wath
Tinsley
Wath
Tinsley
March
Immingham
Stratford
York (North)
Tinsley
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Stratford
Withdrawn
21/01/1960
27/08/1960
26/11/1960
27/04/1963
22/06/1963
20/07/1963
05/10/1963
09/10/1965
22/01/1966
18/06/1966
12/10/1968
25/01/1969
03/04/1971
09/10/1971
12/08/1972
10/05/1975
08/1977
04/10/1987
21/01/2000
21/01/2000
D5584   31166                 25/01/1960 31B
41A
41f
16A
41C
41A
41A

41A
30A
41A
D16
41A
YK
HO
TI
HO
TI
W
March (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Wath
Toton
Wath
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley

Tinsley
Stratford
Tinsley
Nottingham Division
Tinsley
York (North)
Holbeck (MR)
Tinsley
Holbeck (MR)
Tinsley
Withdrawn
25/01/1960
23/03/1963
05/10/1963
07/12/1963
14/12/1963
18/01/1964
26/04/1964
14/08/1965
28/08/1965
25/02/1967
07/10/1967
15/04/1972
22/04/1972
06/10/1973
12/01/1974
08/03/1975
05/1977
27/11/1977
19/01/1999
19/01/1999
D5585   31167                 25/01/1960 31B
30A
31B
41A
34G
41A
41f
41A
41C
41A
55B
TI
IM
TI
SF
W
March (New)
Stratford
March
Sheffield Darnall
Finsbury Park
Sheffield Darnall
Wath
Tinsley
Wath
Tinsley
York (North)
Tinsley
Immingham
Tinsley
Stratford
Withdrawn
25/01/1960
17/06/1961
23/06/1962
27/04/1963
22/06/1963
20/07/1963
05/10/1963
09/10/1965
22/01/1966
18/06/1966
07/10/1972
06/10/1973
09/03/1974
29/02/1976
02/05/1976
27/09/1988
27/09/1988
D5586   31168                 04/02/1960 34B
34G
31B
30A
31B
34G
41A
16G
41A
40B
34G
32B
34G
40B
41A
34G
40B
FP
TI
W
Hornsey (New)
Finsbury Park
March
Stratford
March
Finsbury Park
Tinsley
Westhouses (on loan)
Tinsley
Immingham
Finsbury Park
Ipswich
Finsbury Park
Immingham
Tinsley
Finsbury Park
Immingham
Finsbury Park
Tinsley
Withdrawn
04/02/1960
30/04/1960
28/01/1961
17/06/1961
12/01/1963
09/01/1965
09/10/1965
13/11/1965
20/11/1965
05/03/1966
06/08/1966
05/11/1966
15/04/1967
05/07/1969
10/01/1970
08/05/1971
11/11/1972
02/05/1976
02/1978
20/12/1991
20/12/1991
D5587   31169 31457               04/02/1960 34B
34G
41A
31B
30A
34G
30A
34G
32A
34G
55B
MR
W
Hornsey (New)
Finsbury Park
Sheffield Darnall
March
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Norwich Thorpe
Finsbury Park
York (North)
March
Withdrawn
04/02/1960
30/04/1960
19/11/1960
14/01/1961
17/06/1961
09/01/1965
24/07/1965
06/08/1966
11/03/1967
25/03/1967
09/10/1971
06/10/1973
01/02/1994
01/02/1994
D5588   31170                 11/02/1960 34B
34G
31B
30A
34G
41A
D16
41A
D16
41A
34G
32B
34G
32A
34G
MR
TI
HO
SF
W
Hornsey (New)
Finsbury Park
March
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Tinsley
Nottingham Division
Tinsley
Nottingham Division
Tinsley
Finsbury Park
Ipswich
Finsbury Park
Norwich Thorpe
Finsbury Park
March
Tinsley
Holbeck (MR)
Stratford
Withdrawn
11/02/1960
30/04/1960
04/02/1961
17/06/1961
09/01/1965
06/11/1965
20/11/1965
11/12/1965
12/02/1966
12/03/1966
08/10/1966
14/01/1967
18/02/1967
11/03/1967
25/03/1967
06/10/1973
08/03/1975
05/1977
04/10/1987
08/01/1990
08/01/1990
D5589     31401               11/02/1960 34B
34G
31B
30A
34G
41A
40B
34G
32A
34G
41A
34G
BR
W
Hornsey (New)
Finsbury Park
March
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Tinsley
Immingham
Finsbury Park
Norwich Thorpe
Finsbury Park
Tinsley
Finsbury Park
Bristol Bath Road
Withdrawn
11/02/1960
30/04/1960
21/01/1961
17/06/1961
09/01/1965
06/11/1965
12/02/1966
06/08/1966
11/03/1967
25/03/1967
09/03/1968
24/08/1968
19/02/1978
31/03/1988
31/03/1988
D5590   31171                 18/02/1960 34B
34G
31B
30A
31B
41A
34G
41A
34G
GD
FP
IM
HM
TI
W
Hornsey (New)
Finsbury Park
March
Stratford
March
Tinsley
Finsbury Park
Tinsley
Finsbury Park
Gateshead
Finsbury Park
Immingham
Healey Mills
Tinsley
Withdrawn
18/02/1960
30/04/1960
11/02/1961
17/06/1961
27/04/1963
29/08/1964
09/01/1965
06/11/1965
08/10/1966
09/03/1974
08/03/1975
01/1977
30/11/1979
04/10/1987
31/10/2003
31/10/2003
D5591   31172 31420               18/02/1960 34B
34G
31B
30A
30A
34G
55A
D10
55A
55A
MR
TI
CW
BS
W
Hornsey (New)
Finsbury Park
March
Stratford
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Holbeck (MR)
Preston Division
Holbeck (MR)
Holbeck (MR)
March
Tinsley
Cricklewood East
Bescot
Withdrawn
18/02/1960
30/04/1960
04/02/1961
17/06/1961
19/01/1963
06/08/1966
09/10/1971
20/11/1971
18/12/1971
07/10/1972
06/10/1973
11/05/1974
22/06/1974
15/05/1988
01/01/2001
01/01/2001
D5592     31402               25/02/1960 34B
34G
30A
31B
41A
34G
40B
34G
41A
34G
CD
W
Hornsey (New)
Finsbury Park
Stratford
March
Tinsley
Finsbury Park
Immingham
Finsbury Park
Tinsley
Finsbury Park
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
25/02/1960
30/04/1960
07/01/1961
12/01/1963
22/08/1964
09/01/1965
19/06/1965
06/08/1966
09/03/1968
10/08/1968
15/05/1988
20/03/1992
20/03/1992
D5593   31173                 25/02/1960 34B
34G
30A
34G
40B
34G
16A
FP
GD
FP
SF
W
Hornsey (New)
Finsbury Park
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Immingham
Finsbury Park
Toton
Finsbury Park
Gateshead
Finsbury Park
Stratford
Withdrawn
25/02/1960
30/04/1960
18/03/1961
20/03/1965
19/06/1965
06/08/1966
21/04/1973
19/05/1973
09/03/1974
08/03/1975
01/11/1981
14/04/1989
14/04/1989
D5594   31174                 03/03/1960 34B
34G
30A
34G
55A
D10
55A
40B
34G
MC
FP
HO
Hornsey (New)
Finsbury Park
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Holbeck (MR)
Preston Division
Holbeck (MR)
Immingham
Finsbury Park
March
Finsbury Park
Holbeck (MR)
03/03/1960
30/04/1960
18/03/1961
06/08/1966
09/10/1971
18/12/1971
01/01/1972
08/07/1972
10/03/1973
02/06/1973
08/03/1975
02/1978
D5595   31175                 03/03/1960 34B
34G
30A
31B
34G
40B
34G
GD
HO
TI
YK
W
Hornsey (New)
Finsbury Park
Stratford
March
Finsbury Park
Immingham
Finsbury Park
Gateshead
Holbeck (MR)
Tinsley
York (North)
Withdrawn
03/03/1960
30/04/1960
18/03/1961
12/09/1964
09/01/1965
19/06/1965
17/07/1965
09/03/1974
05/1977
27/11/1977
05/07/1981
02/03/1987
02/03/1987
D5596     31403               10/03/1960 34B
34G
30A
31B
34G
40B
34G
55A
34G
IM
W
Hornsey (New)
Finsbury Park
Stratford
March
Finsbury Park
Immingham
Finsbury Park
Holbeck (MR)
Finsbury Park
Immingham
Withdrawn
10/03/1960
30/04/1960
18/03/1961
12/09/1964
09/01/1965
19/06/1965
17/07/1965
09/10/1971
22/04/1972
04/10/1987
04/02/2000
04/02/2000
D5597   31176                 10/03/1960 34B
34G
30A
31B
34G
40B
34G
55A
D10
55A
40B
34G
MC
W
Hornsey (New)
Finsbury Park
Stratford
March
Finsbury Park
Immingham
Finsbury Park
Holbeck (MR)
Preston Division
Holbeck (MR)
Immingham
Finsbury Park
March
Withdrawn
10/03/1960
30/04/1960
18/03/1961
12/09/1964
09/01/1965
19/06/1965
06/08/1966
09/10/1971
23/10/1971
06/11/1971
08/07/1972
10/03/1973
02/06/1973
27/04/1987
27/04/1987
D5598   31177 31443               17/03/1960 34B
34G
30A
34G
40B
34G
MC
CD
W
Hornsey (New)
Finsbury Park
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Immingham
Finsbury Park
March
