31 A1A-A1A
Date | Number (at time) | Depot (at time) | Code | Details | Ref | Link |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sun 26/02/1961 | D5525, D5605, D5605, D5643, D5655, D5663, D5663, D5663, D5663, D5670 |
31B, 30A, 30A, 34G, 31B, 31B, 31B, 31B, 31B, 31B |
Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Outside erecting shop. Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Outside erecting shop. Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Outside erecting shop. Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Outside erecting shop. Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Outside erecting shop. |
|||
Sat 02/12/1961 | D5520, D5568, D5569, D5569, D5612, D5613, D5823, D5823, D5823, D5823, D5823, D5825 |
32B, 31B, 31B, 31B, 34G, 34G, 41A, 41A, 41A, 41A, 41A, 41A |
Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Ex-Works on Doncaster shed. Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Ex-Works on Doncaster shed. Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Ex-Works on Doncaster shed. Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Ex-Works on Doncaster shed. Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Ex-Works on Doncaster shed. Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Paint shop. |
SLS 1/1962 | ||
Sat 26/09/1964 | D5527, D5684, D5684, D5690, D5832 |
40A, 41A, 41A, 41A, 41C |
Waleswood Junction - This log was recorded on the ex-M.S.&.L. line east of Sheffield.: Passing Waleswood Junction - This log was recorded on the ex-M.S.&.L. line east of Sheffield.: Passing Waleswood Junction - This log was recorded on the ex-M.S.&.L. line east of Sheffield.: Passing Waleswood Junction - This log was recorded on the ex-M.S.&.L. line east of Sheffield.: Passing Waleswood Junction - This log was recorded on the ex-M.S.&.L. line east of Sheffield.: Passing |
John Thickitt | ||
Sat 26/09/1964 | D5841, D5852, D5852, D5852 |
41A, 41A, 41A, 41A |
Waleswood Junction - This log was recorded on the ex-M.S.&.L. line east of Sheffield.: Double-heading coke hoppers - Double heading coke hoppers with D5841. These Orgreave Sidings to Appleby-Frodingham coke trains were rostered for Tinsley (41A) Type 2s'. A heavy train, the coke was produced at Orgreave Coking Plant and burnt in the Scunthorpe blast furnaces. The passage of these trains was a frequent event, as they ran mornings and afternoons on weekdays. - with D5852 Waleswood Junction - This log was recorded on the ex-M.S.&.L. line east of Sheffield.: Double-heading coke hoppers - Double heading coke hoppers with D5841. These Orgreave Sidings to Appleby-Frodingham coke trains were rostered for Tinsley (41A) Type 2s'. A heavy train, the coke was produced at Orgreave Coking Plant and burnt in the Scunthorpe blast furnaces. The passage of these trains was a frequent event, as they ran mornings and afternoons on weekdays. - with D5841 Waleswood Junction - This log was recorded on the ex-M.S.&.L. line east of Sheffield.: Double-heading coke hoppers - Double heading coke hoppers with D5841. These Orgreave Sidings to Appleby-Frodingham coke trains were rostered for Tinsley (41A) Type 2s'. A heavy train, the coke was produced at Orgreave Coking Plant and burnt in the Scunthorpe blast furnaces. The passage of these trains was a frequent event, as they ran mornings and afternoons on weekdays. - with D5841 Waleswood Junction - This log was recorded on the ex-M.S.&.L. line east of Sheffield.: Double-heading coke hoppers - Double heading coke hoppers with D5841. These Orgreave Sidings to Appleby-Frodingham coke trains were rostered for Tinsley (41A) Type 2s'. A heavy train, the coke was produced at Orgreave Coking Plant and burnt in the Scunthorpe blast furnaces. The passage of these trains was a frequent event, as they ran mornings and afternoons on weekdays. - with D5841 |
John Thickitt | ||
Thu 29/04/1965 | D5541, D5862 |
41A, 41A |
An afternoon at Sheffield Midland station: Sheffield Midland station An afternoon at Sheffield Midland station: Sheffield Midland station |
John Thickitt - station visit | ||
Sat 21/06/1969 | D5587, D5587, D5596, D5596, D5605, D5605, D5610, D5645, D5645, D5645, D5649 |
34G, 34G, 34G, 34G, 34G, 34G, 34G, 34G, 34G, 34G, 34G |
Hornsey depot: On shed Hornsey depot: On shed Hornsey depot: On shed Hornsey depot: On shed Hornsey depot: On shed Hornsey depot: On shed Hornsey depot: On shed Hornsey depot: On shed Hornsey depot: On shed Hornsey depot: On shed Hornsey depot: On shed |
RO 9/1969 | ||
Sun 22/06/1969 | D5609, D5609 |
34G, 34G |
Hornsey depot: On shed Hornsey depot: On shed |
RO 9/1969 | ||
Sun 29/06/1969 | D5528, D5536, D5539 |
81A, 81A, 81A |
Old Oak Common depot: On shed Old Oak Common depot: On shed Old Oak Common depot: On shed |
RO 9/1969 | ||
Sun 29/06/1969 | D5590, D5591, D5591, D5615, D5623, D5626, D5654, D5654, D5654, D5654, D5826 |
34G, 34G, 34G, 34G, 34G, 34G, 34G, 34G, 34G, 34G, 41A |
Finsbury Park depot: On shed Finsbury Park depot: On shed Finsbury Park depot: On shed Finsbury Park depot: On shed Finsbury Park depot: On shed Finsbury Park depot: On shed Finsbury Park depot: On shed Finsbury Park depot: On shed Finsbury Park depot: On shed Finsbury Park depot: On shed Finsbury Park depot: On shed |
RO 9/1969 | ||
Sun 29/06/1969 | D5588, D5593, D5596, D5596, D5608, D5609, D5609, D5610, D5611, D5612, D5629 |
34G, 34G, 34G, 34G, 34G, 34G, 34G, 34G, 34G, 34G, 31B |
At Kings Cross terminus: Around the terminus At Kings Cross terminus: Around the terminus At Kings Cross terminus: Around the terminus At Kings Cross terminus: Around the terminus At Kings Cross terminus: Around the terminus At Kings Cross terminus: Around the terminus At Kings Cross terminus: Around the terminus At Kings Cross terminus: Around the terminus At Kings Cross terminus: Around the terminus At Kings Cross terminus: Around the terminus At Kings Cross terminus: Around the terminus |
RO 9/1969 | ||
Tue 11/01/1972 | D5655, D5682, D5688, D5803, D5814, D5814, D5814 |
81A, 81A, 81A, 81A, 81A, 81A, 81A |
Locomotives on shed at Old Oak Common: Locomotive on shed at Old Oak Common Locomotives on shed at Old Oak Common: Locomotive on shed at Old Oak Common Locomotives on shed at Old Oak Common: Locomotive on shed at Old Oak Common Locomotives on shed at Old Oak Common: Locomotive on shed at Old Oak Common Locomotives on shed at Old Oak Common: Locomotive on shed at Old Oak Common Locomotives on shed at Old Oak Common: Locomotive on shed at Old Oak Common Locomotives on shed at Old Oak Common: Locomotive on shed at Old Oak Common |
RO 517 | ||
Sun 22/06/1975 | 31126 | FP | At Kings Cross - Stabling point | |||
Sun 28/09/1975 | 31258, 31258 |
OC, OC |
On Old Oak Common depot - Stabled On Old Oak Common depot - Stabled |
|||
Thu 08/07/1976 | 31265, 31265, 31265 |
OC, OC, OC |
On Old Oak Common depot - Front of shed. |