Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Donations

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 207 Today
» 3545 Yesterday
» 16514 Week
» 68399 Month
» 693754 Year
» 3720607 Total
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)

31 A1A-A1A


BR (Pre Tops) BR (31/1) BR (31/4) BR (31/0) BR (Dept) BR (97/2) BR (31/9) BR (31/5) BR (31/4 (2)) BR (31/5 (2)) BR (31/6) Date To Service Bld Rebuilt From Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
D5500 31018 10/10/1957 BH 12/03/1969
from 30
Stratford 10/07/1976 Stratford 18.75 Prs Preserved 18.76
D5501 31001 25/11/1957 BH 27/02/1969
from 30
Stratford 10/07/1976 Stratford 18.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 13/01/1977 19.15
D5502 31002 ADB968014 16/12/1957 BH 08/1968
from 30
Stratford 01/01/1980 Stratford 22.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 05/1984 26.43
D5503 31003 09/01/1958 BH 19/10/1968
from 30
Stratford 03/02/1980 Stratford 22.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 04/1980 22.28
D5504 31004 30/01/1958 BH 30/10/1968
from 30
Stratford 05/10/1980 Stratford 22.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 06/1981 23.39
D5505 31005 20/02/1958 BH 14/11/1968
from 30
Stratford 03/02/1980 Stratford 22 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 03/1980 22.08
D5506 31006 13/03/1958 BH 25/05/1968
from 30
Stratford 05/01/1980 Stratford 21.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 12/1980 22.78
D5507 31007 19/04/1958 BH 06/02/1969
from 30
Stratford 04/11/1976 Stratford 18.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 16/06/1978 20.17
D5508 31008 ADB968016 17/04/1958 BH 12/10/1968
from 30
Stratford 01/10/1980 Stratford 22.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 06/1985 27.18
D5509 31009 01/05/1958 BH 13/12/1968
from 30
Stratford 10/07/1976 Stratford 18.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 21/11/1977 19.57
D5510 31010 16/05/1958 BH 03/01/1969
from 30
Stratford 10/07/1976 Stratford 18.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 06/12/1976 18.57
D5511 31011 05/06/1958 BH 10/01/1969
from 30
Stratford 10/07/1976 Stratford 18.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 05/01/1977 18.60
D5512 31012 19/06/1958 BH 11/02/1969
from 30
Stratford 04/11/1976 Stratford 18.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 10/1978 20.34
D5513 31013 ADB968013 13/07/1958 BH 19/04/1968
from 30
Stratford 01/03/1979 Stratford 20.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 08/1983 25.11
D5514 31014 ADB968015 24/07/1958 BH 19/12/1968
from 30
Stratford 01/11/1976 Stratford 18.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 06/1983 24.91
D5515 31015 31/07/1958 BH 17/07/1968
from 30
Stratford 04/05/1980 Stratford 21.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 11/1980 22.31
D5516 31016 04/09/1958 BH 17/01/1969
from 30
Stratford 10/07/1976 Stratford 17.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 27/12/1976 18.33
D5517 31017 25/09/1958 BH 19/10/1968
from 30
Stratford 04/05/1980 Stratford 21.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/1983 24.32
D5519 31019 12/12/1958 BH 28/11/1968
from 30
Stratford 05/10/1980 Stratford 21.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 08/1981 22.69