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
17/03/1960
30/04/1960
25/03/1961
24/07/1965
09/10/1971
10/03/1973
02/06/1973
15/05/1988
01/07/1989
01/07/1989
D5599   31178                 17/03/1960 34B
34G
30A
31B
41A
34G
40B
41A
31B
40B
34G
55B
34G
GD
HO
W
Hornsey (New)
Finsbury Park
Stratford
March
Tinsley
Finsbury Park
Immingham
Tinsley
March
Immingham
Finsbury Park
York (North)
Finsbury Park
Gateshead
Holbeck (MR)
Withdrawn
17/03/1960
30/04/1960
25/03/1961
15/09/1962
22/08/1964
28/11/1964
19/06/1965
06/11/1965
18/12/1965
06/08/1966
08/10/1966
01/01/1972
24/06/1972
09/03/1974
05/1977
23/06/2000
23/06/2000
D5600   31179 31435               24/03/1960 34B
34G
31B
40B
34G
55B
MR
BS
W
Hornsey (New)
Finsbury Park
March
Immingham
Finsbury Park
York (North)
March
Bescot
Withdrawn
24/03/1960
30/04/1960
14/01/1961
23/04/1966
06/08/1966
09/10/1971
06/10/1973
15/05/1988
01/11/1995
01/11/1995
D5601   31180                 24/03/1960 34B
34G
31B
34G
D16
34G
IM
HO
W
Hornsey (New)
Finsbury Park
March
Finsbury Park
Nottingham Division
Finsbury Park
Immingham
Holbeck (MR)
Withdrawn
24/03/1960
30/04/1960
25/03/1961
01/07/1961
06/01/1973
10/03/1973
09/03/1974
05/1977
03/03/2000
03/03/2000
D5602   31181                 31/03/1960 34B
34G
30A
34G
40B
34G
D16
34G
IM
YK
SF
W
Hornsey (New)
Finsbury Park
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Immingham
Finsbury Park
Nottingham Division
Finsbury Park
Immingham
York (North)
Stratford
Withdrawn
31/03/1960
30/04/1960
25/03/1961
20/05/1961
24/08/1968
28/12/1968
31/03/1973
21/04/1973
01/1977
27/11/1977
04/10/1987
13/03/2003
13/03/2003
D5603   31182 31437 31437 31537           31/03/1960 34B
34G
30A
34G
55A
D10
R
40B
34G
MC
BS
Hornsey (New)
Finsbury Park
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Holbeck (MR)
Preston Division (on loan)
Reinstated
Immingham
Finsbury Park
March
Bescot
31/03/1960
30/04/1960
25/03/1961
27/05/1961
09/10/1971
06/11/1971
20/11/1971
04/03/1972
10/03/1973
02/06/1973
15/05/1988
D5604   31183                 07/04/1960 34B
34G
30A
34G
IM
IM

W
Hornsey (New)
Finsbury Park
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Immingham
Immingham

Withdrawn
07/04/1960
30/04/1960
25/03/1961
03/06/1961
02/1978
22/05/1988
23/05/1988
08/07/1988
08/07/1988
D5605     31404               07/04/1960 34B
34G
30A
34G
CD
W
Hornsey (New)
Finsbury Park
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
07/04/1960
30/04/1960
07/01/1961
03/06/1961
15/05/1988
21/02/1991
21/02/1991
D5606     31405               14/04/1960 34B
34G
51L
34G
CD
Hornsey (New)
Finsbury Park
Thornaby
Finsbury Park
Crewe Diesel
14/04/1960
30/04/1960
08/01/1972
29/07/1972
15/05/1988
D5607   31184                 14/04/1960 34B
34G
41A
55A
FP
GD
TE
W
Hornsey (New)
Finsbury Park
Tinsley
Holbeck (MR)
Finsbury Park
Gateshead
Thornaby
Withdrawn
14/04/1960
30/04/1960
22/04/1972
07/10/1972
08/03/1975
02/1978
05/06/1988
04/02/2000
04/02/2000
D5608   31185                 21/04/1960 34B
34G
30A
34G
SF
W
Hornsey (New)
Finsbury Park
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Stratford
Withdrawn
21/04/1960
30/04/1960
01/04/1961
24/06/1961
10/1977
31/03/2000
31/03/2000
D5609   31186         31601       21/04/1960 34B
34G
GD
Hornsey (New)
Finsbury Park
Gateshead
21/04/1960
30/04/1960
02/1978
D5610   31187                 28/04/1960 34G
GD
W
Finsbury Park (New)
Gateshead
Withdrawn
28/04/1960
02/1978
03/03/2000
03/03/2000
D5611   31188                 28/04/1960 34G
W
Finsbury Park (New)
Withdrawn
28/04/1960
24/01/1999
24/01/1999
D5612   31189                 05/05/1960 34G
D15
34G
W
Finsbury Park (New)
Leicester Division
Finsbury Park
Withdrawn
05/05/1960
20/02/1965
27/03/1965
26/05/1989
26/05/1989
D5613   31190                 05/05/1960 34G Finsbury Park (New) 05/05/1960
D5614   31191         31602       12/05/1960 34G Finsbury Park (New) 12/05/1960
D5615   31192                 12/05/1960 34G
W
Finsbury Park (New)
Withdrawn
12/05/1960
10/10/1982
10/10/1982
D5616     31406               19/05/1960 30A
31B
41A
32B
32A
31B
34G
30A
55B
34G
CD
W
Stratford (New)
March
Tinsley
Ipswich
Norwich Thorpe
March
Finsbury Park
Stratford
York (North)
Finsbury Park
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
19/05/1960
23/06/1962
18/12/1965
10/12/1966
15/04/1967
11/10/1969
07/02/1970
03/04/1971
09/10/1971
01/01/1972
15/05/1988
04/01/1991
04/01/1991
D5617   31193 31426 31426 31526           19/05/1960 30A
31B
40B
31B
40B
34G
40B
82A
81A
82A
OC
BR
MR
CD
W
Stratford (New)
March
Immingham
March
Immingham
Finsbury Park
Immingham
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Bristol Bath Road
March
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
19/05/1960
23/06/1962
23/04/1966
08/10/1966
07/01/1967
09/05/1970
06/06/1970
08/07/1972
11/11/1972
24/03/1973
12/05/1973
07/07/1973
19/02/1978
15/05/1988
01/05/1995
01/05/1995
D5618   31194 31427               26/05/1960 30A
31B
40B
34G
30A
55B
FP
IM
W
Stratford (New)
March
Immingham
Finsbury Park
Stratford
York (North)
Finsbury Park
Immingham
Withdrawn
26/05/1960
23/06/1962
23/04/1966
06/06/1970
03/04/1971
09/10/1971
19/05/1973
10/1976
01/02/1999
01/02/1999
D5619   31195                 26/05/1960 30A
31B
40B
FP
MR
FP
W
Stratford (New)
March
Immingham
Finsbury Park
March
Finsbury Park
Withdrawn
26/05/1960
23/06/1962
09/03/1968
06/10/1973
23/05/1976
02/1978
04/02/1988
04/02/1988
D5620   31196                 02/06/1960 31B
30A
31B
40B
SF
IM
W
March (New)
Stratford
March
Immingham
Stratford
Immingham
Withdrawn
02/06/1960
24/07/1965
01/11/1969
12/08/1972
11/10/1975
25/01/1976
26/02/1993
26/02/1993
D5621   31197 31423               02/06/1960 31B
TI
CW
FP
BR
CD
W
March (New)
Tinsley
Cricklewood East
Finsbury Park
Bristol Bath Road
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
02/06/1960
11/05/1974
19/10/1974
02/05/1976
09/1977
15/05/1988
01/09/1996
01/09/1996
D5622   31198                 09/06/1960 32B
30A
32B
30A
31B
30A
31B
34G
41A
34G
41A
40B
34G
W
Ipswich (New)
Stratford
Ipswich
Stratford
March
Stratford
March
Finsbury Park
Tinsley
Finsbury Park
Tinsley
Immingham
Finsbury Park
Withdrawn
09/06/1960
27/08/1960
22/07/1961
16/09/1961
23/06/1962
18/08/1962
15/09/1962
09/01/1965
24/08/1968
22/02/1969
11/10/1969
10/01/1970
09/05/1970
16/03/1990
16/03/1990
D5623   31199                 09/06/1960 32B
30A
31B
30A
31B
34G
W
Ipswich (New)
Stratford
March
Stratford
March
Finsbury Park
Withdrawn
09/06/1960
27/08/1960
23/06/1962
18/08/1962
15/09/1962
09/01/1965
05/05/2000
05/05/2000
D5624   31200                 16/06/1960 32B
30A
31B
34G
TI
MR
TE
W
Ipswich (New)
Stratford
March
Finsbury Park
Tinsley
March
Thornaby
Withdrawn
16/06/1960
26/11/1960
23/06/1962
09/01/1965
08/03/1975
05/1977
04/10/1987
30/06/2007
30/06/2007
D5625   31201                 16/06/1960 32B
30A
31B
34G
W
Ipswich (New)
Stratford
March
Finsbury Park
Withdrawn
16/06/1960
26/11/1960
23/06/1962
09/01/1965
24/03/2000
24/03/2000
D5626   31202                 23/06/1960 32B
30A
32B
30A
31B
34G
W
Ipswich (New)
Stratford
Ipswich
Stratford
March
Finsbury Park
Withdrawn
23/06/1960
26/11/1960
22/07/1961
16/09/1961
23/06/1962
09/01/1965
28/10/1988
28/10/1988
D5627   31203                 23/06/1960 32B
30A
31B
34G
31B
34G
TI
Ipswich (New)
Stratford
March
Finsbury Park
March
Finsbury Park
Tinsley
23/06/1960
26/11/1960
23/06/1962
09/01/1965
17/05/1969
09/05/1970
11/1978
D5628   31204 31440               30/06/1960 32B
31B
34G
31B
W
Ipswich (New)
March
Finsbury Park
March
Withdrawn
30/06/1960
26/11/1960
09/05/1970
10/10/1970
01/03/1987
01/03/1987
D5629   31205                 30/06/1960 32A
30A
31B
W
Norwich Thorpe (New)
Stratford
March
Withdrawn
30/06/1960
17/09/1960
26/11/1960
18/02/2000
18/02/2000
D5630   31206                 07/07/1960 32A
32B
32A
31B
41A
31B
W
Norwich Thorpe (New)
Ipswich
Norwich Thorpe
March
Tinsley
March
Withdrawn
07/07/1960
26/11/1960
17/06/1961
15/09/1962
08/01/1966
23/05/1970
30/11/2006
30/11/2006
D5631   31207                 07/07/1960 32A
32B
32A
31B
FP
Norwich Thorpe (New)
Ipswich
Norwich Thorpe
March
Finsbury Park
07/07/1960
26/11/1960
17/06/1961
15/09/1962
02/06/1973
D5632   31208                 14/07/1960 30A
31B
30A
31B
W
Stratford (New)
March
Stratford
March
Withdrawn
14/07/1960
23/06/1962
05/06/1965
14/03/1970
13/03/1990
13/03/1990
D5633   31209                 14/07/1960 30A
31B
41A
D16
41A
41C
32B
31B
FP
91W
BR
OC
W
Stratford (New)
March
Tinsley
Nottingham Division
Tinsley
Wath
Ipswich
March
Finsbury Park
To Western Region / GWR
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Withdrawn
14/07/1960
23/06/1962
06/11/1965
08/01/1966
15/01/1966
18/03/1967
12/08/1967
11/05/1968
02/06/1973
02/05/1976
08/05/1976
07/1977
15/05/2003
15/05/2003
D5634   31210                 21/07/1960 30A
31B
FP
91W
BR
Stratford (New)
March
Finsbury Park
To Western Region / GWR
Bristol Bath Road
21/07/1960
23/06/1962
02/06/1973
02/05/1976
08/05/1976
D5635   31211 31428               21/07/1960 30A
31B
IM
W
Stratford (New)
March
Immingham
Withdrawn
21/07/1960
23/06/1962
23/05/1976
01/01/1991
01/01/1991
D5636   31212                 28/07/1960 30A
31B
SF
MR
SF
W
Stratford (New)
March
Stratford
March
Stratford
Withdrawn
28/07/1960
23/06/1962
12/01/1974
12/10/1974
08/03/1975
16/12/1991
16/12/1991
D5637   31213 31465 31465 31565           28/07/1960 30A
41A
30A
31B
41A
31B
SF
MR
SF
FP
91W
BR
OC
BS
Stratford (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Stratford
March
Tinsley
March
Stratford
March
Stratford
Finsbury Park
To Western Region / GWR
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Bescot
28/07/1960
07/10/1961
09/12/1961
23/06/1962
23/05/1970
08/05/1971
12/01/1974
12/10/1974
08/03/1975
10/05/1975
02/05/1976
08/05/1976
09/1977
15/05/1988
D5638   31214                 11/08/1960 30A
41A
31B
FP
IM
W
Stratford (New)
Sheffield Darnall
March
Finsbury Park
Immingham
Withdrawn
11/08/1960
07/10/1961
25/11/1961
02/06/1973
02/1978
15/05/1983
15/05/1983
D5639   31215                 11/08/1960 34G
30A
31B
34G
IM
TE
W
Finsbury Park (New)
Stratford
March
Finsbury Park
Immingham
Thornaby
Withdrawn
11/08/1960
20/01/1968
07/10/1972
10/03/1973
02/1978
15/05/1988
04/06/1993
04/06/1993
D5640     31407   31507           18/08/1960 34G
CD
W
Finsbury Park (New)
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
18/08/1960
15/05/1988
31/05/2006
31/05/2006
D5641   31216 31467               18/08/1960 34G
TI
MR
CD
W
Finsbury Park (New)
Tinsley
March
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
18/08/1960
08/03/1975
05/1977
15/05/1988
01/03/1998
01/03/1998
D5642   31217                 18/08/1960 34G
CD
W
Finsbury Park (New)
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
18/08/1960
12/10/1987
08/07/1993
08/07/1993
D5643   31218                 25/08/1960 34G
W
Finsbury Park (New)
Withdrawn
25/08/1960
20/04/1988
20/04/1988
D5644   31219                 25/08/1960 34G
TI
W
Finsbury Park (New)
Tinsley
Withdrawn
25/08/1960
05/07/1981
18/02/2000
18/02/2000
D5645   31220 31441   31541           01/09/1960 34G
30A
34G
W
Finsbury Park (New)
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Withdrawn
01/09/1960
20/03/1965
06/08/1966
01/03/1996
01/03/1996
D5646     31408               01/09/1960 34G
CD
Finsbury Park (New)
Crewe Diesel
01/09/1960
15/05/1988
D5647   31221                 01/09/1960 34G
31B
34G
TI
W
Finsbury Park (New)
March
Finsbury Park
Tinsley
Withdrawn
01/09/1960
07/10/1972
10/03/1973
08/03/1975
30/08/1991
30/08/1991
D5648   31222                 08/09/1960 34G
W
Finsbury Park (New)
Withdrawn
08/09/1960
13/10/1988
13/10/1988
D5649   31223                 08/09/1960 34G
CD
W
Finsbury Park (New)
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
08/09/1960
15/05/1988
16/12/1991
16/12/1991
D5650   31224                 15/09/1960 34G
30A
34G
W
Finsbury Park (New)
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Withdrawn
15/09/1960
17/05/1969
09/10/1971
30/06/2000
30/06/2000
D5651   31225                 15/09/1960 34G
30A
34G
CD
W
Finsbury Park (New)
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
15/09/1960
17/05/1969
09/10/1971
15/05/1988
07/03/1989
07/03/1989
D5652   31226                 22/09/1960 34G
30A
34G
W
Finsbury Park (New)
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Withdrawn
22/09/1960
15/03/1969
09/10/1971
03/01/1989
03/01/1989
D5653   31227                 22/09/1960 34G
31B
32A
31B
30A
34G
31B
34G
YK
TI
FP
TI
CD
W
Finsbury Park (New)
March
Norwich Thorpe
March
Stratford
Finsbury Park
March
Finsbury Park
York (North)
Tinsley
Finsbury Park
Tinsley
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
22/09/1960
15/03/1969
17/05/1969
11/10/1969
31/01/1970
09/10/1971
08/04/1972
06/05/1972
10/11/1973
12/01/1974
09/11/1974
07/1977
15/05/1988
16/12/1988
16/12/1988
D5654   31228 31454 31454 31554           29/09/1960 34G
30A
31B
34G
40B
34G
TI
CD
Finsbury Park (New)
Stratford
March
Finsbury Park
Immingham
Finsbury Park
Tinsley
Crewe Diesel
29/09/1960
11/12/1971
12/02/1972
06/05/1972
08/07/1972
10/03/1973
08/03/1975
15/05/1988
D5655   31229                 29/09/1960 31B
41A
30A
40B
34G
40B
81A
BR
OC
BR
MR
TE
W
March (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Stratford
Immingham
Finsbury Park
Immingham
Old Oak Common
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Bristol Bath Road
March
Thornaby
Withdrawn
29/09/1960
25/11/1961
15/09/1962
15/04/1967
29/03/1969
07/06/1969
08/01/1972
06/10/1973
08/03/1975
08/11/1975
09/1977
15/05/1988
10/08/2001
10/08/2001
D5656     31409               06/10/1960 31B
41A
30A
32B
31B
40B
31B
30A
34G
55A
CD
W
March (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Stratford
Ipswich
March
Immingham
March
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Holbeck (MR)
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
06/10/1960
25/11/1961
15/09/1962
23/02/1963
14/09/1963
15/04/1967
10/08/1968
03/04/1971
11/12/1971
24/06/1972
15/05/1988
04/01/1991
04/01/1991
D5657   31230                 06/10/1960 31B
41A
30A
32B
31B
40B
32B
40B
31B
30A
55A
41A
BR
OC
BS
March (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Stratford
Ipswich
March
Immingham
Ipswich
Immingham
March
Stratford
Holbeck (MR)
Tinsley
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Bescot
06/10/1960
09/12/1961
15/09/1962
23/02/1963
14/09/1963
15/04/1967
12/08/1967
24/02/1968
10/08/1968
31/01/1970
08/05/1971
11/11/1972
08/03/1975
12/04/1975
15/05/1988
D5658   31231                 13/10/1960 31B
30A
32B
31B
40B
32B
31B
30A
55A
D16
55A
41A
BR
OC
CD
IM
W
March (New)
Stratford
Ipswich
March
Immingham
Ipswich
March
Stratford
Holbeck (MR)
Nottingham Division
Holbeck (MR)
Tinsley
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Crewe Diesel
Immingham
Withdrawn
13/10/1960
15/09/1962
23/02/1963
14/09/1963
15/04/1967
12/08/1967
11/05/1968
03/04/1971
08/05/1971
18/03/1972
25/03/1972
11/11/1972
08/03/1975
12/04/1975
15/05/1988
28/08/1988
22/01/1990
22/01/1990
D5659   31232                 20/10/1960 31B
30A
31B
  
31B
30A
55A
55B
40B
W
March (New)
Stratford
March

March
Stratford
Holbeck (MR)
York (North)
Immingham
Withdrawn
20/10/1960
15/09/1962
27/04/1963
07/08/1965
18/12/1965
25/05/1968
06/05/1972
24/06/1972
11/11/1972
26/05/2000
26/05/2000
D5660   31233                 20/10/1960 31B
30A
31B
34G
41A
32A
40B
MR
IM
March (New)
Stratford
March
Finsbury Park
Tinsley
Norwich Thorpe
Immingham
March
Immingham
20/10/1960
15/09/1962
22/06/1963
17/04/1965
19/06/1965
09/10/1965
25/01/1969
12/01/1974
23/05/1976
D5661   31234                 27/10/1960 31B
30A
32A
31B
30A
31B
FP
HO
TI
IM
W
March (New)
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
March
Stratford
March
Finsbury Park
Holbeck (MR)
Tinsley
Immingham
Withdrawn
27/10/1960
15/09/1962
24/07/1965
11/10/1969
09/05/1970
10/10/1970
23/05/1976
02/1978
20/07/1981
26/07/1981
11/06/1993
11/06/1993
D5662   31235                 27/10/1960 31B
30A
31B
30A
32A
34G
41A
32A
31B
30A
31B
55A
41A
YK
TI
W
March (New)
Stratford
March
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
Finsbury Park
Tinsley
Norwich Thorpe
March
Stratford
March
Holbeck (MR)
Tinsley
York (North)
Tinsley
Withdrawn
27/10/1960
15/09/1962
22/06/1963
09/01/1965
10/04/1965
17/04/1965
19/06/1965
09/10/1965
11/10/1969
31/01/1970
24/10/1970
08/05/1971
11/11/1972
06/10/1973
12/01/1974
26/05/2000
26/05/2000
D5663   31236 31433 31433 31533           03/11/1960 31B
30A
31B
30A
32A
34G
41A
32A
31B
30A
31B
BS
W
March (New)
Stratford
March
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
Finsbury Park
Tinsley
Norwich Thorpe
March
Stratford
March
Bescot
Withdrawn
03/11/1960
15/09/1962
27/04/1963
09/01/1965
10/04/1965
17/04/1965
19/06/1965
16/10/1965
11/10/1969
09/05/1970
10/10/1970
15/05/1988
01/07/1995
01/07/1995
D5664   31237                 03/11/1960 31B
30A
34G
41A
32A
31B
FP
GD
W
March (New)
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Tinsley
Norwich Thorpe
March
Finsbury Park
Gateshead
Withdrawn
03/11/1960
15/09/1962
17/04/1965
19/06/1965
09/10/1965
11/10/1969
23/05/1976
02/1978
16/06/2000
16/06/2000
D5665   31238                 10/11/1960 31B
30A
34G
41A
31B
32A
31B
D16
31B
IM
W
March (New)
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Tinsley
March
Norwich Thorpe
March
Nottingham Division
March
Immingham
Withdrawn
10/11/1960
15/09/1962
10/07/1965
09/10/1965
22/01/1966
12/08/1967
11/10/1969
21/10/1972
16/12/1972
12/01/1974
14/01/2000
14/01/2000
D5666   31239 31439               10/11/1960 31B
30A
32A
31B
D16
31B
March (New)
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
March
Nottingham Division
March
10/11/1960
15/09/1962
14/08/1965
11/10/1969
08/04/1972
15/04/1972
D5667   31240                 17/11/1960 31B
30A
32B
30A
32B
32A
31B
FP
MR
TI
IM
W
March (New)
Stratford
Ipswich
Stratford
Ipswich
Norwich Thorpe
March
Finsbury Park
March
Tinsley
Immingham
Withdrawn
17/11/1960
15/09/1962
22/06/1963
09/01/1965
25/09/1965
09/10/1965
11/10/1969
09/1977
10/1977
20/07/1981
26/07/1981
17/01/1990
17/01/1990
D5668   31241                 17/11/1960 31B
30A
31B
30A
40A
40B
41A
31B
81A
BR
OC
W
March (New)
Stratford
March
Stratford
Lincoln
Immingham
Tinsley
March
Old Oak Common
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Withdrawn
17/11/1960
15/09/1962
09/03/1963
09/01/1965
13/03/1965
19/06/1965
06/11/1965
08/01/1966
08/01/1972
06/10/1973
10/11/1973
14/03/1982
14/03/1982
D5669     31410               24/11/1960 31B
30A
31B
30A
31B
34G
55A
CD
W
March (New)
Stratford
March
Stratford
March
Finsbury Park
Holbeck (MR)
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
24/11/1960
15/09/1962
09/03/1963
09/01/1965
05/06/1965
08/04/1972
29/07/1972
15/05/1988
30/06/2003
30/06/2003
D5670   31242                 05/01/1961 31B
30A
31B
30A
34G
41A
40B
W
March (New)
Stratford
March
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Tinsley
Immingham
Withdrawn
05/01/1961
15/09/1962
09/03/1963
09/01/1965
10/07/1965
09/10/1965
05/03/1966
14/12/1998
14/12/1998
D5671   31243                 13/10/1960 41A
34G
40B
34G
40B
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Finsbury Park
Immingham
Finsbury Park
Immingham
Withdrawn
13/10/1960
28/01/1961
07/05/1966
11/06/1966
25/03/1967
08/04/1991
08/04/1991
D5672   31244                 24/11/1960 34G
40B
MR
W
Finsbury Park (New)
Immingham
March
Withdrawn
24/11/1960
25/03/1967
12/07/1975
31/05/1983
31/05/1983
D5673   31245                 01/12/1960 34G
40B
HM
W
Finsbury Park (New)
Immingham
Healey Mills
Withdrawn
01/12/1960
25/03/1967
30/11/1979
05/01/1987
05/01/1987
D5674   31246 31455 31455 31555           01/12/1960 34G
40B
W
Finsbury Park (New)
Immingham
Withdrawn
01/12/1960
25/03/1967
01/09/1996
01/09/1996
D5675   31247                 08/12/1960 34G
40B
W
Finsbury Park (New)
Immingham
Withdrawn
08/12/1960
25/03/1967
04/02/2000
04/02/2000
D5676   31248                 08/12/1960 34G
40B
FP
TE
IM
BS
TI
W
Finsbury Park (New)
Immingham
Finsbury Park
Thornaby
Immingham
Bescot
Tinsley
Withdrawn
08/12/1960
25/03/1967
09/03/1974
02/1978
11/1978
15/05/1988
22/05/1988
31/03/2000
31/03/2000
D5677   31249                 15/12/1960 34G
41A
41A
91M
41A
34G
41A
40B
34G
D16
34G
YK
FP
CD
W
Finsbury Park (New)
Tinsley
Tinsley
To London Midland Region (on loan)
Tinsley
Finsbury Park
Tinsley
Immingham
Finsbury Park
Nottingham Division
Finsbury Park
York (North)
Finsbury Park
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
15/12/1960
28/11/1964
19/06/1965
16/10/1965
23/10/1965
08/10/1966
09/09/1967
10/01/1970
09/05/1970
03/03/1973
31/03/1973
06/10/1973
10/11/1973
15/05/1988
16/12/1991
16/12/1991
D5678   31250                 15/12/1960 34G
40B
34G
41A
34G
YK
TI
W
Finsbury Park (New)
Immingham
Finsbury Park
Tinsley
Finsbury Park
York (North)
Tinsley
Withdrawn
15/12/1960
19/06/1965
17/07/1965
09/09/1967
07/11/1970
06/10/1973
12/01/1974
11/02/2000
11/02/2000
D5679   31251 31442               22/12/1960 34G
40B
31B
34G
41C
32B
31B
34G
30A
31B
CD
W
Finsbury Park (New)
Immingham
March
Finsbury Park
Wath
Ipswich
March
Finsbury Park
Stratford
March
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
22/12/1960
09/01/1965
11/09/1965
06/08/1966
20/08/1966
12/08/1967
11/05/1968
15/03/1969
07/06/1969
24/10/1970
15/05/1988
01/09/1993
01/09/1993
D5680   31252                 22/12/1960 41A
34G
40B
41A
31B
41A
FP
BS
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Finsbury Park
Immingham
Tinsley
March
Tinsley
Finsbury Park
Bescot
Withdrawn
22/12/1960
12/05/1962
09/01/1965
15/05/1965
08/05/1971
11/11/1972
11/1978
15/05/1988
31/03/2000
31/03/2000
D5681   31253 31431   31531           05/01/1961 41A
34G
40B
41A
31B
HO
YK
HO
TI
HO
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Finsbury Park
Immingham
Tinsley
March
Holbeck (MR)
York (North)
Holbeck (MR)
Tinsley
Holbeck (MR)
Withdrawn
05/01/1961
12/05/1962
09/01/1965
10/07/1965
10/10/1970
19/01/1974
12/10/1974
08/03/1975
05/1977
27/11/1977
01/01/1995
01/01/1995
D5682   31254                 12/01/1961 41A
34G
31B
41A
41A
32A
31B
81A
BR
OC
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Finsbury Park
March
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Norwich Thorpe
March
Old Oak Common
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Withdrawn
12/01/1961
12/05/1962
15/09/1962
12/01/1963
26/04/1964
28/08/1965
11/10/1969
08/01/1972
06/03/1976
10/1977
01/12/1979
01/12/1979
D5683   31255                 19/01/1961 41A
34G
31B
41A
41A
2E
41A
31B
30A
MR
SF
FP
MR
BS
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Finsbury Park
March
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Saltley
Tinsley
March
Stratford
March
Stratford
Finsbury Park
March
Bescot
19/01/1961
12/05/1962
15/09/1962
12/01/1963
26/04/1964
01/05/1965
15/05/1965
08/05/1971
07/10/1972
12/10/1974
08/03/1975
10/05/1975
23/05/1976
15/05/1988
D5684   31256 31459               26/01/1961 41A
41A
81A
BR
OC
CD
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Tinsley
Old Oak Common
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Crewe Diesel
26/01/1961
26/04/1964
28/10/1972
27/04/1974
10/05/1975
15/05/1988
D5685   31257                 02/02/1961 41A
41A
32A
34G
41A
32A
30A
40B
41A
D16
41A
81A
BR
OC
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Tinsley
Norwich Thorpe
Finsbury Park
Tinsley
Norwich Thorpe
Stratford
Immingham
Tinsley
Nottingham Division
Tinsley
Old Oak Common
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Withdrawn
02/02/1961
26/04/1964
13/03/1965
03/04/1965
19/06/1965
09/10/1965
23/11/1968
29/03/1969
07/11/1970
29/01/1972
05/02/1972
28/10/1972
27/04/1974
11/01/1975
10/09/1990
10/09/1990
D5686   31258 31434               09/02/1961 41A
41A
D16
41A
91M
41A
9E
41A
D16
41A
40B
81A
BR
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Tinsley
Nottingham Division (on loan)
Tinsley
To London Midland Region
Tinsley
Trafford Park (LMS)
Tinsley
Nottingham Division
Tinsley
Immingham
Old Oak Common
Bristol Bath Road
Withdrawn
09/02/1961
26/04/1964
27/03/1965
10/04/1965
05/1965
12/06/1965
23/10/1965
06/11/1965
13/11/1965
27/11/1965
09/10/1971
08/07/1972
26/11/1977
01/11/1998
01/11/1998
D5687   31259                 16/02/1961 41A
41A
D16
41A
91E
81A
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Tinsley
Nottingham Division
Tinsley
To Eastern Region
Old Oak Common
Withdrawn
16/02/1961
26/04/1964
11/09/1965
25/09/1965
06/11/1965
08/07/1972
02/03/1989
02/03/1989
D5688   31260                 23/02/1961 41A
40A
41A
40B
81A
BR
OC
TE
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Lincoln
Tinsley
Immingham
Old Oak Common
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Thornaby
Withdrawn
23/02/1961
22/02/1964
06/11/1965
05/03/1966
08/01/1972
18/09/1976
10/1977
15/05/1988
12/01/1990
12/01/1990
D5689   31261                 02/03/1961 41A
31B
41A
40A
40B
81A
BR
MR
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
March
Sheffield Darnall
Lincoln
Immingham
Old Oak Common
Bristol Bath Road
March
Withdrawn
02/03/1961
08/09/1962
12/01/1963
22/02/1964
17/05/1969
08/07/1972
10/05/1975
09/1977
05/01/1987
05/01/1987
D5690   31262                 09/03/1961 41A
31B
41A
41A
32B
40B
81A
BR
IM
MR
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
March
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Ipswich
Immingham
Old Oak Common
Bristol Bath Road
Immingham
March
Withdrawn
09/03/1961
08/09/1962
12/01/1963
26/04/1964
20/02/1965
17/07/1965
08/07/1972
10/05/1975
11/10/1975
29/02/1976
29/05/1983
29/05/1983
D5691     31411   31511           16/03/1961 41A
31B
41A
41A
40B
52A
FP
CD
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
March
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Immingham
Gateshead
Finsbury Park
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
16/03/1961
08/09/1962
12/01/1963
26/04/1964
05/03/1966
04/03/1972
02/05/1976
15/05/1988
30/11/2005
30/11/2005
D5692     31412   31512           23/03/1961 41A
31B
41A
41A
D15
41A
32B
32A
31B
40B
82A
81A
CD
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
March
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Leicester Division
Tinsley
Ipswich
Norwich Thorpe
March
Immingham
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
23/03/1961
08/09/1962
12/01/1963
26/04/1964
27/03/1965
10/04/1965
31/07/1965
09/10/1965
11/10/1969
09/10/1971
04/12/1971
11/11/1972
15/05/1988
31/05/2006
31/05/2006
D5693   31263                 30/03/1961 41A
31B
40B
MR
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
March
Immingham
March
Withdrawn
30/03/1961
08/09/1962
09/10/1971
12/10/1974
10/08/2001
10/08/2001
D5694   31264                 13/04/1961 30A
32A
31B
40B
TO
IM
FP
TE
W
Stratford (New)
Norwich Thorpe
March
Immingham
Toton
Immingham
Finsbury Park
Thornaby
Withdrawn
13/04/1961
09/10/1965
11/10/1969
09/10/1971
23/02/1974
09/03/1974
30/11/1974
15/05/1988
08/04/1991
08/04/1991
D5695   31265 31430   31530           20/04/1961 30A
31B
40B
82A
81A
BR
OC
BS
Stratford (New)
March
Immingham
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Bescot
20/04/1961
13/11/1965
09/10/1971
04/12/1971
11/11/1972
05/1977
07/1977
15/05/1988
D5696   31266 31460               04/05/1961 30A
31B
30A
41A
31B
52A
51L
40B
MR
TE
IM
SF
W
Stratford (New)
March
Stratford
Tinsley
March
Gateshead
Thornaby
Immingham
March
Thornaby
Immingham
Stratford
Withdrawn
04/05/1961
23/06/1962
09/01/1965
15/04/1967
23/05/1970
09/10/1971
08/01/1972
08/07/1972
12/01/1974
02/1978
11/1978
01/11/1981
01/12/1992
01/12/1992
D5697   31267 31419   31519           11/05/1961 30A
31B
30A
31B
41A
31B
CW
OC
BR
W
Stratford (New)
March
Stratford
March
Tinsley
March
Cricklewood East
Old Oak Common
Bristol Bath Road
Withdrawn
11/05/1961
23/06/1962
09/01/1965
08/10/1966
29/03/1969
10/10/1970
29/12/1973
11/10/1975
10/1977
01/12/1995
01/12/1995
D5698   31268                 18/05/1961 30A
31B
30A
34G
41A
41A
31B
41A
40B
HO
W
Stratford (New)
March
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Tinsley
Tinsley
March
Tinsley
Immingham
Holbeck (MR)
Withdrawn
18/05/1961
23/06/1962
09/01/1965
03/04/1965
19/06/1965
17/07/1965
09/10/1965
06/11/1965
12/02/1966
16/05/1976
11/02/2000
11/02/2000
D5699   31269 31429               27/04/1961 30A
31B
W
Stratford (New)
March
Withdrawn
27/04/1961
24/07/1965
01/11/1991
01/11/1991
D5800   31270                 01/06/1961 31B
55A
YK
TI
TE
W
March (New)
Holbeck (MR)
York (North)
Tinsley
Thornaby
Withdrawn
01/06/1961
10/03/1973
12/01/1974
08/03/1975
04/10/1987
26/05/2000
26/05/2000
D5801   31271                 08/06/1961 30A
31B
40A
40B
41A
55A
TI
BS
W
Stratford (New)
March
Lincoln
Immingham
Tinsley
Holbeck (MR)
Tinsley
Bescot
Withdrawn
08/06/1961
23/06/1962
17/08/1963
17/05/1969
07/03/1970
07/10/1972
05/1977
04/10/1987
01/05/1997
01/05/1997
D5802   31272                 15/06/1961 31B
40A
40B
34G
30A
31B
30A
HO
YK
W
March (New)
Lincoln
Immingham
Finsbury Park
Stratford
March
Stratford
Holbeck (MR)
York (North)
Withdrawn
15/06/1961
24/08/1963
17/05/1969
18/09/1971
09/10/1971
12/02/1972
07/10/1972
10/05/1975
11/10/1975
15/08/1995
15/08/1995
D5803   31273                 22/06/1961 31B
40A
40B
81A
82A
OC
W
March (New)
Lincoln
Immingham
Old Oak Common
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Withdrawn
22/06/1961
24/08/1963
17/05/1969
08/01/1972
11/11/1972
12/05/1973
12/04/2001
12/04/2001
D5804   31274 31425               29/06/1961 41A
31B
41A
41f
41A
41C
41A
51L
TI
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
March
Sheffield Darnall
Wath
Tinsley
Wath
Tinsley
Thornaby
Tinsley
Withdrawn
29/06/1961
25/11/1961
27/04/1963
05/10/1963
09/10/1965
22/01/1966
18/06/1966
11/11/1972
18/05/1974
01/09/1991
01/09/1991
D5805   31275                 06/07/1961 41A
41f
16G
41A
41A
16G
41A
41C
41A
51L
IM
TI
TE
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Wath
Westhouses (on loan)
Tinsley
Tinsley
Westhouses
Tinsley
Wath
Tinsley
Thornaby
Immingham
Tinsley
Thornaby
Withdrawn
06/07/1961
05/10/1963
25/09/1965
09/10/1965
16/10/1965
23/10/1965
06/11/1965
22/01/1966
18/06/1966
11/11/1972
12/01/1974
12/07/1975
04/10/1987
31/01/2005
31/01/2005
D5806   31276                 13/07/1961 41A
41f
41A
41C
41A
D16
41A
TE
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Wath
Tinsley
Wath
Tinsley
Nottingham Division
Tinsley
Thornaby
Withdrawn
13/07/1961
05/10/1963
09/10/1965
22/01/1966
18/06/1966
22/01/1972
29/01/1972
04/10/1987
11/02/2000
11/02/2000
D5807   31277 31469   31569           20/07/1961 41A
41f
41A
52A
51L
BS
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Wath
Tinsley
Gateshead
Thornaby
Bescot
Withdrawn
20/07/1961
05/10/1963
23/04/1966
05/08/1972
12/08/1972
15/05/1988
01/02/1995
01/02/1995
D5808   31278                 20/07/1961 41A
41f
41C
D16
41C
41A
55A
TI
GD
TE
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Wath
Wath
Nottingham Division (on loan)
Wath
Tinsley
Holbeck (MR)
Tinsley
Gateshead
Thornaby
Withdrawn
20/07/1961
05/10/1963
17/07/1965
06/11/1965
13/11/1965
23/04/1966
11/11/1972
03/11/1973
11/05/1974
11/01/1975
29/03/1989
29/03/1989
D5809   31279 31452 31452 31552           27/07/1961 41A
41f
41A
82A
81A
82A
OC
BR
OC
MR
TE
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Wath
Tinsley
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
March
Thornaby
27/07/1961
05/10/1963
23/04/1966
16/10/1971
08/01/1972
11/11/1972
12/05/1973
09/03/1974
11/05/1974
11/10/1975
02/1978
D5810   31280                 03/08/1961 41A
41f
41A
55A
51L
55A
YK
IM
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Wath
Tinsley
Holbeck (MR)
Thornaby
Holbeck (MR)
York (North)
Immingham
Withdrawn
03/08/1961
05/10/1963
23/04/1966
11/11/1972
25/11/1972
06/01/1973
12/10/1974
11/01/1975
24/10/1988
24/10/1988
D5811   31281                 24/08/1961 41A
41f
2E
41C
41A
41C
41A
52A
41A
55A
51L
55A
YK
IM
HM
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Wath
Saltley
Wath
Tinsley
Wath
Tinsley
Gateshead
Tinsley
Holbeck (MR)
Thornaby
Holbeck (MR)
York (North)
Immingham
Healey Mills
Withdrawn
24/08/1961
05/10/1963
20/03/1965
27/03/1965
23/04/1966
06/08/1966
11/05/1968
02/09/1972
07/10/1972
11/11/1972
25/11/1972
10/03/1973
26/10/1974
11/01/1975
30/11/1979
15/05/1989
15/05/1989
D5812     31413               31/08/1961 41A
41f
41A
41C
41A
82A
81A
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Wath
Tinsley
Wath
Tinsley
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Withdrawn
31/08/1961
05/10/1963
23/04/1966
06/08/1966
11/05/1968
16/10/1971
08/01/1972
01/05/1997
01/05/1997
D5813   31282                 07/09/1961 41A
41f
41A
41C
41A
40B
TE
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Wath
Tinsley
Wath
Tinsley
Immingham
Thornaby
Withdrawn
07/09/1961
05/10/1963
23/04/1966
06/08/1966
11/05/1968
07/03/1970
11/05/1974
17/01/1994
17/01/1994
D5814     31414   31514           14/09/1961 41A
41f
91M
41C
41A
41C
41A
81A
82A
81A
BR
CD
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Wath
To London Midland Region (on loan)
Wath
Tinsley
Wath
Tinsley
Old Oak Common
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Bristol Bath Road
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
14/09/1961
05/10/1963
19/06/1965
03/07/1965
23/04/1966
06/08/1966
11/05/1968
08/01/1972
11/11/1972
24/03/1973
09/1977
15/05/1988
01/02/1999
01/02/1999
D5815   31283                 21/09/1961 41A
41f
41A
41C
41A
40B
TE
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Wath
Tinsley
Wath
Tinsley
Immingham
Thornaby
Withdrawn
21/09/1961
05/10/1963
23/04/1966
06/08/1966
11/05/1968
07/03/1970
11/05/1974
03/11/1989
03/11/1989
D5816   31284                 28/09/1961 41A
41f
41A
41C
41A
31B
TE
TI
IM
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Wath
Tinsley
Wath
Tinsley
March
Thornaby
Tinsley
Immingham
Withdrawn
28/09/1961
05/10/1963
23/04/1966
06/08/1966
11/05/1968
11/11/1972
09/03/1974
18/05/1974
11/01/1975
30/08/1989
30/08/1989
D5817   31285                 05/10/1961 41A
41f
41A
40B
D16
30A
31B
30A
TE
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Wath
Tinsley
Immingham
Nottingham Division
Stratford
March
Stratford
Thornaby
05/10/1961
05/10/1963
11/05/1968
07/03/1970
11/09/1971
09/10/1971
12/02/1972
07/10/1972
12/01/1974
D5818   31286                 12/10/1961 41A
41f
41A
81A
82A
OC
TE
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Wath
Tinsley
Old Oak Common
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Thornaby
Withdrawn
12/10/1961
05/10/1963
11/05/1968
08/01/1972
11/11/1972
08/11/1975
15/05/1988
20/12/1991
20/12/1991
D5819   31287                 19/10/1961 41A
41f
41A
GD
TE
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Wath
Tinsley
Gateshead
Thornaby
Withdrawn
19/10/1961
05/10/1963
11/05/1968
11/05/1974
10/05/1975
09/09/1987
09/09/1987
D5820   31288                 26/10/1961 41A
41f
41A
HO
GD
IM
SF
BS
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Wath
Tinsley
Holbeck (MR)
Gateshead
Immingham
Stratford
Bescot
Withdrawn
26/10/1961
05/10/1963
11/05/1968
19/05/1973
13/10/1973
02/05/1976
04/10/1987
15/05/1988
08/04/1991
08/04/1991
D5821   31289                 02/11/1961 41A
41f
D16
41C
41A
52A
SF
BS
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Wath
Nottingham Division
Wath
Tinsley
Gateshead
Stratford
Bescot
Withdrawn
02/11/1961
05/10/1963
04/12/1965
25/12/1965
11/05/1968
02/09/1972
04/10/1987
15/05/1988
01/03/1992
01/03/1992
D5822   31290                 09/11/1961 41A
41f
41A
HO
TI
GD
TE
TE
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Wath
Tinsley
Holbeck (MR)
Tinsley
Gateshead
Thornaby
Thornaby
Withdrawn
09/11/1961
05/10/1963
11/05/1968
19/05/1973
03/11/1973
11/05/1974
11/01/1975
04/10/1987
04/02/2000
04/02/2000
D5823   31291 31456 31456 31556 31556         16/11/1961 41A
41f
41A
82A
OC
MR
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Wath
Tinsley
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
March
16/11/1961
05/10/1963
11/05/1968
08/01/1972
27/04/1974
11/10/1975
D5824     31415               23/11/1961 41A
41f
41A
82A
OC
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Wath
Tinsley
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Withdrawn
23/11/1961
05/10/1963
11/05/1968
08/01/1972
02/06/1973
01/07/1995
01/07/1995
D5825   31292                 30/11/1961 41A
41f
41A
40B
D16
40B
30A
TE
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Wath
Tinsley
Immingham
Nottingham Division
Immingham
Stratford
Thornaby
Withdrawn
30/11/1961
05/10/1963
11/05/1968
07/03/1970
14/08/1971
11/09/1971
09/10/1971
12/01/1974
07/02/1990
07/02/1990
D5826   31293                 07/12/1961 41A
41f
41A
82A
OC
BR
MR
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Wath
Tinsley
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Bristol Bath Road
March
Withdrawn
07/12/1961
05/10/1963
11/05/1968
08/01/1972
08/03/1975
08/11/1975
19/02/1978
09/11/1990
09/11/1990
D5827   31294                 14/12/1961 41A
41f
2E
41C
41A
82A
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Wath
Saltley
Wath
Tinsley
Bristol Bath Road
Withdrawn
14/12/1961
05/10/1963
02/10/1965
23/10/1965
11/05/1968
08/01/1972
04/02/2000
04/02/2000
D5828   31295 31447   31547           28/12/1961 41A
41f
41C
2E
41C
31B
40B
41A
82A
OC
BR
MR
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Wath
Wath
Saltley
Wath
March
Immingham
Tinsley
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Bristol Bath Road
March
Withdrawn
28/12/1961
05/10/1963
03/04/1965
15/05/1965
29/05/1965
26/11/1966
17/05/1969
07/03/1970
08/01/1972
27/04/1974
11/10/1975
19/02/1978
01/01/1996
01/01/1996
D5829   31296                 04/01/1962 41A
41C
16G
41C
41A
40B
TE
BR
OC
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Wath
Westhouses
Wath
Tinsley
Immingham
Thornaby
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Withdrawn
04/01/1962
18/01/1964
16/10/1965
23/10/1965
11/05/1968
07/03/1970
12/01/1974
10/05/1975
09/1977
01/12/1993
01/12/1993
D5830   31297 31463   31563           11/01/1962 41A
41C
2E
41C
41A
TE
TI
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Wath
Saltley
Wath
Tinsley
Thornaby
Tinsley
Withdrawn
11/01/1962
18/01/1964
12/06/1965
03/07/1965
11/05/1968
11/05/1974
10/1977
01/02/1998
01/02/1998
D5831   31298             97203   18/01/1962 41A
41C
41C
41A
GD
TE
TI
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Wath
Wath
Tinsley
Gateshead
Thornaby
Tinsley
Withdrawn
18/01/1962
18/01/1964
05/06/1965
11/05/1968
05/1977
07/1977
10/1977
06/07/1987
06/07/1987
D5832   31299                 01/02/1962 41A
41C
41A
TE
TI
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Wath
Tinsley
Thornaby
Tinsley
Withdrawn
01/02/1962
18/01/1964
11/05/1968
18/05/1974
12/07/1975
10/10/1990
10/10/1990
D5833   31300 31445   31545           15/02/1962 41A
41C
2E
41C
41A
TE
TI
SF
BS
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Wath
Saltley (on loan)
Wath
Tinsley
Thornaby
Tinsley
Stratford
Bescot
Withdrawn
15/02/1962
18/01/1964
18/09/1965
09/10/1965
11/05/1968
18/05/1974
12/07/1975
01/11/1981
15/05/1988
01/05/1997
01/05/1997
D5834   31301                 01/03/1962 41A
41C
41A
40B
TI
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Wath
Tinsley
Immingham
Tinsley
01/03/1962
18/01/1964
18/03/1967
07/03/1970
07/07/1973
D5835   31302                 26/04/1962 41A
34G
41A
30A
32A
30A
41A
55A
TI
YK
HO
TI
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Finsbury Park
Sheffield Darnall
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
Stratford
Tinsley
Holbeck (MR)
Tinsley
York (North)
Holbeck (MR)
Tinsley
Withdrawn
26/04/1962
19/05/1962
14/07/1962
15/09/1962
26/06/1965
24/07/1965
07/10/1967
07/10/1972
06/07/1974
12/10/1974
10/05/1975
12/07/1975
14/01/2000
14/01/2000
D5836   31303 31458 31458 31558           12/04/1962 41A
41C
41A
51L
TI
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Wath
Tinsley
Thornaby
Tinsley
Withdrawn
12/04/1962
18/01/1964
11/05/1968
10/03/1973
12/07/1975
01/01/1996
01/01/1996
D5837   31304                 19/04/1962 41A
41C
41C
40B
41A
82A
OC
SF
IM
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Wath
Wath
Immingham
Tinsley
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Stratford
Immingham
Withdrawn
19/04/1962
07/03/1964
31/07/1965
11/05/1968
07/03/1970
08/01/1972
10/05/1975
15/05/1988
22/05/1988
14/01/2000
14/01/2000
D5838   31305                 26/04/1962 41A
41C
40B
41A
YK
MR
SF
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Wath
Immingham
Tinsley
York (North)
March
Stratford
Withdrawn
26/04/1962
07/03/1964
11/05/1968
07/03/1970
12/10/1974
26/10/1974
04/10/1987
08/11/1991
08/11/1991
D5839   31306                 03/05/1962 41A
41C
2E
41C
40B
41A
TE
TI
SF
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Wath
Saltley
Wath
Immingham
Tinsley
Thornaby
Tinsley
Stratford
03/05/1962
07/03/1964
17/07/1965
24/07/1965
11/05/1968
07/03/1970
11/05/1974
06/07/1974
15/05/1988
D5840   31307 31449 31449 31549           10/05/1962 41A
41A
TI
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Tinsley
Tinsley
Withdrawn
10/05/1962
26/04/1964
10/05/1975
01/03/1996
01/03/1996
D5841   31308                 17/05/1962 41A
41A
9E
41A
55A
MR
TI
YK
TI
SF
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Tinsley
Trafford Park (LMS)
Tinsley
Holbeck (MR)
March
Tinsley
York (North)
Tinsley
Stratford
17/05/1962
26/04/1964
21/08/1965
28/08/1965
07/10/1972
19/01/1974
06/07/1974
12/10/1974
08/03/1975
15/05/1988
D5842     31416   31516           24/05/1962 41A
41A
D15
41A
40B
41C
32B
31B
82A
81A
BR
CD
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Tinsley
Leicester Division
Tinsley
Immingham
Wath
Ipswich
March
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Bristol Bath Road
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
24/05/1962
26/04/1964
17/04/1965
01/05/1965
12/02/1966
20/08/1966
12/08/1967
11/05/1968
08/01/1972
10/03/1973
09/1977
15/05/1988
01/10/1995
01/10/1995
D5843   31309                 31/05/1962 41A
41A
2E
41A
82A
OC
BR
MR
SF
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Tinsley
Saltley
Tinsley
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Bristol Bath Road
March
Stratford
Withdrawn
31/05/1962
26/04/1964
24/07/1965
21/08/1965
08/01/1972
08/03/1975
11/10/1975
09/1977
04/10/1987
08/04/1991
08/04/1991
D5844   31310 31422   31522           07/06/1962 41A
41A
D16
41A
D16
41A
55A
CW
FP
BR
CD
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Tinsley
Nottingham Division (on loan)
Tinsley
Nottingham Division
Tinsley
Holbeck (MR)
Cricklewood East
Finsbury Park
Bristol Bath Road
Crewe Diesel
07/06/1962
26/04/1964
27/02/1965
20/03/1965
10/04/1965
01/05/1965
07/10/1972
28/09/1974
02/05/1976
09/1977
15/05/1988
D5845   31311                 14/06/1962 41A
41A
9E
41A
51L
IM
SF
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Tinsley
Trafford Park (LMS) (on loan)
Tinsley
Thornaby
Immingham
Stratford
Withdrawn
14/06/1962
26/04/1964
28/08/1965
25/09/1965
11/11/1972
11/1978
04/10/1987
07/02/1989
07/02/1989
D5846   31312                 21/06/1962 41A
41A
MR
YK
HO
TE
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Tinsley
March
York (North)
Holbeck (MR)
Thornaby
Withdrawn
21/06/1962
26/04/1964
06/10/1973
12/10/1974
08/03/1975
04/10/1987
14/01/1996
14/01/1996
D5847   31313                 28/06/1962 41A
41A
32A
41A
30A
40B
31B
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Tinsley
Norwich Thorpe
Tinsley
Stratford
Immingham
March
Withdrawn
28/06/1962
26/04/1964
05/03/1966
11/10/1969
03/04/1971
09/10/1971
07/10/1972
31/05/1983
31/05/1983
D5848   31314                 05/07/1962 41A
41A
D15
41A
9E
41A
D16
41A
55A
30A
31B
30A
MR
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Tinsley
Leicester Division (on loan)
Tinsley
Trafford Park (LMS) (on loan)
Tinsley
Nottingham Division (on loan)
Tinsley
Holbeck (MR)
Stratford
March
Stratford
March
Withdrawn
05/07/1962
26/04/1964
01/05/1965
22/05/1965
25/09/1965
16/10/1965
15/01/1966
19/02/1966
07/11/1970
03/04/1971
08/05/1971
09/10/1971
11/05/1974
19/09/1982
19/09/1982
D5849   31315 31462               12/07/1962 41A
41A
30A
40B
31B
CD
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Tinsley
Stratford
Immingham
March
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
12/07/1962
26/04/1964
03/04/1971
09/10/1971
07/10/1972
15/05/1988
01/04/1998
01/04/1998
D5850   31316 31446   31546           18/07/1962 41A
41A
D16
41A
30A
55B
51L
YK
HO
BS
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Tinsley
Nottingham Division
Tinsley
Stratford
York (North)
Thornaby
York (North)
Holbeck (MR)
Bescot
Withdrawn
18/07/1962
26/04/1964
29/05/1965
10/07/1965
03/04/1971
09/10/1971
08/01/1972
12/01/1974
11/10/1975
15/05/1988
01/11/1995
01/11/1995
D5851   31317                 26/07/1962 41A
41A
2E
41A
40B
31B
IM
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Tinsley
Saltley
Tinsley
Immingham
March
Immingham
26/07/1962
26/04/1964
03/04/1965
10/04/1965
15/05/1965
11/09/1965
10/03/1979
D5852   31318 31451   31551           02/08/1962 41A
41A
40B
MR
CD
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Tinsley
Immingham
March
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
02/08/1962
26/04/1964
10/07/1965
12/10/1974
15/05/1988
01/03/1996
01/03/1996
D5853   31319                 23/08/1962 30A
31B
40A
34G
40B
YK
HO
TI
IM
W
Stratford (New)
March
Lincoln
Finsbury Park
Immingham
York (North)
Holbeck (MR)
Tinsley
Immingham
Withdrawn
23/08/1962
15/09/1962
31/08/1963
14/09/1963
09/01/1965
12/10/1974
11/10/1975
05/1977
04/10/1987
30/04/2007
30/04/2007
D5854   31320                 23/08/1962 30A
31B
40A
34G
40B
41A
32A
31B
40B
W
Stratford (New)
March
Lincoln
Finsbury Park
Immingham
Tinsley
Norwich Thorpe
March
Immingham
Withdrawn
23/08/1962
15/09/1962
07/09/1963
14/09/1963
09/01/1965
06/11/1965
11/03/1967
17/05/1969
07/10/1972
28/04/1990
28/04/1990
D5855   31321 31468 31468 31568           30/08/1962 31B
40A
41A
D16
41A
41A
40B
MR
CD
March (New)
Lincoln
Tinsley
Nottingham Division
Tinsley
Tinsley
Immingham
March
Crewe Diesel
30/08/1962
31/08/1963
09/01/1965
27/03/1965
27/03/1965
24/04/1965
17/05/1969
12/10/1974
15/05/1988
D5856     31417               30/08/1962 31B
40A
41A
2E
41A
40B
52A
HO
IM
W
March (New)
Lincoln
Tinsley
Saltley
Tinsley
Immingham
Gateshead
Holbeck (MR)
Immingham
Withdrawn
30/08/1962
07/09/1963
09/01/1965
21/08/1965
18/09/1965
17/05/1969
06/05/1972
13/10/1973
04/10/1987
30/11/2005
30/11/2005
D5857   31322                 06/09/1962 41A
41A
32B
31B
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Tinsley
Ipswich
March
Withdrawn
06/09/1962
26/04/1964
03/04/1965
19/06/1965
28/07/1989
28/07/1989
D5858   31323                 20/09/1962 41A
41A
40B
41A
IM
SF
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Tinsley
Immingham
Tinsley
Immingham
Stratford
Withdrawn
20/09/1962
26/04/1964
12/02/1966
09/10/1971
10/11/1973
04/10/1987
08/06/1989
08/06/1989
D5859   31324                 04/10/1962 41A
41A
41A
40B
SX
FP
HO
TE
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Tinsley
Tinsley
Immingham
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Holbeck (MR)
Thornaby
Withdrawn
04/10/1962
26/04/1964
15/05/1965
17/05/1969
19/05/1973
07/07/1973
10/1977
04/10/1987
16/04/1993
16/04/1993
D5860   31325 31464               11/10/1962 41A
41A
34G
41A
40B
31B
CD
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Tinsley
Finsbury Park
Tinsley
Immingham
March
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
11/10/1962
26/04/1964
17/04/1965
19/06/1965
12/02/1966
07/10/1972
15/05/1988
01/01/1991
01/01/1991
D5861   31326           31970 97204   18/10/1962 41A
41A
9E
41A
91E
32A
31B

ZL
R
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Tinsley
Trafford Park (LMS) (on loan)
Tinsley
To Eastern Region
Norwich Thorpe
March

Swindon Works (on loan)
Reinstated
Withdrawn
18/10/1962
26/04/1964
10/07/1965
21/08/1965
06/11/1965
26/11/1966
10/02/1968
31/05/1981
01/07/1981
07/01/1982
01/09/1991
01/09/1991
D5862   31327                 25/10/1962 41A
41A
40B
41A
IM
YK
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Tinsley
Immingham
Tinsley
Immingham
York (North)
25/10/1962
26/04/1964
05/03/1966
07/03/1970
10/11/1973
27/11/1977